Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
JUDICIAL DEPARTMENT
Site Map | Feedback
2010-04-22-01 (Superseded by Order 2013-03-07-02)

The Supreme Court of South Carolina

Re: Greenville County Mental Health Court


AMENDED
ORDER


NOW, THEREFORE, pursuant to Article V, Section 4 of the South Carolina Constitution,

IT IS ORDERED that this order shall supersede the order dated August 25, 2008 that established a mental health court program within Greenville County. This order shall extend the mental health court program until December 31, 2010 and all other provisions established within the February 2, 2006 order shall remain unchanged.

This order remains in effect unless amended or rescinded by the Chief Justice.

  s/Jean H. Toal
Jean H. Toal
Chief Justice of South Carolina

April 22, 2010
Columbia, South Carolina