Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Site Map | Feedback
2011-06-07-01

The Supreme Court of South Carolina

RE:   Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements


ORDER



The South Carolina Commission on Continuing Legal Education and Specialization has furnished the attached list of lawyers who were administratively suspended from the practice of law on April 1, 2011, under Rule 419(b)(2), SCACR, and remain suspended as of June 2, 2011.  Pursuant to Rule 419(e)(2), SCACR, these lawyers are hereby suspended from the practice of law by this Court.  They shall surrender their certificates to practice law in this State to the Clerk of this Court by July 1, 2011.

Any petition for reinstatement must be made in the manner specified by Rule 419(f), SCACR.  If a lawyer suspended by this order does not seek reinstatement within three (3) years of the date this order, the lawyer’s membership in the South Carolina Bar shall be terminated and the lawyer’s name will be removed from the roll of attorneys in this State.   Rule 419(g), SCACR.

These lawyers are warned that any continuation of the practice of law in this State after being suspended by the provisions of Rule 419, SCACR, or this order is the unauthorized practice of law, and will subject them to disciplinary action under Rule 413, SCACR, and could result in a finding of criminal or civil contempt by this Court.  Further, any lawyer who is aware of any violation of this suspension shall report the matter to the Office of Disciplinary Counsel.   Rule 8.3, Rules of Professional Conduct for Lawyers, Rule 407, SCACR.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

s/Jean H. Toal                                    C.J.

s/Costa M. Pleicones                        J.

s/Donald W. Beatty                            J.

s/John W. Kittredge                           J.

s/Kaye G. Hearn                                 J.

Columbia, South Carolina
June 7, 2011


 

LAWYERS SUSPENDED FOR NON-COMPLIANCE
WITH MCLE REGULATIONS FOR THE
2010-2011 REPORTING PERIOD
AS OF JUNE 2, 2011


Baylor B. Banks
Thompson Law Firm, LLC
3050 Peachtree Road, Suite 355
Atlanta, GA 30355
SUSPENDED BY BAR 2/1/11



David R. Lawson
David R. Lawson, Attorney, LLC
12 Carriage Lane
Charleston, SC  29407

Gerald A. Beard
Michelin North America, Inc.
Post Office Box 19001
Greenville, SC 29602
SUSPENDED BY BAR 2/1/11

 

Shawn M. Pellow
6 Pequot Square
Mansfield Center, CT 06250
SUSPENDED BY BAR 2/1/11

Margaret H. Benson
DaVita, Inc.
601 Hawaii Street
El Segundo, CA 90245

Amanda G. Steinmeyer
Steinmeyer Law Firm
1622 Sunset Boulevard
West Columbia, SC  29169
INTERIM SUSPENSION 12/2/10

 

Teresa D. Bulford
Bulford Law Firm, LLC
107 West 6th North Street, Suite 207
Summerville, SC  29483
INTERIM SUSPENSION 1/20/11

 

Helen Ann S. Thrower
2604 Burney Drive
Columbia, SC  29205

Louis M. Cook
Louis M. Cook & Associates
302 43rd North
North Myrtle Beach, SC  29582

 

Irby E. Walker, Jr.
2550 Jordanville Road
Galivants Ferry, SC 29544
INTERIM SUSPENSION 9/18/09

Lisa A. Delzotti-Marion
4201 Bayshore Boulevard, Suite 2001
Tampa, FL 33611

 

 

Frank W. Gibbes
214 Robin Hood Road
Greenville, SC  29607

 

 

Thomas A. Jones III
Post Office Box 681389
Fort Payne, AL  35968