Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Site Map | Feedback
Judge J. C. Nicholson, Jr.

Judge J. C. (Buddy) Nicholson was born September 30, 1942 in Birmingham, Alabama, to the late Julius Carnes Nicholson, graduate of LSU and a retired Forester of WESVACO Industries and Frances E. Nicholson, homemaker. Judge Nicholson left Alabama at the age of three and moved with his parents to Camden South Carolina.

He attended public schools in Camden South Carolina and received his bachelor's degree in 1964 from The Citadel and his Juris Doctorate from the University of South Carolina in 1973. Judge Nicholson is a retired Lt. Colonel having served in the USAF as a pilot from '65 until '70 and in the Air National Guard until 1989.

Judge Nicholson is married and has four children, one step-son and nine grandchildren.

He began his career in the legal profession in Orangeburg County where he was Assistant Solicitor from 1973 until 1974. In 1974 he entered into private practice on a full-time basis and served as Assistant Solicitor on a part-time basis until 1976. From 1976 until 1982, Judge Nicholson was a member of County Council for Orangeburg County. In 1983, he accepted a position as Assistant Solicitor for Greenville County and served in that capacity for one year before entering private practice with the firm of Epps & Krause. In 1986 he entered into a partnership with this firm and remained with this firm until such time as he was elected Judge.

Judge Nicholson served as a member of the SCBAR House of Delegates, the American Bar Association, the South Carolina Trial Lawyers and American Trial Lawyers Association. He is a past member of the Toastmasters Club and a current member of the Rotary Club, the USC Gamecock Club, of the Association of Citadel Men and the Citadel Alumni Club.

He and Mrs. Nicholson are members and attend the First Presbyterian Church.

He was elected Judge, at-large, Seat No. 7 on February 10, 1999; qualified on February 26, 1999 and began serving as Circuit Court Judge. He served in this position from February 10, 1999 until June 30, 2001, when he was elected Judge of the Tenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, May 30, 2001 succeeding H. Dean Hall, retired. He qualified July 1, 2001 and is serving through present date. He is admitted to practice in all South Carolina Courts, the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina, the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals and the U. S. Supreme Court.

Photo of Judge J. Nicholson
The Honorable J. C. Nicholson, Jr.
Active/Retired Circuit Court Judge
100 Broad Street, Ste. 106
Charleston, SC 29401
OFFICE: (843) 958-5000
FAX: (843) 958-5020

Law Clerk: Charles William Patrick