Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Court of Appeals - Roster of Cases for Hearing

   

The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.

Monday, October 1, 2018
Court Room I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000713    Do Yeon Kim, Appellant, v. County of Richland, Richland County Sheriff's Department, and Leon Lott in his Official Capacity as Richland County Sheriff, Respondents.

Thomas Frank Dougall of Dougall & Collins, of Elgin, for Appellant. Robert Daniel Dodson of Law Offices of Robert Dodson, PA, of Columbia, for Appellant. Andrew F. Lindemann of Lindemann, Davis & Hughes, PA, of Columbia, for Respondents. Robert David Garfield of Crowe LaFave, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondents.

This appeal follows a jury trial involving claims between Do Yeon Kim and County of Richland and Leon Lott in his Official Capacity as Richland County Sheriff arising from a collision between Kim and a Sheriff's Office Deputy.

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000641    The State, Respondent, v. John Calvin Sledge, Appellant.

Appellate Defender Laura Ruth Baer, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Caroline M. Scrantom, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor William Walter Wilkins, III, of Greenville, for Respondent.

In this criminal appeal, John Calvin Sledge challenges (1) the admission of certain statements made by a caller during a 911 call that he contends are inadmissible hearsay; (2) the admission of his statements to law enforcement that he maintains were not freely and voluntarily made; and (3) the imposition of a five year sentence for possession of a weapon during the commission of a violent crime when he was given a life sentence for murder.

 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001177    Michael P. Thornton, Respondent, v. Anita L. Thornton, Appellant.

Megan Catherine Hunt Dell of Dell Family Law, P.C., of Charleston, for Appellant. Theresa Marie Wozniak Jenkins of Theresa Wozniak Jenkins, Attorney at Law, LLC, of Flint, Michigan for Appellant. Michael P. Thornton, pro se , for Respondent.

In this domestic relations matter, Anita L. Thornton (Wife) appeals the family court's final divorce decree arguing the court erred in (1) identifying, valuing, and apportioning marital assets and debts, (2) miscalculating Wife's child support obligation, (3) awarding primary custody of the parties' two children to Michael P. Thornton (Husband), (4) failing to find Wife prejudiced by "structural" error related to a hearing on her petition to enforce visitation, (5) relying too heavily on the Guardian ad litem (GAL)'s conclusions, (6) relying on Dr. Marc Harari's conclusions which were based on information provided by the GAL, (7) granting Husband a divorce on the ground of adultery, (8) failing to find a conflict of interest regarding a personal relationship between Husband and an employee of the Dorchester County Clerk of Court, and (9) requiring each party to pay his or her own attorney's fees, requiring Wife to pay a greater percentage of the GAL's fees and the forensic consultant's fees, and requiring Wife to pay the private investigator's fees.

Tuesday, October 2, 2018
Court Room I
 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000227    Angela D. Keene, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Dennis Seay, Deceased, and Linda Seay, Respondents, v. CNA Holdings, LLC, Appellant.

C. Mitchell Brown, Allen Mattison Bogan, and Blake Terence Williams, all of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Appellant. Theile Branham McVey and John D. Kassel, both of Kassel McVey of Columbia, for Respondents. Blake A. Hewitt of Bluestein Thompson Sullivan LLC, of Columbia, for Respondents. Kevin W. Paul and Chris Panatier, both of Dallas, Texas, for Respondents.

In this negligence action, Appellant CNA Holdings, LLC challenges the circuit court's denial of its motions for a judgment notwithstanding the verdict, new trial absolute, and new trial nisi remittitur. Appellant argues the circuit court erred in concluding that Respondent Angie Keene's decedent, Dennis Seay, was not a statutory employee of Appellant's predecessor in interest, Hoechst Celanese Corporation, pursuant to section 42-1-400 of the South Carolina Code (2015) and, therefore, the South Carolina Workers' Compensation Act, S.C. Code Ann. ยงยง 42-1-10 to 42-19-50, was not Seay's exclusive remedy for damages he suffered upon contracting mesothelioma. Appellant also argues the circuit court erred in (1) declining to grant a mistrial on the ground of jury misconduct; (2) admitting into evidence a video of Seay crying out in pain; and (3) upholding the amount of the jury's verdict.

Wednesday, October 3, 2018
Court Room I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000863    The State, Respondent, v. James Bubba Patterson, Appellant.

Appellate Defender Kathrine Haggard Hudgins, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General Mark Reynolds Farthing, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Samuel R. Hubbard, III, of Lexington, for Respondent.

