Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Department
Court News ...

Transcript of hearing held at the South Carolina Supreme Court on November 5, 2008.


IT IS ORDERED that the judges of the magisterial courts listed below be designated as Chief Judge or Associate Chief Judge for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts in the counties in which they hold office.


IT IS ORDERED that, due to the current inability of SCDMV to comply with the provisions of Act No. 270 of 2008, the State Election Commission shall distribute 2009 municipal jury lists comprised only of registered voters in each municipality.


By notice dated September 18, 2008, the Supreme Court requested written comments regarding the ABA Consultation Team’s recommendations regarding the South Carolina Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Systems. The written comments have been posted.


The Court has amended Rule 403, SCACR, to allow students who complete a judicial observation and experience program approved by the Chief Justice's Commission on the Profession to receive one Rule 403 trial experience credit for completing the program. The student may substitute the judicial observation and experience program credit for any one of the four trial experiences required by Rule 403(c).


On November 17, 2008, the Supreme Court of South Carolina conducted an admissions ceremony for 327 new attorneys.


The Board of Law Examiners will allow a limited number of applicants to use laptops to complete their answers to the essay sections of the February 2009 Bar Examination.


The results of the July 2008 Bar Examination have been posted on the Bar Admissions Page.


The results of the July 2008 Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 31, 2008.



At the request of the South Carolina Commission on Alternative Dispute Resolution, the Court has amended Rule 401, SCACR, to permit eligible law students to serve as mediators in certain matters.


The Chief Justice has issued an administrative order regarding the appointment of counsel in post-conviction relief cases.


At 3:00 p.m. on Wednesday, November 5, 2008, the Commission and selected speakers from the seven regional hearings will address the Supreme Court of South Carolina.


The Court has today released a statement regarding the ABA Reports on the Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Systems in South Carolina. In addition, the Court has issued a request for the submission of written comments regarding the recommendations made by the ABA’s consultation team. 


Rule 402 has been amended to include law school completion requirements to take the bar examination. Additionally, the rule has been amended to establish provisions relating to bar admission ceremonies.


The Court has amended Rule 415, SCACR, to allow retired and inactive lawyers to provide legal services to organizations receiving IOLTA grants.


Videoconferencing from Magistrate and Municipal Courts to Detention Facilities Statewide


The Court has amended several regulations in Appendix G to Part IV, SCACR, concerning the discipline of third party neutrals.


The Supreme Court has amended Rule 607, SCACR, to provide for a fee schedule for requests to provide transcripts on an expedited basis.


The Court has made several amendments to Appendix E to Part IV, SCACR, concerning the standards and procedures for certification, recertification, and decertification of certified specialists.


On Thursday, August 21, 2008, Chief Justice Jean Hoefer Toal addressed members of South Carolina's Judiciary at the Annual Judicial Conference.


IT IS ORDERED that the Honorable Frank R. Addy, Jr., Probate Judge for Greenwood County; is hereby assigned to preside over the Eighth Circuit Adult Drug Court Program.


It is ordered that the Order of this Court dated October 27, 1992 providing for a uniform Minor Settlement Procedure is superseded and the Minor Settlement Procedure is amended as summarized.


IT IS ORDERED that beginning January 1, 2009, for a trial period of one year, there is hereby established the Multi-Week Trial Docket for the Ninth, Fourteenth, and Fifteenth Judicial Circuits, and terms of this court shall be scheduled for Beaufort, Charleston, and Horry counties.


Pursuant to the provisions of S.C. Const. Art. V § 4, IT IS ORDERED that Form SCCA 426ABCD, Family Court Order – Protection from Domestic Abuse Act, bearing a revision date of (7/08), is approved for use in the Family Courts of South Carolina.


By Notice dated March 19, 2008, the Supreme Court scheduled a public hearing at 11:00 a.m. on July 9, 2008, regarding proposed amendments to Rule 5 of the South Carolina Rules of Criminal Procedure, Rules 16 and 26 of the South Carolina Rules of Civil Procedure, and Rules 701, 702, and 703 of the South Carolina Rules of Evidence.


With the adoption of Rule 609, SCACR, the Supreme Court has created a Rules Advisory Committee. This Committee will be responsible for making recommendations regarding the adoption or amendment of rules governing the administration of or the practice and procedure before the trial courts of this State.


IT IS ORDERED that Form SCCA/217, General Sessions Sentence Sheet, bearing a revision date of 07/2008, is approved for use in the Circuit Courts of South Carolina and replaces SCCA 217, bearing a revision date of 10/2007.


