PREV | May 2017 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Monday, May 1, 2017 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-000310 George M. Hood, Appellant,
v.
Jasper County, Respondent. Lucy Clark Sanders and Nancy Bloodgood, both of Bloodgood & Sanders, LLC, of Mt. Pleasant , for Appellant. Christopher Wofford Johnson and T. Foster Haselden, both of Gignilliat Savitz & Bettis, LLP, of Columbia, for Respondent. In this appeal arising from the termination of George Hood as the deputy county administrator, Hood appeals arguing the trial court erred in: (1) holding Article I Section 8 of the South Carolina Constitution does not apply to counties; (2) holding a county council operating under the council/administrator form of government can abolish the deputy county administrator position; (3) not addressing the propriety of the county's budget amendment enacted midyear for the purpose of abolishing the county job position; and (4) holding that county council can terminate the employment of an employee who reports to the county administrator, under the county/administrator form of government, because the employee is an at-will employee. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-000513 The State, Respondent,
v.
Shane Adam Burdette, Appellant. Appellate Defender Susan Barber Hackett, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Susannah Rawl Cole, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Shane Adam Burdette appeals his convictions of voluntary manslaughter and possession of a weapon during the commission of a violent crime, arguing the trial court erred in (1) admitting his custodial statements, (2) refusing to qualify his witness as an expert in ballistics, (3) instructing the jury that malice may be inferred from the use of a deadly weapon, and (4) sentencing him to consecutive terms of imprisonment. |
|
Tuesday, May 2, 2017 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001556 Jimmy Boykin, Sammy Boykin a/k/a Sandy H. Boykin, Sr., and Kenny Boykin, Plaintiffs,
v.
Zady R. Burton, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Helen L. Burton, and Sandy Boykin a/k/a Sandy H. Boykin, Jr., Defendants,
Of Whom Zady R. Burton, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Helen L. Burton is the Appellant and Jimmy Boykin is the Respondent. Roger B. Jellenik, of Roger B. Jellenik Attorney at Law, of Camden, for Appellant. Moultrie B. Burns, Jr., of Savage Royall & Sheheen, of Camden, for Respondents. In this action seeking to enforce the terms of a mediation, Burton asserts the circuit court erred in requiring him to convey property to Boykin because the transaction was not included within the mediation agreement. Burton also argues the mediation agreement is unenforceable pursuant to Rule 43(k), SCRCP. Finally, Burton asserts the circuit court should have granted its motion to compel discovery. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2014-002376 The State, Respondent,
v.
Mario Valerio Gonzalez Hernandez, Appellant. Michael J. Anzelmo and Graham R. Billings, both of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General Vann Henry Gunter, Jr., both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor David Matthew Stumbo, of Greenwood, for Respondent. Mario Valerio-Gonzalez Hernandez appeals from his conviction for CSC with a minor in the second degree, asserting the trial court erred in (1) admitting expert testimony concerning DNA analysis that was irrelevant and invited the jury to speculate, (2) admitting hearsay testimony from an investigator regarding what an interpreter told him Hernandez said in Spanish, and (3) admitting expert testimony that corroborated the minor victim's details of the alleged assault, improperly bolstering the victim's testimony. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2014-002181 The State, Respondent,
v.
Marquis Spencer McDonald, Appellant. Nicholas Daniel Mermiges of Law Offices of Nick Mermiges, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka,and Assistant Attorney General Sherrie Butterbaugh, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Jimmy A. Richardson, II, of Conway,C for Respondent. In this criminal action, Marquis Spencer McDonald appeals his convictions for murder and armed robbery, for which McDonald was sentenced to 45 years and 30 years respectively, to run concurrently. McDonald argues the circuit court erred in permitting two witnesses to testify regarding cell phone data without qualifying them as experts and allowing evidence of his felony conviction to be introduced to the jury. |
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001457 The Spriggs Group, PC., Respondent,
v.
Gene R. Slivka, Appellant. Robert T. Lyles, Jr. of Lyles & Lyles, LLC, of Charleston, for Appellant. James Atkinson Bruorton, IV, and Timothy James Wood Muller, both of Rosen Rosen & Hagood, LLC of Charleston, for Respondent. In this action for foreclosure of a mechanic's lien and breach of contract, Gene Slivka argues the circuit court erred in awarding The Spriggs Group, P.C. attorney's fees. |
|
Wednesday, May 3, 2017 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001807 Winrose Homeowners' Association, Inc. and Regime Solutions LLC, Respondents,
v.