After a jury convicted James Patterson of armed robbery, grand larceny, and possession of a weapon during the commission of a violent crime, the trial court sentenced him to an aggregate term of twenty years' imprisonment. On appeal, Patterson argues the trial court erred in admitting DNA evidence that (1) was not authenticated through proper chain of custody testimony and (2) constituted improper evidence of a prior bad act. Additionally, Patterson asserts the trial court erred by indicating to the jury during opening statements that a trial was "a search for the truth."

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001054    HSBC Bank of USA, National Association, as Trustee for the Holders of the Deutsche ALT-A Securities, Inc. Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-A4, assignee of Bank of America N.A., successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, L.P., f/k/a Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, Inc., Appellant, v. Clifford L. Ryba; Beverly Ryba; Regions Bank; First Federal Savings and Loan Association of Charleston, Citibank (South Dakota) N.A., and Carol Garfield Goldberg, Defendants, Of whom Carol Garfield Goldberg is the Respondent.

Allen Mattison Bogan and Nicholas Andrew Charles, both of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Appellant. Erica Greer Lybrand of Rogers Townsend & Thomas, PC ,of Columbia, for Appellant. James K. Holmes of The Steinberg Law Firm, LLP, of Charleston, for Respondent.

HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Bank) appeals the master-in-equity's order denying foreclosure on a note and mortgage entered into between its predecessor, Countrywide Home Loans Inc. (Countrywide), and Clifford and Beverly Ryba (the Rybas). At the outset of the foreclosure action, Respondent Carol Goldberg, intervened and claimed an interest in the property being foreclosed. Goldberg asserted an affirmative defense claim alleging that she was fraudulently induced into deeding her property to the Rybas, Countrywide was aware of the fraudulent activity, and because Bank stepped into the shoes of its predecessor, it was not protected under the shelter rule nor as a holder in due course. The master-in-equity ruled in favor of Goldberg. On appeal, Bank argues (1) fraud is not a defense to the foreclosure action because the master's order does not contain any findings of fact that support a finding of fraud, (2) the holder in due course analysis was irrelevant because a finding of fraud was removed from the master's order, and (3) the master erred in requiring Bank to be a holder in due course to foreclose on the note and mortgage at issue because Bank's loan servicer can initiate a foreclosure action.

 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000679    Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Appellant, v. Sharmin Christine Walls, Randi Harper, Wendy Timms in her capacity as Personal Representative of The Estate of Christopher Adam Timms, Deborah Timms, Defendants, Of whom, Sharmin Christine Walls, Randi Harper, and Wendy Timms in her capacity as Personal Representative of The Estate of Christopher Adam Timms, are the Respondents.

John Robert Murphy and Wesley Brian Sawyer, both of Murphy & Grantland, PA, of Columbia, for Appellant. Michael F. Mullinax of Mullinax Law Firm, P.A., of Anderson, for Respondent Sharmin Christine Walls. John Kirkman Moorhead of Krause Moorhead & Draisen, PA, of Anderson, for Respondent Randi Harper. Milford Oliver Howard, III, of Howard Law Firm, P.A., of Greenville, for Respondent Wendy Timms.

This is an appeal from a declaratory judgment action brought by Nationwide to determine the amount due under an automobile liability policy for injuries sustained in a police chase. The circuit court concluded Nationwide must provide the maximum coverage on the policy, despite a policy exclusion that reduced coverage to the statutory minimum when an accident occurred while committing a felony or fleeing law enforcement. On appeal, Nationwide argues the circuit court erred in failing to enforce the exclusions and finding they violated public policy.

Tuesday, October 9, 2018
Court Room I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000531    Lee B. Moore, Respondent/Appellant, v. Debra L. Moore, Appellant/Respondent.

J. Falkner Wilkes, of Greenville, for Appellant/Respondent. Elizabeth Kimberly Berry of Mooneyham Berry, LLC, of Greenville, for Respondent/Appellant.

In this divorce action involving cross-appeals, Debra Moore (Wife) appeals, arguing the family court erred in reducing the amount of her alimony. Lee Moore (Husband) also appeals, arguing the family court erred in not sufficiently reducing his alimony obligation. Both parties argue the court erred in awarding attorney's fees.

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001109    The State, Respondent, v. Robin Renee Herndon, Appellant.

Appellate Defender David Alexander, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General William Frederick Schumacher, IV , both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Samuel R. Hubbard, III, of Lexington, for Respondent.

