Lawyers Suspended for Failure to Pay License Fees
The Supreme Court has issued an order administratively suspending lawyers under Rule 419, SCACR, for failing to pay license fees and assessments to the South Carolina Bar.
2009-04-13-01
The Supreme Court of South Carolina
RE: Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay South Carolina
Bar License Fees and Assessment
ORDER
The South Carolina Bar has furnished the attached list of lawyers who were administratively suspended from the practice of law on February 1, 2009, under Rule 419(b)(1), SCACR, and remain suspended as of April 1, 2009. Pursuant to Rule 419(e)(1), SCACR, these lawyers are hereby suspended from the practice of law by this Court. They shall surrender their certificates to practice law in this State to the Clerk of this Court by May 1, 2009.
Any petition for reinstatement must be made in the manner specified by Rule 419(f), SCACR. If a lawyer suspended by this order does not seek reinstatement within three (3) years of the date this order, the lawyer’s membership in the South Carolina Bar shall be terminated and the lawyer’s name will be removed from the roll of attorneys in this State. Rule 419(g), SCACR.
These lawyers are warned that any continuation of the practice of law in this State after being suspended by the provisions of Rule 419, SCACR, or this order is the unauthorized practice of law, and will subject them to disciplinary action under Rule 413, SCACR, and could result in a finding of criminal or civil contempt by this Court. Further, any lawyer who is aware of any violation of this suspension shall report the matter to the Office of Disciplinary Counsel. Rule 8.3, Rules of Professional Conduct for Lawyers, Rule 407, SCACR.
IT IS SO ORDERED.
s/Jean H. Toal C.J. s/John H. Waller, Jr. J. s/Costa M. Pleicones J. s/Donald W. Beatty J. s/John W. Kittredge J. |
Columbia, South Carolina
April 13, 2009
Attorneys Suspended for Nonpayment of 2009 License Fees
As of April 1, 2009
Todd R. Amacher
4502 Scenic Dr.
Rowlett, TX 75088-6877
David P. Bains
2504 Squaw Crk.
Clermont, FL 34711-6789
Mark E. Carlson
Andresen & Arronte, PLLC
2319 Crescent Ave
Charlotte, NC 28207-1501
John E. Carter
14125 Monticastillo Place
Charlotte, NC 28278
Renee A. Cobb
462 Mock Mill Rd.
Statesville, NC 28677
Michael J. Denning
Wright Express Corp.
97 Darling Ave.
South Portland, ME 04106
Jessica L. Dixon-Ramakrishna
2025 Kegsworth Dr.
Charlotte, NC 28273
Kenneth S. Drury
414 W. Vista Bonita St.
Azusa, CA 91702
John S. Egan
Frost Brown Todd
400 W. Market St., 32nd Floor
Louisville, KY 40202-3363
William Gardner
Tharpe & Howell
15250 Ventura Blvd.
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403
Billy R. Godwin Jr.
406 W. Broad St.
Dunn, NC 28334
Anastasia E. Gounaris
2805 River Park Dr.
Columbus, OH 43220
Eric P. Kelley
Law Office of Patrick J.T. Kelley
P.O. Box 773
Bluffton, SC 29910
Pete A. Lang
111 Clebourne St
Fort Mill, SC 29715-1758
Christine Latona
Campbell & Associates, P.A.
717 East Boulevard
Charlotte, NC 28203
Annick I. Lenoir-Peek
10650 Culebra Rd., #104-547
San Antonio, TX 78251
Matthew B. Macdonald
209 N. Locksley Dr.
Lafayette, LA 70508-4019
William M. Maloof Jr
Maloof & Hendrick, LLC
215 N. McDonough St.
Atlanta, GA 30030
Pamela S. McAvoy
4736 Island View Dr.
Oshkosh, WI 54901-1305
Joseph P. Mizzell, Jr.
700 Greenlawn Dr., Apt 2003
Columbia, SC 29006
Terry T. Moyer
Milliken Research Corp.
P.O. Box 1927 (M-495)
Spartanburg, SC 29304
Kenneth E. Nowell
401 48th St.
Vienna, WV 26105
James W. Preacher
13014 Whisper Sound Dr.
Tampa, FL 33624
Mitzi A. Presnell
2500 Cloister Dr.
Charlotte, NC 28211
Tracey M. Roberts
240 Mercer St., Apt. ME-0603A
New York, NY 10012-1558
Edmund H. Robinson
68 Clinton Ave.
Staten Island, NY 10301
Charles T. Roy Jr.
39 McDaniel Ct.
Greenville, SC 29605
Steven M. Rubinstein
1565 Sam Rittenberg Blvd.
Charleston, SC 29407
Laura Rummans
Ruden McClosky Smith Schuster &
222 Lakeview Ave., Ste. 800
W. Palm Beach, FL 33401
Scott E. Shealy
Citizen's Fuel Co.
P.O. Box 2805
Asheville, NC 28802
Howard R. Smith
3231 Sunset Blvd Ste D
West Columbia, SC 29169
Albert M. Sparrow Jr.
306 Main St.
Greenwood, SC 29646
Sara B. Stewart
2699 Trotter Rd.
Florence, SC 29501-1972
Randall S. Strause
Hectus & Strause, PLLC
804 Stone Creek Pkwy., Ste. 1
Louisville, KY 40223-5361
Christine B. Stump
CLO, Mountaintop Dev., LLC
295 Seven Farms Dr. Ste. C-138
Charleston, SC 29492
Janis N. Taylor
835 Jenks Ave.
Panama City, FL 32401-2531
John S. Tracy
Tracy Law Firm, PA
1511 Prosperity Farms Rd.
Lake Park, FL 33403
Michael W. Tye
AT&T
2000 W. AT&T Center Dr. 2A82
Hoffman Estates, IL 60192
Nicholas H. Van Slyck
PMB140
1357 Ashford Ave.
San Juan, PR 00907
Damon C. Watson
Fattoc, LLC
345 N. Maple Dr., Ste. 209
Beverly Hills, CA 90210
David H. Wersan
1413 Pelham Road
Harrisburg, PA 17110-3023
Wyatt B. Willoughby
P.O. Box 14369
Myrtle Beach, SC 29587-4369
Margaret Wolfe
2117 East Lane
Camden, SC 29020-2012
Douglas R. Wright
P.O. Box 840
Tupper Lake, NY 12986