IT IS ORDERED that the judges of the magisterial courts listed below be designated as Chief Judge or Associate Chief Judge for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts in the counties in which they hold office.


IT IS ORDERED that SCCA SCRCP Form 4, Judgment in a Civil Case, bearing a revision date of 06/2008, is approved for use in the Circuit Courts of South Carolina and replaces SCCA SCRCP Form 4, bearing a revision date of 12/2007.


In an article dated March 24, 2008, The State Newspaper recognized Nancy Self of West Columbia.


Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the magistrates courts and municipal courts.


Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, family courts, magistrates courts and municipal courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds.


Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, and family courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds


On June 18, 2008, in a special ceremony held in the Supreme Court Courtroom, the Honorable John Willliamson Kittredge was sworn in as a Justice of the South Carolina Supreme Court.


Judicial Elections
(05/21/2008)

Results of judicial elections held May 21, 2008


IT IS ORDERED that Form SCCA 405F, Motion and Affidavit to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, bearing a revision date of (5/08), is approved for use in the Family Courts of South Carolina.


IT IS ORDERED that in all cases in which ADR shall be ordered in the courts of this state, the Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution Rules shall apply.


Rule Amendments
(05/01/2008)

The South Carolina Appellate Court Rules, the South Carolina Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution Rules, and the South Carolina Rules of Magistrate Court have been amended.


Judge Leslie Kirkland Riddle has been awarded the 2008 National Court Appointed Special Advocate (CASA) Judge of the Year


The results of the February 2008 Bar Examination have been posted on the Bar Admissions page.


The above link will take you to pass rate information for the February 2008 Bar Examination.


The results of the February 2008 Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, April 25, 2008


The Court has agreed to the Bar's proposed amendments to the Bar Constitution, which: (1) allow notice of meetings to be served electronically; (2) eliminate the positions of Assistant Secretary and Assistant Treasurer; and (3) formally recognize the current practice of electing ABA State Bar Delegates in staggered terms.


SCCA 430, Financial Declaration has been reformatted to improve the use of the form.


The Civil Action Coversheet, SCCA/234, bearing a revision date of 04/2008 is approved for use in the Circuit Courts of the State of South Carolina.


Form SCCA 430, Financial Declaration, bearing a revision date of (3/08), is approved for use in the Family Courts of South Carolina.


The Supreme Court has amended Rule 30 of the Rules for Lawyer Disciplinary Enforcement (RLDE) to add a provision dealing with a suspended or disbarred lawyer’s failure to timely surrender his or her certificate to practice law or to timely file the affidavit required by Rule 30. Further, the order adopting the amendment contains requirements for suspended or disbarred lawyers who have not timely complied with the requirements of Rule 30 prior to this amendment.


The Supreme Court has amended the list of subjects tested on the Bar Examination.


As reflected in the Notice, the Supreme Court of South Carolina has requested written comments and has scheduled a public hearing on proposed amendments to the South Carolina Rules of Civil Procedure, the South Carolina Rules of Criminal Procedure and the South Carolina Rules of Evidence.


The Supreme Court of South Carolina is considering adopting guidelines or “best practices” for attorneys conducting residential or commercial real estate closings in South Carolina. The guidelines were developed by the South Carolina Bar Task Force on Closing Responsibilities.


Chief Justice Jean H. Toal delivered her State of the Judiciary address to the General Assembly today, February 13, 2008, at 12:00 p.m.


Chief Justice Jean H. Toal will deliver her State of the Judiciary address to the General Assembly on February 13, 2008 at 12:00 p.m.


Judicial Elections
(02/06/2008)

Results of judicial elections held February 6, 2008. 


Pursuant to South Carolina Code of Laws, § 16 25 100, magistrates and municipal court judges shall receive continuing legal education on issues concerning domestic violence.


IT IS ORDERED that Forms SCCA/487(a), SCCA/487(b), SCCA/487(c), and SCCA/487(d), each bearing a date of 1/2008, are approved for use in the Family Courts of South Carolina.


The SC Court Interpreter Certification Program will be holding two workshops in Charleston in February and March, to offer anyone interested in becoming certified the opportunity to prepare for the Written and Oral Examinations.


The South Carolina Access to Justice Commission will hold seven regional public hearings at county courthouses beginning in March and culminating in a final hearing in the fall at the South Carolina Supreme Court.


Supreme Court order regarding legal rate of interest for judgments and money decrees.


Attached is a copy of an Order of Chief Justice Jean H. Toal, dated December 21, 2007. The Order designates Chief Judges and Associate Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts.