Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Court Information
Courthouse Information

Court Administration has the compiled information below regarding county courthouse operations. We intend to update this information frequently to reflect changes in various counties throughout the state. Because courthouse operations may change unexpectedly, please contact the respective County Clerk of Court for the most up to date information.

Abbeville
Last Updated - 04/12/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Abbeville County Court System / Register of Deeds are operating under normal circumstances. Offices are open Monday thru Friday from 8:30 a.m. to 5:00p.m. Face masks are required to enter the building. Family Court Monday – Friday 8:30am until 5:00pm (no change)



Probate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Abbeville Probate Court an be contacted via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via email, fax, mail, or dropped off at the entrance to the building. Teleconferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be mailed upon request and returned by mail. Notes:



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Bond Court has resumed the twice daily schedule. Bond Court will be held as normal on the weekends. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Due to the possible exposure to COVID-9, the following safety measures will be instituted until November 2, 2020. The Magistrate Court will be held at least once daily and personnel will be in the office to accept filings or prepare warrants. Notes:



Municipal Court - Normal

Notes: Abbeville Municipal Court is open and operating on a normal schedule. The only change in operations, which is necessary due to social distancing guidelines, is Monday night court is currently being held at the Abbeville Civic Center, 404 N. Main Street, Abbeville, SC. An after hours drop box for payments is now available to the public.



Aiken
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Aiken County Courthouse is open. Pursuant to the most recent Order of the Chief Justice in person hearings are now being scheduled. The Circuit Court continues to conduct remote hearings for jail cases and other cases when possible. A jury is scheduled to report for General Sessions Court on April 12 with other juries to report pursuant to the schedule on the Public Index. Family Court has begun scheduling in person hearings on a limited basis. Filings and payments are accepted. In accordance with the Order of the Chief Justice masks are required and temperatures are taken of all persons entering the courthouse.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building has restricted access. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via phone, email, drop box and mail. Contact Probate Court for emergency hearings. Video conferencing and teleconferencing available for commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted by mail. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Limited

Both video and in person bonds are being utilized. If in person, only three defendants are allowed in the courtroom at a time and masks are required.  People in the observation room are required to have temperature checks and masks.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Aiken County-Monetta Office is open for normal hours Monday-Friday from 8:30-5:00. All of the other Magistrate Courts are open for the filing of papers, but pursuant to the Chief Judge’s Order, presently there aren’t any in-person hearings, unless deemed an emergency All Aiken County Magistrate Courts are open for normal operating hours except for the Monetta Magistrate. Temperature checks, masks and social distancing are required when entering the Court Buildings.



Municipal Court - Limited

The City of Aiken has decided to close Aiken Municipal Court from December 21, 2020 to February 1, 2021 due to anticipated winter/post-holiday COVID-19 case surges. The Clerk of Court and Records departments will still be open and will handle payments, P.D. screenings and questions. Any jail cases for defendants that are still incarcerated will not be continued but will be handled at the jail. City of Aiken Municipal court will begin on Monday, May 4, at the J. Carrol Busbee Public Safety Headquarters Building at 834 Beaufort St. NE. Strict social distancing guidelines will be in effect and allow no more than five defendants in the courtroom at one time. Town of Salley: Salley Municipal Court is currently requiring temperature checks and masks in the courtroom.  There is a limit of one defendant at a time. The Town Hall is still closed to the public, with information posted about paying tickets. Wagener Municipal Court is currently requiring temperature checks and masks in the courtroom. There is a limit of one defendant at a time. The Town Hall is currently closed to public, with information posted about how to pay tickets. The Monetta Magistrate Office is back open full-time with the hours: Monday – Friday Hours: 9:00-5:00



Allendale
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Via mail or at the door of the courthouse. Notes:



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment via mail. Contact the Probate Court about commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted by appointment only. Notes:



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond court will be held twice a day. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Allendale Magistrate Court is fully open for in court proceedings. Notes:



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Allendale Municipal Court: Bond hearings are occurring at least once a day as needed. Payments can be made online and at the window. Traffic Court and Preliminary Hearings are cancelled until further notice. Fairfax Municipal Court will be closed until further notice due to possible employee virus exposure. The reopening schedule will be announced as soon as testing has been completed. Notes:



Anderson
Last Updated - 01/04/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

The Anderson courthouse has re-opened for business. Our operating hours are 8:30 a.m. until 5:00 p.m. Jury trials have NOT resumed, but matters are being heard by our judges using Web-Ex. After these hours, e-mails can be directed to rshirley@andersoncountysc.org. Voicemails may be left on my telephone at (864)260-4303. We will check these messages frequently and all inquiries will have replies no later than during the morning of the next business day.



Probate Court - Limited

Filings and payments are accepted in person and at the drive through window. Probate Court office has re-opened. The operational hours are 8:30 a.m. until 5:00 p.m. Contact can also be made via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment via email, mail or drop off. Teleconferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted via drop box, mail, and appointment. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Normal

Bond court is held 6:30 am and 4:00 pm each day.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Anderson Summary Court has resumed all normal hours of operation from 8:30 am until 5:00 pm. All Anderson County Buildings are not open to the general public but the Ronald Townsend Building which houses Central Summary Court is open. All outlying Magistrate Offices in Anderson County are open and have resumed regular schedules and filings.



Municipal Court - Limited

City of Anderson Municipal Court: Payments may be made through SC.gov and U.S. mail. All traffic and criminal courts have ceased operations at this time until further notice. Signs are posted on the entrance door with a telephone number to contact the court if the need arises. Bond Court is held once per day each morning at 8:00 a.m. Williamston Municipal Court: Office hours are 9 a.m. - 5 p.m. Monday through Friday. Filings and payments are accepted in person and at the drive through window.



Bamberg
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Filings and payments may be tendered at the window in the courthouse. Notes: The courthouse building at 2959 Main Highway in Bamberg is closed except for limited appointments for title abstractors and document filings.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Necessary filings and marriage license applications can be deposited outside the probate office doors. Please knock on the front door of the courthouse or call 803-245-3008 ext. 2111 and someone will assist you. Notes: Bamberg County Probate is closed to in-person visits except by appointment. All visitors must wear a face mask at all times and will be subject to the recording of name, address, phone number and temperature at the time of the visit. Since the courthouse is locked, an appointment with the probate office must be made by phone (803) 245-3008 Ext. 2111), fax (803) 245-3195 or email noelsg@bambergcounty.sc.gov for records search as well as marriage license application/issue.



