THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
In The Supreme Court
In the Matter of Michael L. James, Respondent.
Opinion No. 25361
Submitted September 4, 2001 - Filed September 17, 2001
Henry B. Richardson, Jr., of Columbia, for the Office of the Disciplinary Counsel.
Michael L. James, pro se.
Finding a sufficient attempt has been made to serve notice on respondent, and finding none of the factors in Rule 29(d), RLDE, Rule 413, SCACR, present in this matter, we hereby suspend respondent from the practice of law in this state for six months, retroactive to April 26, 2001, the date of the Opinion and Order of the Supreme Court of Kentucky. Within fifteen (15) days of the date of this opinion, respondent shall file an affidavit with the Clerk of Court showing that he has complied with Rule 30, RLDE, Rule 413, SCACR.
DEFINITE SUSPENSION.
TOAL, C.J., MOORE, WALLER, BURNETT and PLEICONES, JJ., concur.
1. On September 3, 1998, the Supreme Court of Kentucky suspended respondent from the practice of law in Kentucky for thirty days. James v. Kentucky Bar Ass'n, 973 S.W.2d 844 (Ky. 1998). This Court imposed the same sanction in this state. In the Matter of James, 333 S.C. 59, 508 S.E.2d 28 (1998). The Kentucky Supreme Court suspended respondent for one year, with a concurrent sixty day suspension, on March 23, 2000. James v. Kentucky Bar Ass'n, 13 S.W.3d 925 (Ky. 2000). A reciprocal one-year suspension, retroactive to the date of the Opinion and Order of the Kentucky Supreme Court, was imposed by this Court. In the Matter of James, 342 S.C. 17, 535 S.E.2d 911 (2000).