Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Site Map | Feedback
Court News
2012-05-03-01

The Supreme Court of South Carolina

RE:  Lawyers Suspended by the Commission on Continuing Legal Education and Specialization
The Commission on Continuing Legal Education and Specialization has furnished the attached list of lawyers who have been administratively suspended from the practice of law pursuant to Rule 419(b)(2), SCACR, since April 1, 2012.  This list is being published pursuant to Rule 419(d)(2), SCACR.  If these lawyers are not reinstated by the Commission by June 1, 2012, they will be suspended by order of the Supreme Court and will be required to surrender their certificates to practice law in South Carolina.  Rule 419(e)(2), SCACR.

Columbia, South Carolina
May 3, 2012

LAWYERS SUSPENDED FOR NON-COMPLIANCE
WITH MCLE REGULATIONS FOR THE
2011-2012 REPORTING PERIOD
AS OF MAY 2, 2012

Nancy B. Alston
PO Box 446
Irmo, SC 29063

J. Reid Anderegg
PO Box 73129
North Charleston, SC 29415

James R. Berry
PO Box 186
Cottageville, SC  29435

William A. Boyd
302 Main Street
Andrews, SC 29510
INTERIM SUSPENSION (7/14/11)

James Michael Brown
102 Greenbow Court
Columbia, SC 29212
INTERIM SUSPENSION (4/13/11)

E. W. Cromartie II
PO Box 8417
Columbia, SC  29202
INTERIM SUSPENSION (3/9/10)

Mark F. Dahle
PO Box 6629
Lakeland, FL 33807
ONE YEAR SUSPENSION (7/25/11)

Eric J. Davidson
1800 North Charles Street, Suite 400
Baltimore, MD 21201

Margaret L. Drake
3722 Heyward Street
Columbia, SC  29205

Douglas F. Gay
PO Box 10506
Rock Hill, SC  29731
INTERIM SUSPENSION (1/13/12)

Donna S. Givens
125 Misty Oaks Place
Lexington, SC 29072
9-MONTH SUSPENSION (2/7/11)

Chad B. Hatley
PO Box 51
North Myrtle Beach, SC 29597
INTERIM SUSPENSION (9/28/11)

Christopher M. Hill
2672 Bayonne Avenue
Sullivan’s Island, SC 29482
SUSPENDED BY SC BAR (2/1/12)

Christine A. Hofmann
210 Joey Drive
St. Augustine, FL 32080

Gary D. James, Sr.
PO Box 806
North Myrtle Beach, SC 29597
INTERIM SUSPENSION (11/15/11)

J. Keith Jones
128 South Tryon Street, Suite 1800
Charlotte, NC 28202

Robert J. Klug, Sr.
1558 Chalk Avenue
Blue Bell, PA 19422

George K. Macklin
150 Cartright Street
Charleston, SC 29492
SUSPENDED BY SC BAR (2/1/12)

PAGE 2

Wilton Darnell Newton
PO Box 887
Easley, SC 29641
INTERIM SUSPENSION (11/17/11)

Anthony C. Odom
262 Eastgate Drive, PMB 185
Aiken, SC 29803
INTERIM SUSPENSION (5/17/06)

Alice Jefferies Perkins
PO Box 3527
West Columbia, SC 29169

Michael J. Pitch
PO Box 11332
Columbia, SC 29211
SUSPENDED BY SC BAR (2/1/12)

Richard J. Raeon
253 de la Gaye Point
Beaufort, SC 29902
SUSPENDED BY SC BAR (2/1/12)

Christopher B. Roberts
100 Whitsett Street
Greenville, SC  29601
INTERIM SUSPENSION (9/24/10)

Sara Jayne Rogers
347 Southport Drive
Summerville, SC 29483
INTERIM SUSPENSION (12/9/11)

Chavvah P. Sanders
4500 Bowling Boulevard, Suite 200
Louisville, KY 40207

Michael D. Shavo
4017 Yale Avenue
Columbia, SC 29205
INTERIM SUSPENSION (9/22/09)

Paul K. Simons, Jr.
111 Park Avenue, SW
Aiken, SC 29801

Jeffery Glenn Smith
171 Church Street, Suite 160
Charleston, SC 29401
INTERIM SUSPENSION (1/13/12)

James H. Swick
1421 Bull Street
Columbia, SC 29201
SUSPENDED BY SC BAR (2/1/12)

Andrea L. Taylor
2027 Country Manor Drive
Mt. Pleasant, SC 29466
SUSPENDED BY SC BAR (2/1/12)

Ollie H. Taylor
2609 Atlantic Avenue, Suite 109
Raleigh, NC 27604

John Michael Turner, Jr.
1085 Shop Road, Apartment 436
Columbia, SC 29201

Deborah W. Witt
14525 Cabarrus Station Road
Midland, NC 28107
SUSPENDED BY SC BAR (2/1/12)

Ted W. Wooten III
8205 Dunwoody Place, Building 19
Atlanta, GA 30350