Bond Court - Normal

Bamberg County Bond Court continues as normal twice daily at 9:30 am and 3:30 pm. Hearings are conducted by video. Acceptance of filings and payments are as normal.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Bamberg County Magistrate Court is operating as normal, but under COVID-19 guidelines. Bamberg County Magistrate Court continues to accept filings and payments at the customer service window only. Litigants are encouraged to pay criminal and traffic fines and fees on the web at sccourts.org. The Court has resumed scheduled criminal, traffic and civil hearings, adhering to CDC and SC Supreme Court guidelines. Hearings are conducted by video conferencing when possible. Court hours are Monday-Friday 9:00 a.m. until 5:00 p.m.



Municipal Court - Limited

Bamberg Municipal: Traffic and Criminal Court cancelled until further notice with provision for emergency situations. Denmark Municipal: Traffic and Criminal Court cancelled until further notice with provision for emergency situations. Ehrhardt Municipal: Traffic and Criminal Court cancelled until further notice with provision for emergency situations. Bamberg County Magistrate Court is conducting all bond hearings for the Municipal Courts by video conferencing.



Barnwell
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Clerk of Court/RMC Office - All users of the Clerk of Court/RMC Office should utilize the office’s online search services if possible. You may contact the office to request a copy of any document that is needed which is not available online. The number to call is (803) 541-1020. All fees and charges for the documents still apply. We are allowing abstractors, two at a time, to come in to our deed room. The office will record documents sent by U.S. Mail, UPS and FedEx. If you are unable to use these options, please contact the office at the number above to make arrangements to have the document recorded. Notes: Courthouse construction is ongoing. Please come in through courtyard entrance. Masks are required and temperatures taken at entrance.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Probate Court is closed to in person visits except by appointment only. All visitors are required to have their temperature checked before entering the Courthouse Building and must wear a face mask. Appointments are made by calling (803) 541-1031. Marriage Licenses or handled by appointment only. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond Court continues as usual. Both Magistrate and Municipal Courts utilize the video conference between the jail and courtrooms on all Bond hearings.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: At this time, there are no in-person court proceedings. We continue to accept fine payments. While the doors are locked in accordance with Barnwell County's emergency protocols, we are accessible by phone during regular office/court hours. We also meet persons at the door to accept paperwork and payments. We are encouraging the use of online payments and money orders and trying to avoid the transfer of cash. Hours of Operation: Monday – Friday / 9:00 AM – 5:00 PM



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: At this time, there are no in-person court proceedings. We continue to accept fine payments. While the doors are locked in accordance with Barnwell County's emergency protocols, we are accessible by phone during regular office/court hours. We also meet persons at the door to accept paperwork and payments. We are encouraging the use of online payments and money orders and trying to avoid the transfer of cash. Notes: Bond Court continues as usual. Both Magistrate and Municipal Courts utilize the video conference between the jail and courtrooms on all Bond hearings.



Beaufort
Last Updated - 04/14/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of filings: In anticipation of inclement weather, the Beaufort County Courthouse will close at 12:00 pm Thursday, March 18, 2021. Acceptance of filings and payments are via the drop box located at the entrance to the courthouse. The Beaufort County Circuit and Family Courts are open for appointments and emergency hearings only. All matters handled in the Clerk of Court’s office must be scheduled through appointments. The hours of operation are Monday thru Friday 8:30 a.m. - 4:30 p.m. Register of Deeds office is currently closed to the public. Limited staff is accepting electronic recording & document drop-offs at a box located outside the Beaufort County Administration Building, 100 Ribaut Rd. Beaufort, SC.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: In order to provide safely for increased in-person access by the public to the Beaufort Probate Court Services, the following measures will take effect March 15, 2021 and remain effective until further notice. In-person public access to the Beaufort County Probate Court Offices is permitted by appointment only; appointments may be made by calling the Court's offices at 843-255-5850. Except for filings made and fees paid in person, all filings and fee payments must be made by mail to the Court's drop box at the Beaufort County Courthouse entrance. Fees delivered to the drop box must be in a sealed envelope. Appointments to apply for Marriage Licenses may be made by calling the Court's offices at 843-255-5850. Hearings (including emergency hearings) will continue to be held by remote communications technology, (videoconference or telephone conference), where the court determines that format is appropriate and feasible to all parties; hearings will be held in-person subject to applicable safety guidelines. Probate Court staff continues to be available by telephone, email, fax, and regular mail.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond Hearings are conducted twice per day, at 9:00 am and 2:00 pm.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Beaufort Magistrate Court is now open to the public from 8:00 am to 4:00 pm, Monday through Friday for acceptance of Filings and Payments. In-Person Civil hearings have resumed, including jury trials. WebEx hearings are conducted upon request. Court staff are available in person and by phone from 8:00 - 4:00 p.m., Monday thru Friday.



Municipal Court - Limited

Please be advised Bluffton Municipal Court is closed to all public access. We are currently rescheduling any pending cases to the next court docket. We are accepting all filings and payments via mail or online. If the public would like to speak to court staff, they are available to receive all phone calls and email Monday – Thursday 8:00 a.m. - 5:30 p.m. and Friday 8:00 a.m.- 1:00 p.m. Bluffton Municipal Court will resume May 12 operating as follows: -Defendants who are required to report for an in-person court date will come to the porch outside the Bluffton Municipal Court/Council Chambers. This is located at 20 Bridge Street on the side of the Theodore D. Washington Municipal Building. Ten defendants, at a time, will stand on sidewalk indicators to order to have safe social distance from each other. Other defendants will wait in their cars until his or her group is called. -Defendants will be called up one at a time to negotiate his or her case to the court via Zoom. A municipal judge, court clerk and police officer will be present on each call. The computer station, which will operate the videoconferencing, will be stationed outside the Municipal Court building as a precaution to minimize the spread of COVID-19. -In case of inclement weather, defendants will wait in their cars and come to the porch one at a time. -Bluffton staff members, including police officers, court staff and an information technology employee, will all wear masks and gloves. -The town will provide hand sanitizing products for defendants. -Defendants are asked to wear masks and bring their own pen.



