Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Department
Court Orders - 2018
Order No.  
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Jeff Boys v. State
In the Matter of Jarrett Skipper Calder
Amendments to Rule 401, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Probate Court Judges Advisory Committee
(Supersedes Order 2017-05-31-01)
E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Chesterfield County on December 4, 2018
Family Court Bench/Bar Seminar
Repository for Circuit, Family, Probate, Magistrate and Municipal Court Orders
Reese v. State
Motions for Bond Reductions, Modifications, and Revocations in Charleston County
(Vacates Order 2001-10-31-01)
Tropical Storm Michael
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
In the Matter of Janne Berry Osborne
Motion Fees Pursuant to Rule 240, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Filing Fees Pursuant to Rule 203 and Rule 242, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Circuit Court Judges Advisory Committee
(Supersedes Order 2018-02-02-01)
Franklin Benjamin v. State
In the Matter of Ronald Wade Moak
Revised Family Court Forms for Use with Palmetto Automated Child Support System
Amendments to Rule 607(h)(1), South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Amendments to Rule 408(b)(1), South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Myrtle Beach Homeless Court
In the Matter of Daniel Edward Johnson
In the Matter of Frank Barnwell McMaster
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
In the Matter of Hoyt Shay Neal
Hurricane Florence
Hurricane Florence Order
In the Matter of Mark E. Schnee
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Mitchell v. State
In the Matter of Suzanna Rachel MacLean
In the Matter of Aaron Cole Mayer
Opioid Litigation
In the Matter of Franklin Matthews Jackson
In the Matter of David R. DuBose
SCCA Form 800 Transcript Request
Opioid Litigation
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Amendments to Rules for Lawyer Disciplinary Enforcement
Calhoun County Courthouse repairs
Magistrate Court Form Changes
In the Matter of Douglas Andrew Gaines
In the Matter of Bradford Alexander Rawlinson
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
In the Matter of William F. Gorski
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Matthew Carver v. State
Best Legal Practices in Child Abuse and Neglect Cases
In the Matter of John B. Kern
Closing of the Probate Courts
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
York County Mental Health Court
Revised Appellate Court Form 13
South Carolina Insurance Reserve Fund v. East Richland County Public Service District
Electronic Means Pursuant to Rules 207 and 607, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Amendments to Rules 207 and 607, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Amendments to Rule 8 of the South Carolina Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution Rules
Revised General Sessions Sentence Sheet (SCCA Form 217)
(Supersedes Order 2016-07-07-01)
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Wilson v. Charleston County School District
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
Kershaw County Drug Court
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Annual License Fee
In the Matter of K. Douglas Thornton
In the Matter of Joenathan S. Chaplin
Probate Court Form Changes
(Supersedes Order 2017-04-18-01)
In the Matter of Melisa White Gay, Respondent.
Sumter County Acting Master-in-Equity Appointment
(Supersedes Order 2018-02-28-02)
Corbett v. State
Order to Close Florence County Family Court
(Supersedes Order 2018-02-27-01)
Sumter County Master-in-Equity Authority
(Superseded by Order 2018-03-20-01)
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Order to Close Florence County Courthouse
(Superseded by Order 2018-03-01-02)
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules (SCACR)
Checklist for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
(Revokes Order 2014-07-25-01)
Mandatory Summary Court Judge Mentoring Program Documents
Mandatory Summary Court Judge Mentoring Program
Reinstatement of Electronic Filing Pilot Program in Richland County
Carnell Davis v. State
Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Dorchester County on February 9, 2018
E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to York County on February 27, 2018
Greenville County Mental Health Court
Circuit Court Judges Advisory Committee
(Superseded by Order 2018-10-08-01)
(Supersedes Order 2014-06-24-01)
Civil Action Coversheet, SCCA Form 234
(Supersedes Order 2016-03-28-01)
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Greenville County on January 22, 2018
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
Attorney's Fees Under Rules 222 and 242 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas