Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Site Map | Feedback
Court News

Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution Expanded to Additional Counties

Effective with cases filed in the circuit court and the family court on or after June 1, 2013, the First, Second, Seventh, and Ninth circuits and Georgetown, Marion, Kershaw and Darlington counties join those counties previously designated by this Court for mandatory ADR.  Additionally, in Oconee and Pickens Counties cases filed in the circuit court on or after June 1, 2013 shall be subject to mandatory ADR.


2013-03-14-01

The Supreme Court of South Carolina

RE: Circuit Court Arbitration and Mediation and Family Court Mediation


ORDER


By order dated February 1, 2006, this Court adopted Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Rules which govern court-annexed ADR processes in South Carolina Circuit Courts in civil suits, and in South Carolina Family Courts in domestic relations actions in counties designated by this Court for mandatory ADR or as required by statute.

Effective with cases filed in the circuit court and the family court on or after June 1, 2013, the First, Second, Seventh, and Ninth circuits and Georgetown, Marion, Kershaw and Darlington counties join those counties previously designated by this Court for mandatory ADR.  Additionally, in Oconee and Pickens Counties cases filed in the circuit court on or after June 1, 2013 shall be subject to mandatory ADR. The counties designated by this Court for mandatory ADR are as follows:

Aiken Colleton Lexington
Allendale Darlington Marion
Anderson Dorchester  Oconee
Bamberg Florence Orangeburg
Barnwell Georgetown Pickens
Beaufort Greenville  Richland
Berkeley Hampton Spartanburg
Calhoun Horry Sumter 
Charleston Jasper Union
Cherokee Kershaw Williamsburg
Clarendon Lee York

Effective June 1, 2013, this order supersedes the order dated April 7, 2011 listing the counties previously designated for mandatory ADR.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

s/Jean H. Toal                                  C.J.

s/Costa M. Pleicones                          J.

s/Donald W. Beatty                             J.

s/John W. Kittredge                             J.

s/Kaye G. Hearn                                  J.

Columbia, South Carolina
March 14, 2013