In this criminal appeal, Robin Renee Herndon appeals her conviction of voluntary manslaughter. On appeal, Herndon argues the circuit court erred in (1) denying her immunity under the Protection of Persons and Property Act (the Act), (2) admitting the testimony of forensic pathologist Dr. Janice Ross when Ross was not an expert in crime scene investigation and her testimony was outside the scope of her expertise, and (3) refusing Herndon's request to instruct the jury on the circumstantial evidence charge from State v. Logan, 405 S.C. 83, 747 S.E.2d 444 (2013).

Wednesday, October 10, 2018
Court Room I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2014-002176    The State, Respondent, v. Joseph Bowers, Appellant.

Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General Mark Reynolds Farthing, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Isaac McDuffie Stone, III, of Bluffton, for Respondent.

Late night verbal altercations at a local club escalated to a shootout, resulting in the death of two people, Dante Bailey and Michael Morgan, and the injury of two others, Robert Goodwine and Richard Green. Appellant Joseph Bowers was convicted for the (1) voluntary manslaughter of Michael Morgan, (2) assault and battery of a high and aggravated nature of Richard Green, and (3) possession of a weapon during the commission of a violent crime. Bowers appeals only his voluntary manslaughter conviction. He argues the trial court erred by instructing the jury on mutual combat and voluntary manslaughter because there is no evidence to support either charge.

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2017-000170    Citizens for Quality Rural Living, Inc., Appellant, v. Greenville County Planning Commission, and RMDC, Inc., Respondents.

Barbara Faith Martzin, of Greenville, for Appellant. William A. Coates of Roe Cassidy Coates & Price, PA, of Greenville, for Respondent RMDC, Inc. H. Dean Campbell, Jr., of Greenville, for Respondent Greenville County Planning Commission. Jeffrey D. Wile, of Greenville, for Respondent Greenville County Planning Commission.

Appellant Citizens for Quality Rural Living, Inc. challenges the circuit court's order dismissing its declaratory judgment action and its appeal from a decision of Respondent Greenville County Planning Commission (Commission) approving the subdivision proposal of Respondent RMDC, Inc. Appellant argues the circuit court erred by concluding that Appellant had no standing to appeal the Commission's decision or to file its declaratory judgment action.

 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001811    James C. Owens, Appellant, v. Bryan Crabtree, Kirkman Broadcasting, Inc. d/b/a WQSC Radio and ADC Engineering, Inc., Tyler Flesch, and Red Drum Capital Group, LLC, Defendants, Of which ADC Engineering, Inc., is the Respondent.

John E. Parker and William Franklin Barnes, III, both of Peters Murdaugh Parker Eltzroth & Detrick, PA, of Hampton, for Appellant. Molly Hughes Cherry and Melissa Ashley Fried, both of Nexsen Pruet, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondent.

In this wrongful termination action, James Owens appeals a circuit court order granting summary judgment in favor of ADC Engineering. On appeal, Owens argues the circuit court erred in holding that his discharge from ADC did not give rise to a cause of action under the public policy exception to the at-will employment doctrine. Owens further asserts the circuit court erred in holding that his opposition to the construction of a parking garage was not protected political speech under section 16-17-560 of the South Carolina Code (2015).

Wednesday, October 17, 2018
Court Room I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001141    Peter J. Wellin, Cynthia W. Plum and Marjorie W. King, Appellants, v. Keith S. Wellin, Respondent.

Robert H. Brunson, Merritt Gordon Abney, and Patrick Coleman Wooten, all of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Charleston, for Appellants. Allen Mattison Bogan, of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Appellants. Edward G.R. Bennett of Evans Carter Kunes & Bennett, PA, of Charleston, for Respondent. Robert H. Hood, Mary Agnes Hood Craig, and James Bernard Hood , all of Hood Law Firm, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondent. Tiffany Nicole Provence of Provence Messervy, LLC, of Summerville, for Respondent.

Peter Wellin, Cynthia W. Plum, and Marjorie W. King (the Children) appeal the circuit court's order affirming the probate court's order requiring the payment of approximately fifty million dollars ($50,000,000) to Synovus Trust Company, N.A. to protect these funds in favor of Keith Wellin. The Children contend the probate court lacked subject matter jurisdiction as well as personal jurisdiction to issue the order. They further maintain the probate court erred in refusing to grant their motion for voluntary dismissal, in not dismissing the action as moot upon Keith Wellin's death, and in failing to dismiss the case pursuant to South Carolina Rule of Civil Procedure (b)(8).

Tuesday, October 9, 2018
Court Room II
 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000842    The State, Respondent, v. Felix Kotowski, Appellant.

Appellate Defemder Lara Mary Caudy, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Senior Assistant Attorney General David A. Spencer, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor David Michael Pascoe, Jr., of Orangeburg, for Respondent.

