Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Administrative Orders - 2023
Order No.  
Topic
Forms/Rules Affected
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amended by Order 2023-03-09-01)
(Amends Order 2004-05-20-01)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amended by Order 2023-03-09-02)
(Amends Order 2006-08-03-01)
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Rock Hill Homeless Court Program
SCCA 261 Form - Request for Court Interpreter
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amends Order 2023-02-16-01)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
(Amends Order 2023-02-16-02)
Electronic Devices in Courthouses
Revised SCCA Form 800, Transcript Request Form
Re: SCCA 261 Form – Request for Court Interpreter
Horry County Mental Health Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2015-08-05-01)
Horry County Adult Drug Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2005-07-19-01) (Rescinds Order 2014-11-19-02)
Order for Destruction of Arrest Records in General Sessions
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
2023 Mandatory Bond Court Program for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
Greenville County Mental Health Court
Rescission of Administrative Orders Governing Mortgage Foreclosure Actions
(Rescinds Order 2011-05-02-01) (Rescinds Order 2009-05-22-01)
Re: SCCA 261 Form - Request for Court Interpreter
Charleston County Adult Drug Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2017-07-28-04)
Ninth Judicial Circuit Juvenile Drug Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2017-07-28-03)
Ninth Judicial Circuit Veterans Treatment Court Program
(Rescinds Order 2019-06-18-01)
Charleston County Mental Health Court
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
In the Matter of Spartanburg County Magistrate John J. Kesler
Aiken County Mental Health Court
Access to Justice Commission
(Supersedes Order 2022-06-22-01)
Specialized Caseload Sanctions and Incentives Pilot Program (SWIFT)
In the Matter of Georgetown County Magistrate James K. McKenzie
Chesterfield County Adult Drug Court Program
In the Matter of Berkeley County Magistrate Ava E. Bryant