2008-08-25-01
(Superseded by Order
2010-04-22-01)
The Supreme Court of South Carolina
GREENVILLE COUNTY MENTAL HEALTH COURT
AMENDED
ORDER
NOW, THEREFORE, pursuant to Article V, Section 4 of the South Carolina Constitution,
IT IS ORDERED that this order shall supersede the order dated February 2, 2006 that established a mental health court program within Greenville County. This order shall extend the mental health court program until December 31, 2008 and all other provisions established within the February 2, 2006 order shall remain unchanged.
This order remains in effect unless amended or rescinded by the Chief Justice.
s/Jean H. Toal Jean H, Toal, Chief Justice |
August 25, 2008
Columbia, South Carolina