2007-01-22-01
The Supreme Court of South Carolina
Re: Mandatory Criminal Domestic Violence Training
ORDER
Pursuant to South Carolina Code of Laws, Section 16 25 100, magistrates and municipal court judges shall receive continuing legal education on issues concerning domestic violence. The frequency and content of the continuing legal education is to be determined by South Carolina Court Administration at the direction of the Chief Justice of the South Carolina Supreme Court. In order to fulfill this requirement, each magistrate or municipal court judge shall attend at least one seminar approved by South Carolina Court Administration during the calendar year 2007. Attached and incorporated by reference is a list of approved seminars for both magistrate and municipal court judges. Additional seminars may also be approved throughout the year.
THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, during the calendar year 2007, all magistrate and municipal court judges must attend at least one domestic violence seminar approved by South Carolina Court Administration. A list of dates and locations for seminars already approved is attached and made a part of this order. Any individual who serves as both a magistrate and municipal court judge shall only be required to attend one seminar.
This order is effective immediately and remains in effect unless amended or revoked by further order of the Chief Justice.
s/Jean Hoefer Toal Jean Hoefer Toal Chief Justice |
January 22, 2007
Columbia, South Carolina
Approved Seminars for Domestic Violence Training
For Magistrate and Municipal Court Judges
2007 Calendar Year
Magistrates and Municipal Court Judges
January 30, 2007 | SC Commission on Prosecution Coordination | Edgefield, SC |
February 15, 2007 | Annual Staff/Judges Seminar | Myrtle Beach, SC |
March 8, 2007 | STOP Training, Attorney General’s Office | Columbia, SC |
March 15, 2007 | RDV Training, Attorney General’s Office | Marion County |
March 28, 2007 | Magistrate and Municipal Court Judges Orientation School (New Judges Only) |
Criminal Justice Academy |
April 5, 2007 | STOP Training, Attorney General’s Office | York County |
May 17, 2007 | RDV Training, Attorney General’s Office | Dillon County |
May 24, 2007 | STOP Training, Attorney General’s Office | Bluffton, SC |
June 21, 2007 | RDV Training, Attorney General’s Office | Florence County |
July 19, 2007 | STOP Training, Attorney General’s Office | Orangeburg, SC |
August 1, 2007 (Date Tentative) |
Magistrate and Municipal Court Judges Orientation School (New Judges Only) |
Criminal Justice Academy |
August 23, 2007 | STOP Training, Attorney General’s Office | Greenville County |
November 1, 2007 | STOP Training, Attorney General’s Office | Horry County |
Magistrates Only
November 2, 2007 | Magistrate’s Mandatory School | Columbia, SC |