Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Site Map | Feedback
2013-03-07-02

The Supreme Court of South Carolina

GREENVILLE COUNTY MENTAL HEALTH COURT


ORDER


 

Now, THEREFORE, pursuant to Article V, Section 4 of the South Carolina Constitution,

IT IS ORDERED that this order shall supersede the April 22, 2010 order related to the Greenville County Mental Health Court Program.  This order shall extend the mental health court program until December 31, 2013 and all other provisions established within the February 5, 2006 order shall remain unchanged. 

This order remains in effect unless amended or rescinded by the Chief Justice.

s/Jean Hoefer Toal                                   
Jean Hoefer Toal, Chief Justice

Columbia, South Carolina
March 7, 2013