Berkeley
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Due to inclement weather, the Berkeley County Courthouse will close at 2:00 pm on Thursday, March 18, 2021. Notes: The courthouse is operating 9:00 to 5:00, but closed to public access unless by appointment or scheduled hearing. The drive thru is operational during the hours of 9:00AM-4:00 PM Drop bins are available at the front of the courthouse for all offices housed in the courthouse.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Notes:



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Operating on a normal schedule of 8:00 a.m. and 6:30 p.m. each day. We ask for attorneys and victims to participate by phone, rather than in person, if possible. All bond hearings are by video-conferencing unless we have technical difficulties. Bonding companies should call the bond court to coordinate matters involving surety bonds.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Magistrate Courts, including traffic: Normal office hours Most hearings will take place using electronic communication. Please contact our staff by telephone if you have any questions. Moncks Corner (All matters, including all traffic court): 843-719-4050 Goose Creek Small Claims Matters Only: 843-553-6099 Goose Creek Evictions and all other matters: 843-553-7080 St. Stephen (All Matters): 843-567-7400 Bond Court: 843-719-4549



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The City of Goose Creek Municipal Court is open from 8:00 a.m. - 5:00 p.m. to take payments only. All bench and jury trials have been continued to May 1, 2020. Sealed sentences and bench warrants are heard when notified by the police. All bond hearings are done with the magistrate in Berkeley county. Monck's Corner Municipal Court: All Municipal Court proceedings, including jury trials, are postponed until May. Court payments, permit applications, and business license payments will be taken at the drive through at the Municipal building. Notes:



Calhoun
Last Updated - 04/01/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Calhoun County Courthouse is open with limited employees working in the office.



Probate Court - Closed

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via email and mail. Video conferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted online. The Probate Court is only able to issue marriage licenses to parties who can show an upcoming wedding date. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Operation is normal. All Bond Court hearings are done remotely via video, or if technical failure, then by telephone with the person and 1 law enforcement officer appearing at the Orangeburg jail (Calhoun Co. has no jail, & so contracts with Orangeburg). Victims & any other parties are allowed to also "attend" via video or phone.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Operation is normal & both the St. Matthews & Sandy Run Magistrate Courts are open during regular hours (below). Hearings are being held as follows: 1) Via video conferencing; or 2) If video is not available, then by telephone; or 3) In-court but with all safety protocols in place per SC Supreme Court Order, including face masks, temperature checks, safe distancing, & limiting the number of people in the courtroom at a time. Notes: St. Matthews Court open Monday-Friday @ 9 a.m. - 4 p.m.; Sandy Run Magistrate Court open Monday-Wednesday @ 9am-5pm (closes 1 hour at lunch). Cameron Court is now open on the 2nd Thursday & last Thursday of the month, 9 a.m. - 5 p.m.



Municipal Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Operation is normal. The Town of St. Matthews City Court is open on Wednesday @ 9am. Court operates in-court with all safety protocols in place per SC Supreme Court Order, temperature checks, safe distancing, & limiting the number of people in the courtroom at a time.



Charleston
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Charleston County Clerk of Court’s office (Common Pleas, General Sessions and Family Court) is open and serving the public Monday through Friday, 8:30 a.m. to 5 p.m. All filings and payments are accepted as normal business practice.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: E-filing is available for estates and guardianships as part of a pilot project. Probate Court is accessible to public via phone, email, regular mail, courier, drop box and by video conferencing. The offices are closed to the public. Filings/payment are being accepted by mail, email and in the drop box from 8:30 a.m to 5 p.m. Estates, guardianships, and conservatorships can be handled via mail and email. Video conferencing is available for diversionary court, guardianships, conservatorship and civil commitments. Marriage license applications may be submitted online to www.charlestoncounty.org/departments/probate/marriage-license.php#online-marriage-license-application. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Notes:



Bond Court - Limited

Once per day at 10 a.m.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The McClellanville District of the Charleston County Magistrates’ Court will be closed for building renovation beginning March 22, 2021, and will reopen on April 5, 2021. All filings can be accomplished by mail or placement in the drop box at the office location. The East Cooper District Magistrate’s Court located at 1189 Sweetgrass Basket Parkway in Mount Pleasant, S.C. will be available to handle any in- person court or other needs.. May be left in the drop boxes at the magistrate courts. Staff will be present from 8:30 a.m. - 12 p.m.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: City of Charleston - The Court is accepting filings and payments Monday through Friday, 8:00 am to 5:00 pm at the Court. The public is encouraged to make payments online and to submit filings via email, fax, or mail. Please call if you need assistance with filings or payments. Probable Cause Determination Hearings are held Monday through Thursday at 11:00 am and at 8:30 am on Fridays. If you are in need of assistance please call (843) 724-7460. You may leave a message in our general voicemail after business hours. A clerk will contact you the following business day. Folly Beach Municipal Court - Municipal Court will be canceled through April 30, 2020, except for emergency matters. Notices will be sent with rescheduled dates/times. The Clerk can be reached via apraytor@cityoffollybeach.com or by leaving a message at 843.513.1842. Kiawah Island Municipal Court - Closed. All cases scheduled for April have been continued until further notice. Court staff may be reached by phone with any questions at 843-768-9166. Town of McClellanville - Under an order from the Town Council on March 24, Town Hall is closed to the public. All cases for Municipal Court have been continued and will be rescheduled after April 30, 2020. Citation payments due can be made online at http://townofmcclellanville-sc.net/townhall.php , or by mail at 405 Pinckney Street, McClellanville SC 29458. Town staff may be reached by email at mcclellanville2@tds.net or you may leave a message at (843) 887-3712 and we will return your call as soon as possible. Updates are being posted on the Town of McClellanville website and Facebook page. City of North Charleston Municipal Court - Bond hearings will be conducted daily at 9 a.m. All bond hearings will be conducted with local detention centers through video conferencing. Except for emergencies, all other court sessions will be cancelled through June 1, 2020. Any cases scheduled for hearing during this time will be rescheduled. Notice of any rescheduled cases will be provided by mail.



Cherokee
Last Updated - 03/16/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Solicitor’s Office - 864-487-2576 Clerk’s Office - 864-487-2571 Notes: Cherokee County is open from 8:30-5:00. Only persons allowed in are case parties or folks that have business in the courthouse as we have to reserve all space to meet social distancing guidelines. Mask and Temperature Checks are required to enter.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Probate Judge is conducting contested trials and hearings in-person with proper social distancing and masks. Uncontested matters and motion hearings are being held through videoconferencing. Cherokee County Probate Court allowing the public to come in by appointment only. Building has restricted access. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via phone, drop box, email and mail. Video conferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted online and via mail. Notes:



