Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch

E-Filing Home  >>  System Outage Log

E-Filing System Outage Log
The SC Judicial Branch will conduct network maintenance on Thursday, September 15, 2020, beginning at 12:00 AM affecting many of our systems, including CMS, JMS & E-Filing. It is expected that maintenance will be completed by Thursday, September 15, 2020 at 6:00 AM. Anyone connected to any application or website hosted by SCJB will experience an interruption in service during this maintenance window.
Date:
09/15/2020
Time:
12:00 am to 6:00 am
Type:
Scheduled
The technical difficulties reported earlier today affecting CMS and E-Filing have been resolved.
Date:
08/25/2020
Time:
11:00 am to 5:00 pm
Type:
Unscheduled
Scheduled Maintenance will take place on Tuesday, August 4, 2020 from 10:00 PM to 2:00 AM, Wednesday, August 5.
Date:
08/04/2020
Time:
10:00 pm to 2:00 am
Type:
Scheduled
Scheduled Maintenance will take place on Tuesday, July 7, 2020 from 10:00 PM to 2:00 AM, Wednesday, July 8.
Date:
07/07/2020
Time:
10:00 pm to 2:00 am
Type:
Scheduled
Scheduled Maintenance Notice -- The SC Judicial Branch will conduct network maintenance on Saturday, June 27, 2020, beginning at 8:00 AM affecting many of our systems, including CMS, JMS & E-Filing. It is expected that maintenance will be completed by 11:00 PM Saturday night. Anyone connected to any application or website hosted by SCJB will experience an interruption in service during this maintenance window.
Date:
06/27/2020
Time:
8:00 am to 11:00 pm
Type:
Scheduled
Scheduled Maintenance will take place on Tuesday, June 2, 2020 from 10:00 PM to 2:00 AM, Wednesday, June 3.
Date:
06/02/2020
Time:
10:00 pm to 2:00 am
Type:
Scheduled
Scheduled Maintenance will take place on Tuesday, May 5, 2020 from 10:00 PM to 2:00 AM, Wednesday, May 6.
Date:
05/05/2020
Time:
10:00 pm to 2:00 am
Type:
Scheduled
Scheduled Maintenance will take place on Tuesday, April 7, 2020 from 10:00 PM to 2:00 AM, Wednesday, April 8.
Date:
04/07/2020
Time:
10:00 pm to 2:00 am
Type:
Scheduled
Scheduled Maintenance will take place on Tuesday, March 3, 2020 from 10:00 PM to 2:00 AM, Wednesday, March 4.
Date:
03/03/2020
Time:
10:00 pm to 2:00 am
Type:
Scheduled
Reminder: Scheduled Maintenance Notice -- Network maintenance will be performed this Saturday, February 29, 2020, beginning at 8:00 AM. It is expected that maintenance will be completed by 11:00 PM. Anyone connecting to any application or website hosted by SCJB will experience an interruption in service during this maintenance window. This outage will be part of a planned disaster recovery testing event. Please DO NOT CONNECT to any application or resources on Saturday, February 29, 2020 unless you have been asked to do so by the Office of Information Technology.
Date:
02/29/2020
Time:
8:00 am to 11:00 pm
Type:
Scheduled
Colleton County is experiencing localized technical issues. Filers may continue to E-file to Colleton, but should be aware that the county is unable to approve or reject filings at this time. This message will be updated when Colleton has resolved the situation.
Date:
02/18/2020
Time:
8:00 am to 10:00 pm
Type:
Unscheduled
Colleton County: Technical issues affecting E-Filing have been cleared. However, the county is unable to receive or send e-mails until further notice.
Date:
02/12/2020
Time:
12:15 pm to 5:00 pm
Type:
Unscheduled
Scheduled Maintenance will take place on Tuesday, February 4, 2020 from 10:00 PM to 2:00 AM, Wednesday, February 5.
Date:
02/04/2020
Time:
10:00 pm to 2:00 am
Type:
Scheduled