Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Department
Court Orders - 2018
Order No.  
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
Attorney's Fees Under Rules 222 and 242 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Greenville County on January 22, 2018
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Civil Action Coversheet, SCCA Form 234
(Supersedes Order 2016-03-28-01)
Circuit Court Judges Advisory Committee
(Superseded by Order 2018-10-08-01)
(Supersedes Order 2014-06-24-01)
Greenville County Mental Health Court
E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to York County on February 27, 2018
Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Dorchester County on February 9, 2018
Carnell Davis v. State
Reinstatement of Electronic Filing Pilot Program in Richland County
Mandatory Summary Court Judge Mentoring Program
Mandatory Summary Court Judge Mentoring Program Documents
Checklist for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
(Revokes Order 2014-07-25-01)
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules (SCACR)
Order to Close Florence County Courthouse
(Superseded by Order 2018-03-01-02)
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Sumter County Master-in-Equity Authority
(Superseded by Order 2018-03-20-01)
Order to Close Florence County Family Court
(Supersedes Order 2018-02-27-01)
Corbett v. State
Sumter County Acting Master-in-Equity Appointment
(Supersedes Order 2018-02-28-02)
In the Matter of Melisa White Gay, Respondent.
Probate Court Form Changes
(Supersedes Order 2017-04-18-01)
In the Matter of Joenathan S. Chaplin
In the Matter of K. Douglas Thornton
Annual License Fee
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Kershaw County Drug Court
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
Wilson v. Charleston County School District
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Revised General Sessions Sentence Sheet (SCCA Form 217)
(Supersedes Order 2016-07-07-01)
Amendments to Rule 8 of the South Carolina Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution Rules
Amendments to Rules 207 and 607, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Electronic Means Pursuant to Rules 207 and 607, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
South Carolina Insurance Reserve Fund v. East Richland County Public Service District
Revised Appellate Court Form 13
York County Mental Health Court
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Closing of the Probate Courts
In the Matter of John B. Kern
Best Legal Practices in Child Abuse and Neglect Cases
Matthew Carver v. State
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
In the Matter of William F. Gorski
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
In the Matter of Bradford Alexander Rawlinson
In the Matter of Douglas Andrew Gaines
Magistrate Court Form Changes
Calhoun County Courthouse repairs
Amendments to Rules for Lawyer Disciplinary Enforcement
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Opioid Litigation
SCCA Form 800 Transcript Request
In the Matter of David R. DuBose
In the Matter of Franklin Matthews Jackson
Opioid Litigation
In the Matter of Aaron Cole Mayer
In the Matter of Suzanna Rachel MacLean
Mitchell v. State
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
In the Matter of Mark E. Schnee
Hurricane Florence Order
Hurricane Florence
In the Matter of Hoyt Shay Neal
Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
In the Matter of Frank Barnwell McMaster
In the Matter of Daniel Edward Johnson
Myrtle Beach Homeless Court
Amendments to Rule 408(b)(1), South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Amendments to Rule 607(h)(1), South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Revised Family Court Forms for Use with Palmetto Automated Child Support System
In the Matter of Ronald Wade Moak
Franklin Benjamin v. State
Circuit Court Judges Advisory Committee
(Supersedes Order 2018-02-02-01)
Filing Fees Pursuant to Rule 203 and Rule 242, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Motion Fees Pursuant to Rule 240, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
In the Matter of Janne Berry Osborne
Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
Tropical Storm Michael
Motions for Bond Reductions, Modifications, and Revocations in Charleston County
(Vacates Order 2001-10-31-01)
Reese v. State
Repository for Circuit, Family, Probate, Magistrate and Municipal Court Orders
Family Court Bench/Bar Seminar
E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Chesterfield County on December 4, 2018
Probate Court Judges Advisory Committee
(Supersedes Order 2017-05-31-01)
Amendments to Rule 401, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
In the Matter of Jarrett Skipper Calder