Court News ...
Filing and Release of Opinions During Holiday Period
Due to the legal holidays during the week of December 23, 2013, and the week of December 30, 2013, opinions may be filed and released at 10:00 a.m. on Monday, December 23, 2013; 2:00 p.m. on Friday, December 27, 2013; and 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, January 2, 2014. Regardless of whether any opinions are in fact released at these times, no Advance Sheet will be published during the period of December 23, 2013, through January 1, 2014. After January 2, 2014, the filing and release of opinions will return to the schedule specified at www.sccourts.org/whatsnew/displaywhatsnew.cfm?indexID=790.