Devery A. Hale and Tina T. Hale, Appellants. Phillip Anthony Curiale, of Columbia, for Appellants. Brian L. Boger, of Columbia, for Appellants. Stephanie Carol Trotter, of McCabe, Trotter & Beverly, P.C., of Columbia, for Respondent Winrose Homeowners' Association, Inc.. Eric Christopher Hale, of Clarkson Law Firm, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondent Regime Solutions, LLC. Appellants Devery A. Hale and Tina T. Hale appeal the master-in-equity's order denying their motion to set aside a foreclosure sale because the successful bid shocked the conscience and violated principles of equity. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2014-001501 The State, Respondent,
v.
Wayland Purnell, Appellant. Appellate Defener Lara Mary Caudy, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General Vann Henry Gunter, Jr., both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Daniel Edward Johnson, of Columbia, for Respondent. Wayland Purnell appeals his convictions for lewd act upon a child and first degree criminal sexual conduct with a minor. Purnell argues the trial court (1) improperly qualified the State's expert witness in the field of child sexual abuse dynamics; and (2) improperly admitted video recordings of the victims' forensic interviews pursuant to Section 17-23-175 of the South Carolina Code because the statute violates the Sixth Amendment's Confrontation Clause. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2014-002554 The State, Respondent,
v.
Tony Vernon Jordan, Appellant. Appellate Defender Kathrine Haggard Hudgins, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, and Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor David Matthew Stumbo, of Greenwood, for Respondent. In this appeal from Abbeville County, Tony Vernon Jordan appeals his convictions for murder and possession of a weapon during the commission of a violent crime. He asserts the trial court erred in finding text messages admissible at trial. |
|
Thursday, May 4, 2017 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-002406 The State, Appellant,
v.
Shelby Jean Lorusso, Respondent. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General William M. Blitch, Jr., both of Columbia, for Appellant. Christopher A. Wellborn of Christopher A. Wellborn P.A., of Rock Hill, for Respondent. The State appeals the circuit court's order affirming the dismissal of Shelby Jean Lorusso's charge for driving under the influence, first offense. The magistrate court dismissed the charge for failure to comply with section 56-5-2953(A) of the South Carolina Code (Supp. 2016). On appeal, the State argues the circuit court erred in (1) finding the video produced by the State did not comply with section 56-5-2953(A) and (2) failing to consider the totality-of-the-circumstances exception under section 56-5-2953(B) of the South Carolina Code (Supp. 2016). |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-000909 The State, Respondent,
v.
Stanley Lamar Wrapp, Appellant. Appellate Defender Benjamin John Tripp, of Beaufort, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General John Benjamin Aplin, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor David Matthew Stumbo, of Greenwood, for Respondent. Stanley Wrapp appeals his convictions for possession with intent to distribute (PWID) cocaine base and driving under suspension (DUS). Wrapp was sentenced to twenty-years' imprisonment on the PWID charge and sixty-days' imprisonment for DUS. On appeal, Wrapp argues the trial court erred by trying him in absentia when the court failed to make specific findings as to whether he had notice of the trial date or whether his absence was voluntary. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001115 Prescott & Sons Construction, LLC, Respondent,
v.
Larry Rogers and Michelle Rogers, Appellants. M. David Scott of Jordan, Rauton & Scott, LLC, of Lexington, for Appellants. Lir Patrick Derieg, of Columbia, for Respondent. In this breach of contract case arising out of renovations to their home, Appellants appeal a jury verdict in favor of their builder, Respondent. Appellants assert the trial court erred in: (1) denying their JNOV motion, as there was insufficient evidence to support the jury's verdict; (2) denying them a new trial; (3) admitting as exhibits certain emails sent by Respondent to them because the emails were never provided in discovery, and (4) granting attorney's fees without making the required findings of fact. |
|
Tuesday, May 9, 2017 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-000170 The State, Respondent,
v.
Odom Bryant, Appellant. Reid T. Sherard of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Greenville, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Caroline M. Scrantom, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Jimmy A. Richardson, II, of Conway, for Respondent. Odom Bryant appeals his convictions for two counts of murder, arguing the circuit court erred in denying his motion for mistrial after a prosecution witness testified regarding the status of a conspiracy co-defendant's case. Additionally, Bryant maintains the circuit court erred by improperly shifting the burden during the State's Batson motion and by seating a juror Bryant attempted to strike. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001505 John Doe 2, Appellant,
v.