Bond Court

No Details Provided



Magistrate Court - Limited

Magistrate offices (Gaffney and Blacksburg) remain staffed from 8:30am – 5:00pm Monday thru Friday. Telephone #’s 864-487-2533 and 864-839-2492. In person Court is being held effective March 15, 2021. Civil filings are being accepted by appointment only as the doors to these facilities are closed. Masks must be worn. Fines can be paid on-line at cherokeemagistrate.com or by mailing a money order, certified or cashier’s check. Bond court is held at 9:00 a.m. and 5:00 p.m. Monday through Friday and 7:00 a.m. and 7:00 p.m. Saturday and Sunday. Bond Court is being conducted from the Magistrate courtroom via monitor to the jail.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Gaffney Municipal Court – Non-jury Court is being held on a limited basis. Only necessary parties are allowed in the courtroom. Each person is screened with safety questions, temperature checks, and masks are required. Any party not adhering to those restrictions will have their case continued. The number of people is limited in the Courtroom. Hearings are staggered to prevent groups of people in the Courtroom and/or lobby. Continuances are granted liberally. It’s encouraged for fines to paid on-line at https://www.ncourt.com/x-press/x-onlinepayments.aspx?Juris=100013A4-7926-47EF-B89F-7D7DFDD56368. Any on-line fees assessed will be reimbursed. Gaffney Municipal Bond Court - Bond court remains scheduled 7 days a week at 8:30 am and 4:30 pm. Bond court is being conducted from the Gaffney Municipal courtroom via monitor to the jail. Blacksburg Municipal Court – Blacksburg Municipal Court offices remain open. Telephone #864-839-2492. In person court is being held effective March 15, 2021. Other court business is by appointment only as the door to this facility are closed. Masks must be worn. Fines can be paid on-line at cherokeemagistrate.com or by mailing a money order, certified or cashier’s check. Blacksburg Municipal Bond Court - Bond court is held at 9:00am until and 5:00pm until Monday thru Friday. Weekends 7:00am until and 7:00pm until. Bond Court is being conducted from the Gaffney Magistrate courtroom via monitor to the jail.



Chester
Last Updated - 11/30/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: At the clerk's office as normal.

Sixth Circuit Family Court Memo re: Court Procedures and WebEx

Notes: Chester County Courthouse is open completely to the General Public.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Chester County Probate office is open to the public by appointment only. Marriage applications may be submitted online or in person. Marriage license applications may be submitted online. Issuing marriage licenses to parties who can show an upcoming wedding date. Unable to process new marriage license applications. Notes:



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: We are still conducting bond hearings twice per day. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Open and Operational as normal. All safety protocols in place per Supreme Court Order, including face masks, temperature checks, safe distancing, sanitizing between hearings, and limiting the number of people in the courtroom at a time. We have a paging system in place; whereas, parties to a case will remain in their vehicle until their case is called. We have limited the public access to the front lobby of our office only, which we also share with the Chester Municipal Court. We have a clerk present during normal business hours at the front window to handle filings and payments. Notes:



Municipal Court

No Details Provided



Chesterfield
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: At the courthouse by appointment only. Fourth Circuit Family Court Order Suspending Arrests for Unexecuted Bench Warrants for Nonpayment of Child Support and Alimony Notes: Persons entering the courthouse will be screened for fever.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Chesterfield County Judicial Center is now open to the public. For the Probate Court, individuals will need to come to the receptionist’s window for assistance and information. Individuals are urged to contact the Probate Court by phone, email, mail or fax to request a marriage certificate or information about obtaining a marriage license, opening an estate, filing a small estate affidavit, or any other business of the Court. There are no in-person appointments to open estates or file small estate affidavits. Filings and payments can be made at the receptionist’s window, by mail or by using the drop box located in front of the Chesterfield County Judicial Center. Worksheets for marriage license applications may be submitted in person at the receptionist’s window or by email, mail or fax. To sign the application for the marriage license, present your photo IDs and other documents, and pay the fee, you need to make an appointment with the receptionist/marriage clerk. For individuals who require immediate treatment for either a mental illness or chemical dependency, contact Tri-County Community Mental Health Center first. Attorneys and abstractors may request estate files by email. The Probate Court will follow the guidelines and recommendations per the March 4, 2021 Amended Order regarding in-person and remote hearings. Notes:



Bond Court

No Details Provided



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Chesterfield County Magistrate Court is now open. All offices are open to the public with guidelines of Mask and only 4 people at a time. We are having bench trials only at this time.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Cheraw Municipal Court is currently closed due to the outbreak of the COVID-19 Pandemic. All Criminal, Traffic and Jury Trials and Preliminary Hearings are postponed. All persons will be notified by US mail of their new court dates. Bond Court and emergency hearings will be held once a day at 9:30 am at Cheraw Municipal Court. Fine payments can be made online at Cherawcourtpayments.com. The office is open for payments or questions at 258 Second St. Cheraw, SC 29520, between the hours of 8:00 am to 4:00 pm. Pageland Municipal Court - Clerk's office is closed to the public but can pay fines or bonds at door. Web site information for paying of fines is posted at door and clerk can accept payments over the phone. Bond Court is normal with very limited attendance. Court has been continued until May 6. Notes:



Clarendon
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Our Court is located in the County Administration Building at 411 Sunset Drive. We are completely open to the public.  There is no limit to the number of people in the building at any one time.  Individual offices are permitted to limit the number of customers in their respective offices.  There is limited security for this building (one private company security guard on duty at any given time). Per the Order of the SC Supreme Court, we are taking the temperatures of people coming into our lobby area, and are requiring masks.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Open to the public. Limit of two people inside at a time. The office has limited staff.



Bond Court

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Our bonding judges hold two hearings per day at the jail and prepare warrants on the weekend as standard procedure.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Court is being held regularly. Masks and social distancing required. All persons are encouraged to make payment by mail or online. Filings are accepted via mail, email and fax. Defendants are encouraged to call 803-435-2670 to discuss court dates, appearance options and payments. Most civil cases are conducted via WebEx. In person court requires defendants to report to the front door and remain outside for instructions and until their case is called to assure social distancing. No one is allowed to enter without a mask.



Municipal Court

Summerton Municipal Court - Court is being held on a regular schedule. Masks and social distancing required. Turbeville Municipal Court - All court has been suspended. All payments are being accepted through US Mail. Call (803) 934-6128 or email pbhjudge@yahoo.com with questions about tickets.



Colleton
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

As of 3/22/2021 the Colleton County courts are proceeding in Common Please and General Sessions with in-person court, with the exception of the jail cases are virtual. Safety protocols are in place and are being observed. Family Court is scheduling emergency in-person hearings for matters that cannot be handed remotely. Colleton County Courthouse is operating under normal circumstances. Offices are open Monday thru Friday from 8:00 a.m. to 5:00p.m. In accordance with the Chief Justice Beatty, face masks are required to enter the building and temperature is taken at the door to be able to enter.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Colleton Probate Court is open to the public and marriage licenses are being issued. Hearings being conducted by video. Public is encouraged to conduct business by mail, email, or by submitting filings via dropbox located outside front door of court.



