Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Department
SC Courts E-Filing Portal

SC Courts E-Filing System will permit you to file your case directly with the Court of Common Pleas in any county where E-Filing is available. Please review the E-Filing Policies and Guidelines prior to using the E-Filing system. As other courts and counties are implemented, they will be listed on this page.

Before using the E-Filing system you must register. If you are a South Carolina attorney in Good Standing, you will register by following the instructions on the E-Filing tab of AIS.

Announcements

Electronic Filing - Important Announcement for Attorney E-Filers - 02/22/2018

Electronic Filing - Important Announcement for Attorney E-Filers - 10/12/2017

Electronic Filing - Important Announcement for Attorney E-Filers - 10/13/2016

Summary of E-Filing Public Comments and Responses - 09/29/2016

Electronic Filing - Important Announcement for Attorneys Serving as Special Referees - 09/09/2016

E-Filing Announcement - 07/15/2016


E-Filing Pending Counties for Common Pleas

Marlboro     January 15, 2019


E-Filing Live Counties for Common Pleas

Aiken
Allendale
Anderson
Bamberg
Barnwell
Beaufort
Berkeley
Calhoun
Cherokee
Chester
Chesterfield
Clarendon
Colleton
Dorchester
Edgefield
Fairfield
Florence
Georgetown
Greenville
Greenwood
Hampton
Horry
Jasper
Kershaw
Lancaster
Laurens
Lee
Lexington
Marion
McCormick
Newberry
Oconee
Orangeburg
Pickens
Richland
Saluda
Spartanburg
Sumter
Union
Williamsburg
York


E-Filing Portal Login

File Now!


System Outage Log

SCJD Network Maintenance will be performed on Tuesday December 18, 2018, beginning at 7 p.m., rather than the regularly scheduled 10 p.m. start. This maintenance was originally scheduled for December 4, but was postponed for technical reasons. E-Filers should be aware that, during the maintenance period, the E-Filing System will not be available for attorney filings. It is expected that the maintenance will be complete by 2 a.m.
Start: 
12/18/2018   10:00 PM
End: 
12/19/2018   02:00 AM
Type: 
Scheduled