Felix Kotowski appeals his convictions for manufacturing methamphetamine and possession of less than one gram of methamphetamine, arguing the trial court erred in (1) denying his motion to suppress evidence seized during a "knock and talk," (2) denying his motion to suppress evidence seized during a protective sweep of a residence where Kotowski was an overnight guest, and (3) admitting NPLEx logs into evidence because the evidence is hearsay and the evidence violated Kotowski's Sixth Amendment right to confrontation as the State failed to introduce a records custodian.

 
 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001764    Peach REO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Respondent, v. Blalock Investments, LLC; Todd Smith; Debra Masuga; Subway Real Estate, LLC; and County of Spartanburg, a political subdivision of the State of South Carolina, Defendants, Of Whom Blalock Investments, LLC; Todd Smith; and Debra Masuga are the Appellants. And Blalock Investments, LLC; Todd Smith; and Debra Masuga, Appellants, v. Capital Crossing Servicing Company, LLC, Respondent.

Adam Crittenden Bach and Robert Hudson Smith, both of Eller Tonnsen Bach, of Greenville, for Appellants. Francis B.B. Knowlton, Allen Mattison Bogan, and Nicholas Andrew Charles, all of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Respondents.

Blalock Investments, LLC; Todd Smith; and Debra Masuga appeal the Master-In-Equity's order denying their request to file amended pleadings and dismissing their counterclaims and third-party complaint.

 
 12:00 p.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000298    The State, Respondent, v. Ahshaad Mykiel Owens, Appellant

Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Susannah Rawl Cole, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Scarlett Anne Wilson, of Charleston, for Respondent.

Appellant Ahshaad Owens appeals his convictions for murder, armed robbery, and possession of a weapon during the commission of a violent crime on the grounds that the trial court erred in (1) admitting a photograph of the victim in violation of Rule 403, SCRE and (2) refusing to clarify a jury instruction on the defense of accident.

 
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
Court Room II
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001125    In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Francis Arthur Oxner, Appellant.

Allen Mattison Bogan and Blake Terence William, both of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek and Appellate Defender David Alexander, both of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Deborah R.J. Shupe, both of Columbia, for Respondent.

Frances A. Oxner appeals the circuit court's order requiring Oxner to submit to an evaluation pursuant to the Sexually Violent Predator Act (the Act), arguing the circuit court erred in finding that (1) he met the statutory definition of a person "convicted of violent offense," (2) no unconstitutional delay occurred between the time State filed the petition and the time of the hearing pursuant to section 44-48-100(B) of the South Carolina Code (2018), and (3) holding the hearing while Oxner was incompetent did not result in a violation of procedural due process.

 
 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-000432    Linda A. Gibson, individually and in capacity as Trustee of the Paul William Gibson Family Trust; Heritage Seven, LLC; Seven Oaks Apartments, LLC; and 3205 Palm Boulevard, LLC, Appellants, v. Andrew K. Epting, Jr., LLC; Andrew K. Epting, Jr.; George J. Kefalos, P.A.; George J. Kefalos; Gedney M. Howe, III, P.A.; Gedney M. Howe, III; John S. West, Attorney-at-Law, LLC; and John S. West, Respondents.

Thomas A. Pendarvis and Christopher W. Lempesis, Jr., both of Pendarvis Law Offices, PC, of Beaufort, for Appellant.. James Robert Davis, of Daniel Island, for Appellant. M. Dawes Cooke, Jr. and Jeremy E. Bowers, both of Barnwell Whaley Patterson & Helms, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondents.

In this case concerning the enforceability of several attorney's fee agreements and the reasonableness of $566,666 in reverse-contingent attorney's fees, Linda Gibson, Heritage Seven, LLC, Seven Oaks Apartments, LLC, and 3205 Palm Boulevard, LLC, (collectively, Appellants) appeal the circuit court order granting summary judgment to Andrew Epting Jr, George J. Kefalos, Gedney M. Howe, III, John S. West, and their respective law firms (collectively, Respondents) and denying summary judgment to Appellants. On appeal, Appellants argue the circuit court erred (1) in granting summary judgment to Respondents where evidence showed Respondents breached their professional and fiduciary duties by withholding information from Gibson about the deficiency claim against her; (2) in granting summary judgment to Respondents where evidence showed Respondents' reverse contingent fee was excessive and unreasonable; (3) in granting summary judgment to Respondents because the attorney's fee agreements were ambiguous and should not have been construed in favor of Respondents; (4) because evidence before the circuit court raised genuine issues of material fact as to Appellants' causes of action for legal malpractice, breach of fiduciary duty, aiding and abetting the breach of fiduciary duty, negligent misrepresentation, unjust enrichment, and violation of the South Carolina Unfair Trade Practices Act (SCUTPA) ; and (5) in denying Appellants' motion for summary judgment because the attorney's fees were excessive and the fee agreements were "void as a matter of law, undisputed fact, and public policy."