The Citadel, Respondent. William Mullins McLeod, Jr. and Jacqueline LaPan Edgerton, both of McLeod Law Group, LLC, of Charleston, for Appellant. M. Dawes Cooke, Jr., Randell Croft Stoney, Jr., and John William Fletcher, all of Barnwell Whaley Patterson & Helms, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondent. In this civil matter, John Doe 2 appeals the circuit court's grant of summary judgment to The Citadel, arguing the court erred in dismissing his claims of (1) negligence/gross negligence and (2) outrage. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001920 Mother Doe A, Appellant,
v.
The Citadel, Respondent. Allan Poe Sloan, III, Joseph C. Wilson, IV, and Gregg E. Meyers, all of Pierce, Herns, Sloan & Wilson, LLC, of Charleston, for Appellant. Jeffrey R. Anderson, of Saint Paul MN, for Appellant. Kristen Bates Fehsenfeld, of Charleston, for Appellant. M. Dawes Cooke, Jr., Randell Croft Stoney, Jr., and John William Fletcher, all of Barnwell Whaley Patterson & Helms, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondent. In this civil matter, Mother Doe A appeals the circuit court's grant of summary judgment to The Citadel, arguing the court erred in dismissing her claims for (1) the loss of her minor son's services, (2) outrage, (3) and civil conspiracy. |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2011-198986 Wachesaw Plantation East Community Services Association, Inc., Respondent,
v.
Todd C. Alexander, Appellant. Charles T. Smith, of Georgetown, for Appellant. Stephanie Carol Trotter of McCabe, Trotter & Beverly, P.C., of Columbia, for Respondent Wachesaw Plantation East Community Service Association. Jack M. Scoville, Jr,. of Georgetown, for Respondent William George, Third Party Bidder. In this foreclosure action, Appellant Todd C. Alexander challenges the denial of his motion to vacate the judicial sale of his real property. Appellant argues the Master-in-Equity should have vacated the sale because (1) the price was inadequate, (2) the sale constituted a forfeiture, (3) the third party bidder was unjustly enriched by the sale, and (4) Appellant timely redeemed the property. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2014-002254 BLH by parents/ general guardians Kenneth and Angela Hensley, and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Respondent,
v.
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Appellant. Andrew F. Lindemann and Joel Steve Hughes, both of Davidson & Lindemann, PA, of Columbia, for Appellant. Charles J. Hodge of Hodge Law, PC, of Spartanburg, for Respondent. Timothy Ryan Langley of Hodge & Langley Law Firm, PC, of Spartanburg, for Respondent. James Fletcher Thompson of James Fletcher Thompson, LLC, of Spartanburg, for Respondent. In this class action litigation, the South Carolina Department of Social Services appeals several circuit court orders arguing, (1) the circuit court's class certification and notification process violates statutory and constitutional rights of the adoptive children, the adoptive parents, and the biological parents, (2) the issues of confidentiality, privacy, and due process are immediately appealable, and (3) the circuit court erred in certifying the class when the class representative failed to prove the necessary element of commonality. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-000730 TD Bank, NA, successor by merger with Carolina First Bank, Respondent,
v.
David H. Jacobs, Appellant.
TD Bank, NA, successor by merger with Carolina First Bank, Respondent,
v.
David H. Jacobs and James A. McFarland, Defendants,
Of Whom David H. Jacobs is the Appellant. Charles E. Carpenter, Jr. of Carpenter Appeals & Trial Support, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellant. Gerald D. Jowers, of Columbia, for Appellant. John T. Moore, Paul Thomas Collins, Jody Alan Bedenbaugh, and Allen Mattison Bogan, all of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Respondent. David H. Jacobs appeals an order of the circuit court that denied his motion for a new trial arguing the circuit court erred in (1) excluding evidence about the Troubled Asset Relief Program and the government bailout, (2) excluding evidence about the "Heron Lakes I" note sale, and (3) excluding the aforementioned evidence when it had previously been accepted during a summary judgment hearing and was critical to proving his affirmative defenses. |
Tuesday, May 2, 2017 | |
Courtroom II
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001183 Camille Hodge, Jr., as personal representative of the estate of Mable Hodge, Respondent,
v.