Bond Court - Limited

Bond Court will be conducted twice daily between the hours 9:30 am and 10:00 am and in the afternoon between the hours of 3:30 pm and 4:00 pm through video conferencing. Please contact the court at least one hour prior to the scheduled time to receive instructions on how to view the proceedings.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Open to the Public Monday thru Friday 8:00 am to 5:00 pm for all court business. County mask ordinance must be adhered to for entry. All court cases are operating on schedule. Payments can be made in office if you need assistance with filing your paperwork. We are still offering filings with the appropriate fees can be dropped off at the Drop Box located at the main entrance to the Magistrate Court at 40 Klein Street, Walterboro between the hours of 8:30 a.m. to 4:00 pm. Also, all documents can still be submitted by mail to Colleton County Magistrate Court, P.O. Box 1732, Walterboro, SC 29488. Per order of the South Carolina Supreme Court, all filings and documents received by the Magistrate Office will be quarantined for 48 hours before staff may process them. Make sure you enclose a stamped/self-addressed envelope for your receipt and clocked copies. Receipts and any paperwork will be mailed once completed. Staff is available by phone to answer any questions during office hours at (843) 549-1122 – Civil Court or (843) 549-1140 – Traffic Court. We are accepting fines cash payments for Traffic fines in office exact amount if possible. We are encouraging use of debit/credit cards by paying online at www.colletoncounty.org. If you cannot pay online, we will accept payments in the form of money orders by mail addressed to Colleton County Magistrate Court, P.O. Box 1732, Walterboro, SC 29488. Payment can also be made in the form of Money Order or Cashier Check for fines, please place a copy of the ticket or put the ticket number on the money order or Cashier Check (No personal checks will be accepted) and place in the Drop Box located at the main entrance. NOTE: Mailed payments will be receipted after the 48 hour quarantine. Please remember all online payments require up to 3 business days to be processed.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Town of Edisto Beach will resume our regular court schedule March 18, 2021 at 3:00 PM. We will be conducting non-jury/traffic court on the regular schedule with the utilization of safety measures. The Walterboro Municipal Court office remains closed to the public. The City Clerks are in the office during regular business hours (8am-5pm) to answer phones and take care of daily paperwork. We are accepting payments online and via mail. The Clerks will meet parties at the door, while practicing social distancing and wearing masks. Bond hearings are being held at regularly scheduled times (8:00-8:30am and 3:00-4:00pm) daily, as needed. No Jury Trials are being scheduled at the present time. Virtual Court is being scheduled as needed for Prelims and Court Appointed Cases. Traffic Court will resume in April with a limited number of people in the Court room following all safety precautions which include masks, social distancing, hand sanitation, and temperature checks at the door. Cottageville Municipal Court is open during normal business hours. Bond hearings will be conducted with local detention centers and conducted twice daily as needed. The Clerk can be reached at (843-835-8655) or by email at hfuse@cottageville.org. Bonds, fines and STPs can be paid or setup over the phone. We accept filings via fax, email and mail. Traffic Court will proceed as normal with a limited number of people inside the courtroom. We are encouraging all citizens to pay by mail or via phone for any citations that need to be paid. The Town of Edisto Beach are conducting non-jury/traffic court on the regular schedule with the utilization of safety measures. The Walterboro Municipal Court Office is closed to the public. The County Clerks are in the office during regular business hours to answer phones, and are accepting payments online and via mail. The Clerks will meet parties at the door, while practicing social distancing and wearing mask. Bond hearings are being held at regularly scheduled times (8:00 - 8:30 AM and 3:00 - 4:00 PM) daily, as needed.



Darlington
Last Updated - 11/10/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: General Sessions and Family Court filings will be taken in the lobby after calling the clerk's office. Common Pleas filings and payments by appointment only. All matters handled in the Clerk of Court need to must be scheduled through appointments. Fourth Circuit Family Court Order Suspending Arrests for Unexecuted Bench Warrants for Nonpayment of Child Support and Alimony



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Darlington Probate Court office is partially open. The office is accepting calls and making appointments. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment via mail and drop off. Contact Probate Court for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Accepting marriage applications. The Probate Court are now issuing marriage licenses. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Hearings may be set by Polycom or Zoom if both sides agree.



Bond Court - Normal

Bond hearings are held twice daily.



Magistrate Court

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: All court cases are operating on schedule in the Darlington and Hartsville offices, with the exception of jury trials. Both offices are open to the public Monday - Friday, 8:30 a.m. until 5:00 p.m. Payments can be made in the office. Cash payments in exact amounts are accepted. Payment by debit/credit cards are accepted in office and online. Notes:



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Notes: Darlington County - Lamar Municipal Court is held on the third Monday of the month. Access to the Town Hall is only available on court days which causes limited access. Fines can be paid online at Lamarsc.org or a money order can be mailed to the Town Hall. Appointments can be made by calling (843) 326-5551 to set up payments or to pay in person.



Dillon
Last Updated - 01/28/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Attorneys may contact the clerk's office to set an appointment for filings. We let them into the Courthouse to file and pay the filing fees. We are also taking General Sessions payment and meeting the individual at the door to collect the monies letting them know we do not have change and to have the correct monies. We are also making copies and mailing to the individual. Fourth Circuit Family Court Order Suspending Arrests for Unexecuted Bench Warrants for Nonpayment of Child Support and Alimony Notes: Circuit and Family Courts are open for limited purposes until further notice. Call your attorney regarding scheduling questions. Also we have locked our Courthouse and placed numbers of the Clerks Office and Child Support on the message. We are also only letting (1) paralegal and (1) attorney in the back to do title work. We are working full staff in Child Support and full staff in Register of Deeds. We are not letting the public into the Courthouse.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Dillon County Probate office will be closed January 12 - 13, 2021 due to COVID-19 exposure. Signage will be posted to direct the public on filings and other probate court business. Dillon County Probate Court is open but with limited public access. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via drop box and mail. Teleconferencing via Zoom is available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications are accepted in the office. Probate packets are available and can be picked up at the Probate office. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Safety precautions are in place.



Bond Court

No Details Provided



Magistrate Court

No Details Provided



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Latta Municipal Court: We are closed to the public due to the Coronavirus and Social Distancing Protocol. Court has been postponed until we assess that it is safe to reschedule. We are accepting online payments at www.townoflattascpayments.com, via mail and drop box. Bond hearings are held at least once a day or as needed. The Judge is in the office to assist with daily operations such as answering phone calls, voice messages, receipts, dispositions, warrants, etc.



