Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Court Orders - 2023
Order No.  
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
Charleston Housing Court Expansion
In the Matter of David Paul Traywick, Petitioner
In the Matter of Harry B. Gregory, Jr.
Amendment to Rule 411, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
In the Matter of Ray A. Lord, Petitioner.
In the Matter of James Watson Smiley, IV, Petitioner.
In the Matter of Scott David Robinson
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amended by Order 2023-03-09-01)
(Amends Order 2004-05-20-01)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amended by Order 2023-03-09-02)
(Amends Order 2006-08-03-01)
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Rock Hill Homeless Court Program
SCCA 261 Form - Request for Court Interpreter
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amends Order 2023-02-16-01)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amends Order 2023-02-16-02)
Electronic Devices in Courthouses
Amendments to Rule 607, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Amendment to Rule 5.5, South Carolina Rules of Professional Conduct, Rule 407, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Revised SCCA Form 800, Transcript Request Form
Re: SCCA 261 Form – Request for Court Interpreter
Horry County Mental Health Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2015-08-05-01)
Horry County Adult Drug Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2005-07-19-01) (Rescinds Order 2014-11-19-02)
In the Matter of Edward C. Nix, Respondent.
Order for Destruction of Arrest Records in General Sessions
State v. Jeroid John Price
Medley Serves & Investigations Ordered to Cease and Desist Use of Deceptive Door Tags in Process Serving
Amendments to Rule 407, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
State v. Price
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
2023 Mandatory Bond Court Program for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
Greenville County Mental Health Court
In the Matter of James Kristian Falk, Respondent
In the Matter of Scott David Robinson, Respondent
Rescission of Administrative Orders Governing Mortgage Foreclosure Actions
(Rescinds Order 2011-05-02-01) (Rescinds Order 2009-05-22-01)
In the Matter of MaRhonda Shatoya Smith, Respondent
Re: SCCA 261 Form - Request for Court Interpreter
In the Matter of Drelton A. Carson, Jr., Respondent
General Sessions Docket Management Order
In the Matter of Christopher G. Jacob, Petitioner
Charleston County Adult Drug Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2017-07-28-04)
Ninth Judicial Circuit Juvenile Drug Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2017-07-28-03)
Ninth Judicial Circuit Veterans Treatment Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2019-06-18-01)
In the Matter of Jane M. Randall, Respondent
Charleston County Mental Health Court
In the Matter of Justin M. McGee, Respondent
Planned Parenthood South Atlantic, et al. v. State of South Carolina, et al.
In the Matter of Jane M. Randall
In the Matter of Sidney J. Jones, Petitioner
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Greenwood County Veterans Treatment Court Program
Amended Business Court Program
(Supersedes Order 2017-02-08-02) (Supersedes Order 2017-12-20-02) (Supersedes Order 2019-01-30-01) (Supersedes Order 2017-02-24-01)
The Honorable Joseph M. Strickland, Petitioner, v. Richland County Legislative Delegation, et al.
In the Matter of Spartanburg County Magistrate John J. Kesler
Aiken County Mental Health Court
Access to Justice Commission
(Supersedes Order 2022-06-22-01)
Specialized Caseload Sanctions and Incentives Pilot Program (SWIFT)
Amendments to Rule 410(j), South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
In the Matter of Georgetown County Magistrate James K. McKenzie
Chesterfield County Adult Drug Court Program
In the Matter of Tara Dawn Shurling, Respondent
In the Matter of Berkeley County Magistrate Ava E. Bryant