Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Site Map | Feedback
Business Court Pilot Program
Administrative Orders and Forms
 
SCCABC101 Form - Order for Case Assignment to the Business Court Pilot Program
2007-09-07-01 Business Court Pilot Program Administrative Order
2007-11-30-01 Motion and Order for Case Assignment in the Business Court Pilot Program SCCA BC 101 (11/07)
2009-10-13-01 Business Court Pilot Program Extension
2010-08-19-01 Designation of Business Court Judges
2011-11-30-01 Business Court Pilot Program Extension
   
   
Business Court Opinions
   
2008-09-19-01 Brown v. Brown, Order on Defendant’s Motion to Dismiss (Greenville Cty.)
2008-10-03-01 Venture Investment Properties Group, Inc. v. Whaley's Mill, L.P., Order on Defendant Carter’s Motion for Judgment on Pleadings and Plaintiff’s Motion to Amend (Richland Cty.)
2008-10-13-01 Venture Investment Properties Group, Inc. v. Whaley's Mill, L.P., Order on Defendants Carter and WMLP’s Motion for Judgment on Pleadings (Richland Cty.)
2009-02-10-01 Stevenson v. Kavanaugh, Order Granting in Part, and Denying in Part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Charleston Cty.)
2009-04-13-02 Lennon v. Smith, Order on Defendants’ Motion to Enforce Settlement (Greenville Cty.)
2010-01-08-02 Covan v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Order on Defendant’s Motion to Dismiss (Richland Cty.)
2010-04-01-01 Huggins v. Hilliard
2010-05-27-01 Order Granting Defendant Robert Bradley Company Inc.’s Motion for partial Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiffs’ Motions for Summary Judgment and Relief Pendente Lite.
2010-06-23-01 Order Granting Partial Motion to Dismiss in Rice-Marko v. Wachovia
2010-08-04-01 Marcus S. McCall, Plaintiff v. Easlan Communities, LLC, Defendant
2010-08-17-01 Order Dismissing Defendant Tom Clymer
2010-12-09-01 G A Milner III, et al vs. South Financial Group Inc, et al
2011-01-28-01 Order Dismissing Claims, Releasing Escrow Funds, and Cancelling Surety Bond
2011-01-28-02 Studsvik v. South Carolina State Budget and Control Board - Consent Order Granting Motion to Amend Complaint
2011-01-28-03 Studsvik v. South Carolina State Budget and Control Board - Stipulation, Mutual Release and Settlement Agreement
2011-01-28-04 Studsvik v. South Carolina State Budget and Control Board - Amended Consent Scheduling Order
2011-01-28-05 Studsvik v. South Carolina State Budget and Control Board - Stipulation of Dismissal
2011-02-15-01 Brunswick Corporation v. Bentley Industries, LLC
2011-04-04-02 Studsvik v. South Carolina State Budget and Control Board - Order Granting Motion to Amend
2011-04-06-01 Studsvik v. South Carolina State Budget and Control Board and the State of South Caroling - Order Suspending Deadlines
2011-07-11-01 Tombstone, LLC v. The Gospel Properties, LLC - Order of Dismissal of Parties and Claims
2011-10-28-02 Kerr v. Branch Banking and Trust Company, Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Prejudice
2011-10-28-03 Skywaves I Corporation v. Branch Banking and Trust Company, Orger Granting BB&T's Partial Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and James Edahl's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Prejudice
2012-02-02-01 Eastern Business Forms, Inc. v. Bradley F. Davin, et seq. 
2012-11-05-01 Studsvik v. South Carolina Budget and Control, Order Denying Defendant South Carolina Budget & Control Board's Motion to Alter or Amend
2012-11-05-02 Palmetto Marketing Associates, Inc. v. Glowacki, Order
2013-01-17-01 Estate of Stevenson v. Kavanaugh
2013-02-14-01 State Treasurer of SC v. Bank of New York - Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint
2013-02-14-02 State Treasurer of SC v. Bank of New York - Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing
2013-07-15-02 MeadWestvaco Corporation v. Rayonier Performance Fibers - Protective Order on Trade Secrets
2013-07-15-03 MeadWestvaco Corporation v. Rayonier Performance Fibers - Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim Under the SCUTPA