Dorchester
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

UPDATE FROM THE CLERK OF COURT DORCHESTER COUNTY COURTHOUSES. CIRCUIT/FAMILY COURT HEARINGS: Jury Trials will begin starting April 5, 2021. When possible, all other hearings and non-jury trials will be conducted via remote communication technology. If an in-person proceeding is held, attorneys, parties to the matter and any witnesses must take direction from the Clerk of Court, or her designee, prior to entering the courtroom or hearing room. JURY SERVICE: Any questions or concerns regarding Circuit Court Jury Services, please contact 843-563-5784 or 843-851-5784. PPE: All county employees, vendors, and visitors must have their temperature checked prior to entering the building. After the individual’s temperature has been taken, they will be given a wristband that must be worn and be visible while at county facilities. The wristband will grant the individual access to all county facilities, that day. Note: the color of the wristband will change daily. All vendors and visitors to county buildings will be required to bring and wear a face mask covering their nose and mouth at all times, while inside county facilities. The Circuit Court in St. George will continue with the drop boxes at the front entrance of the St. George Courthouse for all incoming paper documents. Citizens who need assistance with documents will be allowed into the building after passing a health screening. All documents will still be subject to a 24-48 hour quarantine period. Once the quarantine period has ended, these documents will be date stamped with the date they were actually received, and court staff will then process the documents. The Clerk of Court acknowledges this may impact filings that have date specific statutory filing requirements and urges all submitting parties to be aware of the added time restraints and plan accordingly. GUIDELINES FOR PROCESSING BOND ACTIONS: Dorchester County Clerk of Court’s office will continue to accept emailed and faxed documents for bonds, affidavits, motions, etc. during this crucial time, but original documents must be placed in the drop box provided at the front entrance of the courthouse located at 5200 East Jim Bilton Blvd., St. George, SC 29477, within 2 days of processing. If documents have not been received within the allotted time, exactly as emailed or faxed to us, they will be subject to immediate revocation. Documents must be submitted with complete and accurate information. Please submit email requests to all three email addresses listed below and someone with respond promptly. Tonda Westbury twestbury@dorchestercountysc.gov 843-832-0231; Karen Mizell kmizell@dorchestercountysc.gov 843-832-0183; and Jodi Burbage jburbage@dorchestercountysc.gov 843-832-5784 Fax # 843-563-0178 or 843-832-0178. TO POST A BOND: Please contact our office by phone or email and we will email or fax you the bond form. Once you have completed the second page of the bond form, please return it to our office by fax or email along with the power (scanned copy). Once the documents have been reviewed, an Order of Release will be sent to the detention center and to the bondsman. The bondsman will then need to place the original bond form and the original power in the drop box within 2 days. To file a Motion to be Relieved: Please email your completed Motion and Affidavit. Once the documents have been reviewed, a scanned certified copy will be emailed back to you. The bondsman will then need to place the original Motion and Affidavit along with the $20 payment (check preferred) in the drop box within 2 days. To file an Affidavit of Surrender: Please email your completed Affidavit. Once the documents have been reviewed, a scanned certified copy will be emailed back to you. The bondsman will then need to place the original Affidavit in the drop box within 2 days. All other Courts remain open at this time. Dorchester County Offices and Courts reopened on May 18, 2020 and will remain open to the general public. Out of an abundance of caution for residents and county staff several safety measures are in place. It is highly recommended that residents and business owners continue to utilize online services. Convenience fees for certain online transactions remain waived until further notice. Any questions or concerns regarding Circuit Court Jury Services, please contact 843-563-5784 or 843-851-5784. Temperature Checks Effective, Monday, May 18, 2020, all county employees, vendors, and visitors must have their temperature checked prior to entering the building. After the individual’s temperature has been taken, they will be given a wristband that must be worn and be visible while at county facilities. The wristband will grant the individual access to all county facilities, that day. Note: the color of the wristband will change daily. Masks Beginning, Monday, May 18, 2020, all vendors and visitors to county buildings will be required to bring and wear a face mask covering their nose and mouth at all times, while inside county facilities.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building is open to the public. Must wear a mask. Temperature check is performed by security before entering the building. Acceptance of filings and payments but the entire courthouse has a 24 hour quarantine policy that must be followed. Video conferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications are available online.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bonds are conducted daily via video conferencing and remains as scheduled. Only victims and one family member of the defendant are allowed in the courtroom due to capacity allowance. To post a bond: Please contact our office by phone or email and we will email or fax you the bond form. Once you have completed the second page of the bond form, please return it to our office by fax or email along with the power (scanned copy). Once the documents have been reviewed, an Order of Release will be signed by the judge and sent to the detention center. The original documents must be submitted exactly as when they were emailed or faxed to us. Original documents not received may be subject to immediate revocation. Please submit email requests to all three email addresses listed below and someone will respond promptly. Judy Davis jdavis@dorchestercountysc.gov Ext. 5423 Bernie Goodwine bgoodwine@dorchestercountysc.gov Ext. 5411 Elizabeth Walker ewalker@dorchestercountysc.gov Ext. 5412 Phone: 843-832-0370 Fax #: 843-832-0371 Bonds are conducted daily via video conferencing and remains as scheduled. Only victims and one family member of the defendant are allowed on the courtroom due to capacity allowance. Bonds, fines and STP’s can be paid online at www.harleyvillesc.com All jury trials and preliminary hearings have been postponed at the direction of Court Administration. Non-jury proceedings are scheduled at the judge’s discretion with staggered court times for each officer to allow cleaning/sanitizing. Citizens with charges, attorneys, and/or witnesses are admitted unless special circumstances require it. Limited capacity is allowed. Clerk is available in office Monday – Thursday 8AM-5PM, Friday 8AM-12PM, Saturday and Sunday via email only. Tentative Court Schedule: Tuesday September 8, 2020 4PM Tuesday October 13, 2020 4PM Bonds are conducted daily via video conferencing and remains as scheduled. Only victims and one family member of the defendant are allowed on the courtroom due to capacity allowance. Bonds, fines and STP’s can be paid online at www.harleyvillesc.com All jury trials and preliminary hearings have been postponed at the direction of Court Administration. Non-jury proceedings are scheduled at the judge’s discretion with staggered court times for each officer to allow cleaning/sanitizing. Citizens with charges, attorneys, and/or witnesses are admitted unless special circumstances require it. Limited capacity is allowed. Clerk is available in office Monday – Thursday 8AM-5PM, Friday 8AM-12PM, Saturday and Sunday via email only. Tentative Court Schedule: Tuesday September 8, 2020 4PM Tuesday October 13, 2020 4PM



