Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Administrative Orders - 2020
Order No.  
Topic
Forms/Rules Affected
Palmetto Automated Child Support System
Probate Court Form Changes
Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
Family Court Benchmark
(Supersedes Order 2014-08-27-01)
Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Evictions (SCCA Form 256B)
(Amends Order 2020-05-06-01)
Magistrate Assignment in Florence County
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
County Grand Juries
Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Foreclosures
(Amends Order 2020-05-06-01)
Suspension of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
(Supersedes Order 2020-04-10-01)
Resolution of Certain Summary Court Level Offenses During COVID-19 Outbreak
Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Evictions and Foreclosures Forms
(Amended by Order 2020-05-12-01) (Amended by Order 2020-07-23-01)
Video/Audio Conferencing Hearings Statewide
Trial Court Video/Audioconferencing Consent Forms
Family Court Forms for Provisional Appointment of Counsel During COVID-19
Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
Statewide Family Court Order
(Revoked by Order 2020-04-03-01)
(Supersedes Order 2020-03-16-01)
Family Court Schedule and Judicial Travel
Circuit Court Schedule and Judicial Travel
Richland Co. Administrative Order
(Supersedes Order 2020-03-12-01)
Richland County Administrative Order
(Superseded by Order 2020-03-12-02)
Revised Order of Commitment Up to Sixty Days (SCCA Form 221b)
Probate Court Judges Advisory Committee
(Supersedes Order 2018-11-08-02)