The Supreme Court of South Carolina
RE: Circuit Court Arbitration and Mediation
and Family Court Mediation
ORDER
By order dated February 1, 2006, this Court adopted Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Rules which govern court-annexed ADR processes in South Carolina Circuit Courts in civil suits, and in South Carolina Family Courts in domestic relations actions in counties designated by this Court for mandatory ADR or as required by statute.
Effective with cases filed in the family court on or after October 1, 20 I 0, and cases filed in the court of common pleas on or after January 1, 2011, the counties in the Third Judicial Circuit join those counties previously designated by this Court for mandatory ADR. The counties designated by this Court for mandatory ADR are as follows:
Allendale | Greenville | Pickens - Family Court only |
Anderson | Hampton | Richland |
Beaufort | Horry | Sumter |
Clarendon | Jasper | Union |
Colleton | Lee | Williamsburg |
Florence | Lexington | York |
Effective October 1, 2010, this order supersedes the order dated September 16,2009, listing the counties previously designated for mandatory ADR.
s/Jean H. Toal C.J. s/Costa M. Pleicones J. s/Donald W. Beatty J. s/John W. Kittredge J. Hearn, J., not participating |
Columbia, South Carolina
September 1, 2010