UniHealth Post-Acute Care of Bamberg, LLC f/k/a Bamberg County Nursing Center; United Health Services of South Carolina, Inc.; United Health Services, Inc.; UHS-Pruitt Holdings, Inc. a/k/a UHS-Pruitt Corp.; R. Dale Padgett, M.D., P.A.; and Dr. Herbert A. Moskow; Defendants,
Of which UniHealth Post-Acute Care of Bamberg, LLC f/k/a Bamberg County Nursing Center; United Health Services of South Carolina, Inc.; United Health Services, Inc.; and UHS-Pruitt Holdings, Inc. a/k/a UHS-Pruitt Corp. are the Appellants.
Camille Hodge, Sr., Respondent,
v.
UniHealth Post-Acute Care of Bamberg, LLC f/k/a Bamberg County Nursing Center; United Health Services of South Carolina, Inc.; United Health Services, Inc.; UHS-Pruitt Holdings, Inc. a/k/a UHS-Pruitt Corp.; R. Dale Padgett, M.D., P.A.; and Dr. Herbert A. Moskow; Defendants,
Of which UniHealth Post-Acute Care of Bamberg, LLC f/k/a Bamberg County Nursing Center; United Health Services of South Carolina, Inc.; United Health Services, Inc.; and UHS-Pruitt Holdings, Inc. a/k/a UHS-Pruitt Corp. are the Appellants. Monteith Powell Todd and John Michael Montgomery, both of Sowell Gray Robinson Stepp & Laffitte, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellants. Robert E. Horner of Speed, Seta, Martin, Trivett & Stubley, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellants. Joseph Preston Strom and Bakari T. Sellers, both of Strom Law Firm, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondents. Wallace K. Lightsey and Meliah Bowers Jefferson, both of Wyche Law Firm, of Greenville, for Respondents. John Carroll Moylan, III, of Wyche Law Firm, of Columbia, for Respondents. In this medical malpractice case, the parties dispute whether an arbitration agreement applies. Appellants contend the circuit court erred in denying their motion to compel the deposition of one of the Respondents, whose testimony they assert is relevant to whether the arbitration agreement is binding. They further argue the circuit court erred in denying their motion to compel arbitration. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-002025 William Huck and Dianne Huck, Respondents,
v.
Oakland Wings, LLC d/b/a Wild Wing Café, Civil Site Environmental, Inc., Oakland Properties, LLC, Chandler Construction Services, Inc., Avtex Commercial Properties, Inc., Defendants,
Of Whom Avtex Commercial Properties, Inc. is the Appellant. Kenneth Michael Barfield and Diane Summers Clarke, II, both of Barnwell Whaley Patterson & Helms, LLC, of Charleston, for Appellant. Edward K. Pritchard, III, and Elizabeth Fraysure Fulton, both of Pritchard Law Group LLC, of Charleston, for Respondents. In this appeal arising from a premises liability lawsuit, Avtex Commercial Properties, Inc. argues the trial court erred in denying its motion to disclose settlement, motion for set-off, and motions to alter or amend judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e), SCRCP. |
|
Wednesday, May 3, 2017 | |
Courtroom II
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001467 Michael Ashburn, Appellant,
v.
April Rogers and South Carolina Department of Social Services Child Support Division, Respondents. Sharnaisha Naki Richardson-Bax of The Bax Law Firm, PA, of Beaufort, for Appellant. Harry O. Shaw, III, of Charleston, for Respondent South Carolina Department of Social Services Child Support Division. Michael Ashburn appeals the family court's order denying relief from a previous order of paternity that found Ashburn to be the father of minor child E.A. (Child). Ashburn argues it is no longer equitable that the paternity order, wherein Ashburn acknowledged paternity of Child, have prospective application because genetic tests show Ashburn is not Child's biological father. He also argues the family court failed to (1) conduct an analysis on the potential adverse impact of the determination on the public interest and (2) consider the best interests of Child. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-001676 Stacey Sellers, Claimant, Respondent,
v.
Tech Service, Inc., Employer, and Builders Mutual Insurance Company, Carrier, Appellants. Richard C. Detwiler and Jacqueline Marie Pavlicek, both of Callison Tighe & Robinson, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellants. Robert Fredrick Goings of Goings Law Firm, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondent. In this appeal from the Appellate Panel of the South Carolina Workers' Compensation Commission (the Appellate Panel), Tech Services, Incorporated argues the Appellate Panel erred in (1) finding Stacey Sellers was a Tech Services employee, rather than an independent contractor, at the time of his injury and (2) basing its determination on immaterial information. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2015-000235 The State, Respondent,
v.