 
 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2016-001192    The State, Respondent, v. Teresa Ann McCracken-Hall, Appellant.

Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Susannah Rawl Cole, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Jimmy A. Richardson, II, of Conway, for Respondent.

Teresa McCracken Hall (Appellant) was convicted of murdering her husband, Steven Hall (Victim). She appeals her conviction arguing the circuit court erred in permitting one police officer to testify as to what he was told by another police officer regarding that officer's interaction with Appellant. Appellant also maintains the circuit court erred in excluding evidence regarding a dispute between Victim and their neighbor as that prevented her from presenting a complete defense.

 
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument
2015-001935    Jeffrey Bernard Falls, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2017-000987    In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Christopher Busch, Appellant.

2016-001797    The State, Respondent, v. Ronald Douglas Michaux, Jr., Appellant.

2017-000283    The State, Respondent, v. James John Abernathy, Appellant.

2015-002576    The State, Respondent, v. Gerald J. Nagy, Appellant.

2016-001524    Frank Middleton, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2017-000295    The State, Respondent, v. Terrance Lamar Tyson, Appellant.

2016-002341    The State, Respondent, v. Daniel Caleb Braxton, Appellant.

2016-002412    Ernest Battle #165247, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.

2016-000012    Michael D. Jackson, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2017-001019    The State, Respondent, v. David James Welch, Appellant.

2017-000565    The State, Respondent, v. Kevin Daniel Driggers, Appellant.

2016-001382    Clarence B. Jenkins, Jr., Appellant, v. South Carolina Workers' Compensation Commission, Respondent.

2016-000193    The State, Respondent, v. Charles David Hayes, Appellant.

2016-001844    James Anthony Tucker, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2016-000790    Ann Stevenson, Claimant, Appellant, v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Employer, and New Hampshire Insurance Co., Carrier, Respondents.

2017-000753    Donnie Lowe, Employee, Claimant, Appellant, v. BMW Manufacturing Corporation, Employer, and Hartford Ins. Co. of the Midwest, c/o Sedgewick Claims Management Services, Inc., Carrier, Respondents.

2016-001831    The State, Respondent, v. Timothy Alan Oertel, Appellant.

2017-000814    The State, Respondent, v. Quasean David Marshall, Appellant.

2017-000114    The State, Respondent, v. Charles Alton Morehouse, Appellant.

2017-000915    The State, Respondent, v. Joshua William Maiden, Appellant.

2017-001044    The State, Respondent, v. Marvin Luther Myers, Jr., Appellant.

2017-000215    The State, Respondent, v. Keaston Dahja Kinard, Appellant.

2017-000585    In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Wake Hunt, Appellant.

2016-001653    William Rice Cook, III, Appellant, v. Benny Richard Phillips, Jr. and the real estate property located at 207 North Avenue, Anderson, South Carolina 29625, TMS# 123-26-08-02, Respondents.

2017-001959    The State, Respondent, v. Cassidy Lynn Lewis, Appellant.

2016-002129    The State, Respondent, v. Joshua Warren Hopkins, Appellant.

2017-000293    The State, Respondent, v. Marcus Channing Johnson, Appellant.

2016-002490    The State, Respondent, v. Kevin Tyrone Bryant, Appellant.

2016-002289    Bernard Johnson, Respondent, v. Jonquiel T. Johnson, Appellant.

2017-000914    Andra Jamison #337461, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.

2017-001109    The State, Respondent, v. Patrick Strozier, Appellant.

2017-001427    The State, Respondent, v. Sabrina Ann McWilliams, Appellant.

2016-001607    Lucius Simuel, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2017-001981    Bobby A. Gilbert, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2017-001934    The State, Respondent, v. Eugene Hardy, Appellant.

2017-001163    The State, Respondent, v. Latson Ray Matthews, Appellant.

2017-001688    Jessie James Robinson, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2017-000430    The State, Respondent, v. Elidoro Carrillo Ontivero, Appellant.

2016-001908    The State, Respondent, v. Candice Beasley, Appellant.

2017-001239    The State, Respondent, v. Deshon Jermaine Norman, Appellant.

2016-000843    The State, Respondent, v. Theia Darion McArdle, Appellant.

2017-001269    In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Justin L. Stewart, Appellant.

2016-001817    Troy Wright, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.