The Supreme Court of South Carolina
Re: Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER
Pursuant to the provisions of Article V, Section 4 of the South Carolina Constitution,
IT IS ORDERED that a Pilot Program is established for the digital recording of certain court proceedings beginning on January 9, 2018. The Pilot Program, which began in Anderson County family court on January 9, 2018, Richland County circuit court on January 17, 2018, Sumter County circuit court on January 18, 2018, and Greenville County family court on January 22, 2018, shall be expanded to Dorchester County family court beginning on February 9, 2018. The transcribed paper copy remains the official record pursuant to Rule 607, SCACR. Attorneys should refer to the attached memorandum describing the process for ordering transcripts of proceedings recorded during this Pilot Program.
The Pilot Program will be expanded to other counties pursuant to future Orders of the Chief Justice.
s/Donald W. Beatty Donald W. Beatty Chief Justice of South Carolina |
Columbia, South Carolina
February 8, 2018