Bryant Christopher Gurley, Appellant. Jack B. Swerling, of Columbia, for Appellant. Katherine Carruth Goode, of Winnsboro, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General Jennifer Ellis Roberts, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Edgar Lewis Clements, III, of Florence, for Respondent. Bryant Gurley appeals his conviction of committing lewd act upon a child, arguing the trial court erred in: (1) admitting a video of the victim's forensic interview where the forensic interviewer allegedly bolstered victim's testimony; (2) qualifying the vicitm's counselor as an expert in "child sexual trauma" and allowing her to testify regarding the behavior of children who are victims of sexual assault; (3) admitting character evidence of the victim and the victim's mother that allegedly went beyond the scope of appropriate rebuttal evidence; and (4) allowing the introduction of victim's out-of-court statements, which allegedly constituted impermissible hearsay. Gurley contends he is entitled to a new trial based on the cumulative prejudice resulting from these multiple alleged errors. |
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
2014-002297 |
Neva Steffens, Appellant,
v.
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc., MERSCorps, Inc., American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. a/k/a Homeward Residential, Wells Fargo National Association, and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Defendants,
Of whom Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. a/k/a Homeward Residential, are the Respondents.
|
2015-001336 |
Jose Juan Jimenez, Employee, Appellant,
v.
Kohler Company, Self-Insured Employer, Respondent.
|
2014-002483 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
John Henry Dial, Jr., Appellant.
|
2015-001185 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Jonathan M. Holder, Appellant.
|
2016-000423 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Willie Clarence Pitts, Appellant.
|
2015-001409 |
The State, Appellant,
v.
Charles Todd Burns, Respondent.
|
2016-000190 |
South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, Respondent,
v.
Blessed Births, Inc., d/b/a Blessed Births Family Wellness and Birth Center, Appellant.
|
2015-001761 |
John Alexander, 194748, Appellant,
v.
South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
2015-002653 |
Johnnie Mae Reed, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Sandra Gilbert, Appellant,
v.
CareNet, Inc. of Lancaster and Nimal A. Perera, M.D., Respondents.
|
2016-001386 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent,
v.
Tinisha Riley, Anthony Davis, Robert Beauford, and Jamesetta Riley-Reid, Defendants,
Of whom Anthony Davis is the Appellant.
In the interest of minors under the age of eighteen.
|
2015-001814 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Austin McQuarters, Appellant.
|
2014-002317 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Maria Moyao, Appellant.
|
2015-002627 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Marquise Terrel Green, Appellant.
|
2016-000259 |
Jerry Hogan, Respondent,
v.
Corder and Sons, Inc., Appellant.
|
2014-002775 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Dameon Myers, Appellant.
|
2015-002214 |
Quintin Linen, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2016-001043 |
In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Jason Bodie, Appellant.
|
2015-000306 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Kadrin Rajun Singleton, Appellant.
|
2014-002340 |
The City of Rock Hill, Appellant,
v.
Brenda Stroupe, Respondent.
|
2015-002249 |
Brysen Carson, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2016-001056 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Ebony Evelyn Castro, Appellant.
|
2016-001185 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Daniel Young, Appellant.
|
2015-002495 |
A. Marion Stone, III, Respondent,
v.
Susan B. Thompson, Appellant.
|
2015-000433 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Rodriquez J. Wolfe, Appellant.
|
2015-002481 |
Charles Taylor, Appellant,
v.
Stop 'N' Save, Inc., d/b/a El Cheapo Plus #7 and Roy Rahal, Respondents.
|
2014-002351 |
In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Alton Chisolm, Appellant.
|
2015-001662 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Dean Nelson Seagers, Appellant.
|
2016-000675 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Rasheed Tamir Glover, Appellant.
|
2014-002680 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Darryl Vincent Jones, Appellant.
|
2015-001029 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Dameon Lamar Thompson, Appellant.
|
2015-001282 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Christopher Eric Mejean, Appellant.
|
2015-002604 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Jerry Lewis Gardner, Jr., Appellant.
|
2015-002213 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Richard Earl Tedford, Appellant.
|
2015-001112 |
South Carolina Federal Credit Union, Respondent,
v.
Dorothy Harley Sistrunk a/k/a Dorothy Harley-Sistrunk a/k/a Dorothy A. Harley a/k/a Dorothy Sistrunk, Appellant.
|