Davis Adv. Sh. No. 7
S.E. 2d
THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
In The Supreme Court
Michael Slear and
Elizabeth A. Slear, Petitioners,
v.
Jethro Hanna and
Watson's Riverside, Inc., Defendants,
of Whom
Jethro Hanna is Respondent.
ON WRIT OF CERTIORARI TO THE COURT OF
APPEALS
Appeal From Horry County
John M. Leiter, Special Referee
Opinion No.24763
Heard June 4, 1997 - Filed February 17, 1998
REVERSED
p. 3
FINNEY., C.J.: We granted certiorari to, review the Court of
Appeals' opinion in Slear v. Hanna, 321 S.C. 100, 467 S.E.2d 761 (Ct. App.
1996). We reverse.
Petitioners brought this action seeking a ruling that they had the
right to use Ester Landing in Watson's Riverside Development as an access
point to the Intracoastal Waterway. Petitioners are property owners in the
development. Respondent, Jethro Hanna, owns property adjacent to the
landing. The special referee found it was the intent of the developer to
dedicate Ester Landing to all property owners in the development and the
private dedication was accepted by the residents of Watson's Riverside
Development. Accordingly, the special referee concluded petitioners had the
right to use Ester Landing. The Court of Appeals reversed. Slear. supra.
J. Watson Smith purchased two pieces of property in Horry
County which he transferred in 1973 to Watson Riverside Inc. In July 1973,
a plat (Cox Plat) and Declaration of Restrictions were recorded showing
Blocks A-G of Watson's Riverside Development and restrictions on use of the
property. On October 20, 1975, restrictions on the use of Block H, shown on
a previously recorded Plat of "Watson's Riverside Addition," were recorded
and the owners of property in Blocks A-G agreed to have the previously
recorded restrictions changed to conform to the restriction on Block H. On
December 30, 1975, a plat showing an expansion of Block H was recorded
and outside the boundary of Block H was printed "Reserved for Future
Development." On July 10, 1978, a plat depicting Blocks K - O, designated
as Watson's Riverside Addition, Phases III and IV was recorded and on July
7, 1980, restrictions identical to those recorded for Blocks A - H were
recorded. Petitioners' property is located in Block M.
On January 27, 1976, respondent purchased Lot 1-A of Block B
of Watson's Riverside Development as shown on the Cox Plat. The