PREV | May 2022 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2018-001294 Ex Parte: Robert Horne, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gus A. King, and Laura King, Appellants,
In Re: Gus A. King, Claimant, Appellant,
v.
Pierside Boatworks, Employer, and PMA Insurance Group, Carrier, Respondents. Allison Paige Sullivan, of Bluestein Thompson Sullivan LLC, of Columbia, for Appellants Robert Horne and Laura King. Reese McGregor Stidham, IV, of Howell and Christmas, LLC; Gary Christmas, of Christmas Injury Lawyers, LLC; and Paul J. Doolittle, of Anastopoulo Law Firm, LLC, all of Mt. Pleasant, for Appellant Gus A. King. Andrew N. Safran, of Columbia, for Appellants. Richard Daniel Addison, of Hall Booth Smith, PC, of Mt Pleasant, for Respondents. Robert Horne, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Gus A. King, and Laura King, appeal an order from the Appellate Panel of the Workers' Compensation Commission, arguing the Commission erred in finding the agreement the parties signed at mediation was not enforceable. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2019-001233 In the Matter of Lauren Martel, Esquire, Appellant. Dayne C. Phillips, of Columbia, for Appellant. Assistant Attorney General Mark Reynolds Farthing, of Columbia, for the State of South Carolina. Lauren Martel argues the family court erred in finding her in contempt of court because her conduct was not contemptuous. |
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2019-000674 Griffin Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc., Plaintiff,
v.
Tony Edward Sipe, Defendant,
and
Tony Edward Sipe, Respondent,
v.
Jason S. King, Appellant. Robert Thomas King, of King, Love, Hupfer & Nance LLC, of Florence, for Appellant. Wallace H. Jordan, Jr., of Wallace H. Jordan, Jr., P.C., of Florence; Sarah Crawford Campbell, of Campbell Law, LLC, of Chesterfield; and Melvin Wayne Cockrell, III, of Chesterfield, all for Respondent. In this breach of contract action initiated by Griffin Chrysler Dodge Jeep, Inc. against Respondent Tony E. Sipe, Appellant Jason S. King argues the special referee erred in denying King's motion for relief from default judgment under Rule 60(b), SCRCP. |
|
Thursday, May 12, 2022 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2019-001117 The State, Respondent,
v.
Amy N. Taylor, Appellant. Appellate Defender Jessica M. Saxon, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General W. Jeffrey Young, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Melody Jane Brown, and Tommy Evans, Jr., all of Columbia; and Solicitor Barry Joe Barnette, of Spartanburg, all for Respondent. Following her guilty plea to one count of murder, Amy N. Taylor appeals the circuit court's finding she did not meet her burden on proof to qualify for early parole eligibility after serving one-fourth of the sentence as a victim of domestic violence pursuant to section 16-25-90 of the South Carolina Code. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2019-001210 Alicia W. Cohen, Appellant,
v.
Wolanda A. Cohen, Respondent. William J. Clifford, of William J. Clifford, LLC, of N. Charleston, for Appellant. Alan David Toporek, of Uricchio Howe Krell Jacobson Toporek Theos & Keith, PA, of Charleston, for Respondent. In this domestic matter, Alicia Cohen appeals the family court's divorce decree, arguing the court erred in denying her request for alimony and attorney's fees. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2019-000403 The State, Respondent,
v.
Rakeem Jereal Jordan White, Appellant. Appellate Defender Lara Mary Caudy, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General W. Jeffrey Young, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Melody Jane Brown, and William Joseph Maye, all of Columbia; Solicitor James Strom Thurmond, Jr., of Aiken, all for Respondent. In this criminal appeal, Rakeem White appeals his conviction for murder and armed robbery. Specifically, White asserts the trial court erred in admitting a recorded telephone conversation between he and his girlfriend because the conversation was not relevant and any probative value of the conversation was substantially outweighed by the danger of unfair prejudice pursuant to Rule 403, SCRE. |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2019-001096 Jamar Markel Bronner, Appellant,
v.
GEICO Indemnity Company, Respondent. J. Olin McDougall, II, of McDougall Law Firm, LLC, of Beaufort; and Bert Glenn Utsey, III, of Clawson Fargnoli Utsey, LLC, of Charleston, both for Appellant. Thomas H. Milligan, of Milligan & Herns PC, of Mt. Pleasant, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | |
2018-001965 Jerry Howard Crawford, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evelyn Kay Crawford, Respondent,
v.