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Dorchester County Magistrates Court Summerville and St. George is open to the public 8:30AM to 5:00PM Monday-Friday. Civil filings are accepted in person. Civil hearings are scheduled daily and are staggered with limited capacity allowance per courtroom. Courtrooms are cleaned/sanitized after each hearing. Preliminary hearings and non-jury proceedings are scheduled as normal with staggered court times for each office to allow time for cleaning/sanitizing. Citizens with charges, attorneys, and/or witnesses are admitted unless special circumstances require it. Limited capacity is allowed. All Jury Trials hearings are postponed until further notice. Clerks are available in office Monday –Friday 8:30AM-5PM. All criminal/traffic fines can be paid in person or online. We strongly encourage payments to be paid online at: https://www.dorchestercountysc.gov/ Upon entering the building, temperatures are checked and a mask must be worn. A mask will be provided if needed. Dorchester County Magistrates Court Summerville and St. George is open to the public 8:30AM to 5:00PM daily. Acceptance of civil filings can be dropped off in person and must be quarantined for 24 hours. All criminal/traffic fines can be paid in person or online. We strongly encourage payments to be paid online. All evidence for hearings must be submitted at least 24 hours prior to your hearing for quarantine. Hearings are scheduled daily and are staggered with limited capacity allowance per courtroom and is cleaned/sanitized after each hearing. All Jury Trials and Preliminary Hearings are postponed until further notice. Upon entering the building, temperatures are checked and a mask must be worn. A mask will be provided if needed.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Harleyville Municipal Court – Clerk’s office is closed to the public except by appointment. Those entering and/or conducting business via appointment is required to have their temperature checked prior to entry, must wear a face mask, and answer COVID-19 screening questions. A mask will be provided if needed. Only individuals with charges or victims are admitted unless special circumstances require it. Signage is posted at each entrance giving contact information. It is encouraged to reach the Court by phone at 843-462-7676 or by email at court.harleyville@yahoo.com. City of North Charleston Municipal Court - Bond hearings will be conducted daily at 9:00AM. All bond hearings will be conducted with local detention centers through video conferencing. Except for emergencies, all other court sessions will be cancelled through June 1, 2020. Any cases scheduled for hearing during this time will be rescheduled. Notice of any rescheduled cases will be provided by mail. Town of Saint George Municipal Court is open to the public with limited capacity. Clerk is available in office Monday – Thursday 10:00AM to 5:00PM, Friday via telephone or email, Saturday and Sunday via email only. Temperature checks are required and COVID-19 screening questions will be asked before entering the building. A face covering or mask must be worn and a mask will be provided if needed. Individuals with charges and/or victims are admitted unless special circumstances are required. It is encouraged to contact the Clerk via phone at 843-563-3240 or by email at clerkofcourt@townofstgeorgesc.org Bonds and fines can be paid online at www.saintgeorgesc.org or by calling toll free 1-877-794-1145 or 843-563-3240. Summerville Municipal Court is open to the public 8:30AM to 5:00PM daily. All criminal/traffic hearings are scheduled daily and are staggered with limited capacity allowance and is cleaned/sanitized after each hearing. Fines can be paid in person or online. Evidence can be electronically submitted prior to your hearing. All Jury Trials and Preliminary Hearings are postponed until further notice. Temperature checks are required upon entering the building and a mask must be worn. A mask will be provided if needed. Bond Court – Bond hearings are conducted twice daily 10:00AM and 1:00PM via video conferencing with limited capacity. This includes the victim and or victim’s family and the defendant’s family to no more than a total of two. Ridgeville Municipal Court – Clerk’s office is open to the public, however those entering and/or conducting business is required to have their temperature checked prior to entry, must wear a face mask, and answer COVID-19 screening questions. A mask will be provided if needed. Only individuals with charges or victims are admitted unless special circumstances require it. It is encouraged to contact the clerk by phone at 843-871-7960 or email at ridgevilleclerk.treasurer@gmail.com. Bonds, fines, and STP’s can be paid in person at the Clerk’s office Notes: Non-jury proceedings are scheduled at the judge’s discretion with staggered court times per officer. Only citizens with charges, attorneys, and witnesses are admitted unless special circumstances are required. All Jury Trials and Preliminary Hearings are postponed until further notice. Tentative Court Schedule: Tuesday September 15, 2020 4:30PM Tuesday October 20, 2020 4:30PM



Edgefield
Last Updated - 08/12/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments:

Edgefield County Courthouse is open to the public. The front door is locked, so that only a specific number are allowed inside at a time. Only one person per pay window allowed. FC / GS / CP are operating. ROD are allowing abstractors by appointment only and are servicing the public at the pay window. A WebEx remote station is available for those without internet access for hearings.

Eleventh Circuit Family Court Administrative Memorandum



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Probate Court is appointment only. Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment via mail. Contact court for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Accepting marriage applications, however, unable to issue marriage licenses. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Notes:



Bond Court - Normal

Bond Court is still being conducted at our normal times Notes:



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: At this time, the Edgefield County Magistrate’s Office has closed the lobby to the public. We have placed signs with contact information for those who wish to make payments or file civil actions. The lobby will remain closed until it is directed to be open by the Edgefield County Administrator. Jury Trials are suspended indefinitely. The Court shall conduct Bench Trials and emergency hearings as necessary, showing due regard to the safety of the public, all litigants, and Court Staff. Bond Court Proceedings will continue to be held as normal. Notes: Emergency Hearings will take place as normal, in our office, with only essential parties present. If our situation requires the office to close, and staff to remain home, I will have office hours on Tuesday and Thursday, from 1:00 p.m. until 4:00 p.m. for the purpose of accepting payments and filings.



Municipal Court

No Details Provided



Fairfield
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: All offices in the Fairfield County Courthouse are open and accepting filings and payments in person or at the outside drop box. The Family Court is open. Sixth Circuit Family Court Memo re: Court Procedures and WebEx



Probate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Fairfield County Probate Court is open to the public.



Bond Court - Normal

Bond Hearings are conducted twice daily via videoconferencing, 9:00 a.m. and 5:00 p.m.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Effective March 15, 2021, The Fairfield County Magistrate Office returned to normal operations, with the exception of jury trials. In-person jury trials may be held beginning April 5, 2021. Our office hours are 9:00 am - 5:00 pm, (closed for lunch from 12:30pm-1:30pm). Notes:



Municipal Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Winnsboro Municipal Court has returned to normal operations. Bond Hearings are conducted twice daily, 8:00am and 4:00pm



Florence
Last Updated - 12/22/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Florence County Circuit Courts Jury Trials and Non-jury proceedings are back to normal schedule. All roll calls and other large gatherings are cancelled until further notice. Filings and payments (money orders, business checks or cashier’s checks only) can be mailed or accepted by appointment only. Please call the Circuit Court at (843) 665-3017. The Register of Deeds office in the Complex will continue to allow very limited attendance, which will be by appointment only. Paralegals will be allowed in the Record Room by appointment only and limited to three people at a time, for approximately four hours per appointment. To make an appointment, call (843) 665-3031. Those receiving appointments must remain at their assigned work station during their appointed time. Documents may be left in the drop box at the back Complex entrance with security in a marked envelope with clear directions for where and to whom it should be directed. Items dropped off without a paralegal’s name on them will be recorded upon receipt. Filings can be mailed to 180 N. Irby Street. MSC-E. Florence. SC 29501