Celanese Corporation; Aurora Pump Company; Carrier Corporation; CNA Holdings LLC, f/k/a Celanese Corporation f/k/a Hoechst Celanese Corporation; Covil Corporation; Crane Co.; Daniel International Corporation f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc.; Flowserve Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Anchor/Darling Valve Company and individually and as successor-in-interest to Durco Pumps; Flowserve US Inc.; Fluor Constructors International, f/k/a Fluor Corporation; Fluor Constructors International, Inc.; Fluor Daniel Services Corporation; Fluor Enterprises, Inc.; Ford Motor Company; Genuine Parts Company, d/b/a Rayloc (a/k/a NAPA); The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Goulds Pumps, Inc.; Grinnell, LLC, f/k/a Grinnell Corp, f/k/a ITT Grinnell Corp.; Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a Allied-Products Liability Signal, Inc., sued as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane, Inc.; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.; National Automotive Parts Association (NAPA); Parker-Hannifin Corporation; Pneumo Abex, LLC, successor in interest to Abex Corporation; Spirax Sarco, Inc.; SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., individually and successor in interest to Marley Cooling Towers Co.; Standard Motor Products, Inc., sued as successor-in-interest to EIS Automotive; United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company; The William Powell Company, Defendants,
Of Which Covil Corporation is the Appellant. Ashley K. Brathwaite, of Ellis & Winters LLP, of Raleigh, NC; and Elbert Lin, of Richmond, VA, both for Appellant. Theile Branham McVey and John D. Kassel, both of Kassel McVey, of Columbia; and Ka'Leya Hardin, Jonathan Marshall Holder, and Lisa White Shirley, all of Dallas, TX, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | |
2019-002126 Jerry Howard Crawford, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Evelyn Kay Crawford, Respondent,
v.
Celanese Corporation; Aurora Pump Company; Carrier Corporation; CNA Holdings LLC, f/k/a Celanese Corporation f/k/a Hoechst Celanese Corporation; Covil Corporation; Crane Co.; Daniel International Corporation f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc.; Flowserve Corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Anchor/Darling Valve Company and individually and as successor-in-interest to Durco Pumps; Flowserve US Inc.; Fluor Constructors International, f/k/a Fluor Corporation; Fluor Constructors International, Inc.; Fluor Daniel Services Corporation; Fluor Enterprises, Inc.; Ford Motor Company; Genuine Parts Company, d/b/a Rayloc (a/k/a NAPA); The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Goulds Pumps, Inc.; Grinnell, LLC, f/k/a Grinnell Corp, f/k/a ITT Grinnell Corp.; Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a Allied-Products Liability Signal, Inc., sued as successor-in-interest to Bendix Corporation; Ingersoll-Rand Company; John Crane, Inc.; Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, a wholly-owned subsidiary of Metlife Inc.; National Automotive Parts Association (NAPA); Parker-Hannifin Corporation; Pneumo Abex, LLC, successor in interest to Abex Corporation; Spirax Sarco, Inc.; SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc., individually and successor in interest to Marley Cooling Towers Co.; Standard Motor Products, Inc., sued as successor-in-interest to EIS Automotive; United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company; The William Powell Company, Defendants,
Of Which Covil Corporation is the Appellant. Ashley K. Brathwaite, of Ellis & Winters LLP, of Raleigh, NC; Elbert Lin, of Richmond, VA; and Erica N. Peterson, of Washington, DC, all for Appellant. Theile Branham McVey and John D. Kassel, both of Kassel McVey, of Columbia; and Ka'Leya Hardin, Jonathan Marshall Holder, and Lisa White Shirley, all of Dallas, TX, for Respondent.
|
|
Wednesday, May 25, 2022 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 15-15-5) |
2019-001084 South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent,
v.
Kristian Scott and Brian Frank, Defendants,
Of whom Brian Frank is the Appellant.
In the interest of minors under the age of eighteen. Katherine Carruth Goode, of Winnsboro, and Foster Manly Mathews, both of Columbia, for Appellant. Megan Jeanine Katherine Meekins, of Columbia, and Scarlet Bell Moore, of Greenville, both for Respondent. Thomas M. Neal, III, of Law Offices of Thomas M. Neal, III, of Columbia, for Guardian Ad Litem. On appeal, Brian Frank (Father) argues the family court erred by (1) denying his motion to dismiss on jurisdiction grounds; (2) qualifying a witness as an expert, limiting evidence, and admitting hearsay statements; and (3) limiting evidence relevant to the parents' history and ultimately finding Father should be entered on the Central Registry of Child Abuse and Neglect. |
Tuesday, May 3, 2022 | |
Virtual Courtroom II
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2019-001113 Susan Caroline Ball Dover, as Special Administrator of the Estate of Dallas Dale Ball, Respondent
v.
Nellie Ruth Hare Ball a/k/a/ Nell R. Ball, Appellant. Keith G. Denny, of Keith G. Denny, P.A., of Walhalla, for Appellant. Robert Scott Dover, of Law Offices of Scott Dover, of Pickens, for Respondent. The issue in this case is whether the family court may hear an application for separate support and maintenance that it is brought not by one of the parties to the marriage, but by a conservator because one of the parties is mentally incompetent. The family court held it could hear the application. The adverse party--in this case, the wife--appeals that decision. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 15-15-5) |
2019-001140 Ronald L. Jones and Gayle Langley Jones, Thomas Huguenin Gaillard, as Trustee of The Thomas Huguenin Gaillard Revocable Trust, Dated April 3, 2007, and Thomas W. Cone, Jr. as Trustee of The Thomas W. Cone, Jr. Revocable Trust, Dated April 3, 2007, Respondents,
v.
Rogers Townsend & Thomas, P.C.; Lisa Hostetler; Alexander C. Peabody; and Peabody & Associates, Inc., Defendants,
Of Which Rogers Townsend & Thomas, P.C. and Lisa Hostetler are Appellants. Warren C. Powell, Jr. and Chelsea Jaqueline Clark, both of Bruner Powell Wall & Mullins, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellants. J. Jay Hulst, of Williams & Hulst, LLC, of Moncks Corner, for Respondents Thomas Huguenin Gaillard and Thomas W. Cone, Jr. Robert Wade Maring, of Maring & Moyer, LLC, of Georgetown, for Respondents Ronald L. Jones and Gayle Langley Jones. This legal malpractice case arises out of a real estate closing. The purchasers alleged the closing attorney failed to disclose an easement across their property. The circuit court added the easement's owners to the case, but dismissed them after finding they were no longer indispensable parties and that their absence would not affect the attorney's defense that the easement was invalid. The closing attorney appeals that decision. |
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
2018-002157 |
Richie D. Barnes, Respondent,
v.
James Reese, Appellant.
|
2019-001778 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Shaun Rogers, Jr., Appellant.
|
2020-000263 |
Frances K Chestnut, Elizabeth Diane Keese, Sylvester Keese, Arthur B. Keese and Mary K. Taylor, Respondents,
v.
Florence Keese, Marcy Keese, Margo Keese and Marshall Keese, Appellants.
|
2020-000771 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Cornelius Sentell Mayberry, Defendant,
and
John Steen d/b/a John Steen Bail Bonding and Palmetto Surety Corp., as Surety, Appellant.
|
2020-000356 |
Thomas Thompson, #80681, Appellant,
v.
South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
2020-001499 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Bryson Jamar Smith, Appellant.
|
2020-000604 |
Robert Frost, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2019-002079 |
Stephanie M. McDew a/k/a Stephanie McDew Schoumacher, Appellant,
v.
Frieda P. McDew a/k/a Frieda McDew Shorter, Respondent.
|
2019-001383 |
Rhonda Meisner, Appellant,
v.
Grant Meisner, Respondent.
|
2019-000119 |
Roger A. Williams, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2019-001428 |
Rufus Lyndell Griffin, Appellant,
v.
Thomas Mosley, Quinnie Mosley, Walter Mosley, Timothy Mosley, and Paquita Mosley, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Ellec Mosley, Respondents.
|
2020-000443 |
Demetrius Derrick Henderson, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2019-001173 |
Abdul Furquan, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2020-000367 |
Cleveland Edward Young, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2020-000063 |
In the Matter of:
Almeter B. Robinson
(Decedent)
Laverne Robinson, Appellant,
v.
Willene Brooks, Mary Greene, Ronnie Robinson, Almeter P. Harrison, Herbert Robinson, James Robinson, Leroy Robinson, and Martha Aiken, Defendants,
Of Whom Mary Greene, Ronnie Robinson, Almeter P. Harrison, Leroy Robinson, and Martha Aiken are the Respondents.
|
2019-001827 |
David J. Mattox, Appellant,
v.
Lisa Jo Bare Mattox, Respondent.
|
2020-000056 |
Sterling Hills Homeowners' Association, Inc., Respondent,
v.
Elliot Hayes, Appellant.
|
2020-000741 |
Billy Wayne McIntosh 87743, Appellant,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2019-001970 |
Rebecca J. Robbins and Marie Babayan, individually and on behalf of all those similarly situated, Appellants,
v.
Town of Turbeville and the Town of Turbeville Police Department, Respondents,
v.
The State of South Carolina, Third Party Defendants.
|
2019-002122 |
William A. Morgan, Respondent,
v.
Sterling Estates Homeowner's Association, Inc., and Paul Thomas Garner, Defendants,
Of Whom Paul Thomas Garner is the Appellant.
|
2020-000390 |
Francisco Nicolas Miguel, Respondent,
v.
Palmetto Asset Investments, LLC, Gabriel Angel Prestegui Gomez, and A. Kevin Hunter, II, Greenville County Tax Collector, Defendants,
of which Palmetto Asset Investments, LLC is the Appellant.
|
2020-000251 |
Kenneth Rivera, #318979, Appellant,
v.
South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
2019-001766 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Anthony Bernard Allen, Appellant.
|
2018-001333 |
Corey Edmond, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2021-000421 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent,
v.
Brittany A. Thomas-Scibuola, Jeffrey Scibuola, Sr., Jeffrey Scibuola, Jr., and Tracy Scibuola, Defendants,
Of whom Tracy Scibuola is the Appellant
In the interest of a minor under the age of eighteen.
|
2019-002042 |
Valerie Drafts, Veronica Drafts, and Tarance F. Drafts, III, Respondents,
v.
R.O. Levy, South Carolina Department of Revenue, The United States of America, and Batesville Casket Co., Defendants,
of whom R.O. Levy is the Appellant.
|
2019-000863 |
Keith Sheldon Levan, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2021-000327 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Daniel Lee Pease, Appellant.
|
2019-001456 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
William Shane Fordham Brown, Appellant.
|