Probate Court - Limited

Florence County Probate Court is open by appointment only - three (3) visitors from the general public at a time who have scheduled an appointment. Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Judicial Building open to the public, by appointment only. All persons visiting the Probate Court must enter the Judicial facility with an appropriate face mask or covering and must use hand sanitizers and practice social distancing. Temperatures will be taken at the security entrance for all persons entering the Florence County Judicial Center. Contact Probate Court via phone at (843) 665-3085, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via mail and phone. Telephone conferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Processing marriage applications as usual, by appointment. Issuing marriage licenses to parties with an upcoming wedding date. All non-emergency hearings continued until after September 1, 2020. All non-contested matters where it is appropriate to do so will be addressed with Final Consent Orders signed by all parties and their counsel of record with the approval of Probate Judge, upon receipt of a proper motion and filing fee. Notes:



Bond Court

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond hearings are being held once daily with only victims or defendant's attorney present.



Magistrate Court - Normal

All Magistrate’s Offices will be closed on the week of December 21 to December 28, 2020 and will reopen on December 29, 2020. Effingham Magistrate’s Office will remain open. If you need assistance while these offices are closed, please call Chief Magistrate Belinda Timmons at (843)-618-9234. Please also note that major construction is taking place near the Florence Magistrate office. Payments for traffic and criminal cases may be placed in the drop box in the form of a money order or cashier's check. Please make sure to include your complete name, address, and case number(s) along with correct payment to the appropriate trial court. A receipt will be mailed to the address provided. No cash payments or personal checks are being accepted at this time. You may also pay your ticket(s) online by going to www.sccourts.org/casesearch OR www.florenceco.org. Civil Papers Non-emergency evictions are not being accepted at this time. Florence magistrates courts are accepting filings for summons and complaint/claim and delivery. Once all paperwork is completed along with the correct filing fee, place in the drop box where the case will be heard. Forms can be found online at www.sccourts.org OR www.florenceco.org/offices/magistrate/civil/forms. Drop Box Locations Florence Magistrate 180 N. Irby Street (MSC-W) Florence, SC 29501 Office: (843) 665-0031 or (843) 661-7001 Fax: (843) 661-7800 Office Hours: Monday-Friday, 8:30am-4:30pm Lake City Magistrate Judge Dominic Owens 345 Ron McNair Boulevard P.O. BOX 39 Lake City, SC 29560 Office: (843) 394-5461 or (843) 669-3915 Fax: (843) 394-3865 Office Hours: Monday-Friday, 8:30am-4:30pm Timmonsville Magistrate Judge James Beard Jr. 307 E Smith Street P.O. Box 190 Timmonsville, SC 29161 Office: (843) 346-7472 or (843) 346-5852 Fax: (843) 346-0660 Office Hours: Monday-Friday, 8:30am-5:00pm Closed Friday Johnsonville Magistrate Judge Holly Wall 114 West Broadway St. P.O. Box 904 Johnsonville, SC 29555 Office: (843) 380-9211 Fax: (843) 380-9411 Office Hours: Monday 8:30am-5:00pm, Wednesday 8:30am-5:00pm, Friday 8:30am-1:00pm Olanta Magistrate Judge David S. Kelley 220 East Main Street P.O. Box 362 Olanta, SC 29114-0362 Office: (843) 396-9056 Fax: (843) 396-9406 Office Hours: Tuesday & Wednesday 8:30am-4:30pm, Thursday 8:30am-3:30pm Closed Monday & Friday Pamplico Magistrate Judge Kimberly Cox P.O. Box 367 124 E Third Ave Pamplico, SC 29583 Office: (843) 493-0072 Fax: (843) 493-5391 Office Hours: Monday-Thursday, 8:30am-5:00pm Closed Friday



Municipal Court - Normal

Florence County Summary Courts are in full operation Monday - Friday, 8:30 a.m. until 4:30 p.m. City of Florence Municipal Court - Bond Court is being held once daily. Tickets can be paid at www.florencesccitycourtpayment.com or mailed in the form of a money order or cashier’s check. Please call Florence Municipal Court at 843-665 3148 with any questions. Olanta Municipal Court - Olanta Municipal court will be rescheduled due to Covid-19 and you will be receiving notices through the mail with the rescheduled date. Please call the court to make sure we have your correct address to insure that you can receive any updates as needed. You can make payments via the drop box located behind the office or mail to PO Box 365 Olanta, SC 29114.



Georgetown
Last Updated - 01/12/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Georgetown County is open for business 8:30 a.m.-5:00 p.m. daily, limited in-person access to the Clerk of Court’s office; service provided via appointments, e-mails, building entrance drop-box, parking lot drive-thru, FAX, telephone. Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions and Common Pleas - Acceptance of filings and payments: drop box at the Judicial Center, drive-thru window in the parking lot - WebEx hearings for all courts are in effect; limited in-person hearings at the discretion of the judges. Common Pleas and General Sessions Non-Jury hearings are held via WebEx unless the judge determines that an in-person needs to be arranged with a limited appearance by the parties involved. Family Court hearings are held via WebEx with the exception of emergency hearings or any other in-person hearings as deemed necessary by the judge.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Georgetown County Probate Court is open for business 8:30 a.m.-5:00 p.m. daily with limited in-person access to the Court’s office; service provided via appointments, e-mails, building entrance drop-box, mail, fax, telephone. Teleconferencing and in-person (if necessary) available for hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted via email, mail, and appointment.



Bond Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond court proceedings are being held once a day at 9 am at the Detention Center with one clerk in the Bond Court room to operate the video bonding equipment and complete paperwork.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Georgetown County magistrate court offices will be closed to the general public through January 25 and all transactions will be handled via drop boxes, mail in requests, phone and internet. Staff will report to work as scheduled and be available to receive documents and payments placed in our drop boxes and to receive phone calls and messages via email. - Georgetown/Central Traffic Court will be closed to the public beginning Monday, June 29, 2020 and will re-open Monday, July 13, 2020. Emergency matters will be held by appointment. - There is a drop box at the Georgetown/Central Traffic Court location at 333 Cleland Street in which any case for any office can be dropped along with payments for fines and fees (money order or cashier’s check only). These filings and payments are processed on a regular basis. Clerks are checking the mail 2-3 times a week but not processing any mail for at least 24 hours after it is received in our offices. Payments are still accepted via credit card payments over the phone or by web. Staff is checking the status of credit card and web payments frequently. - All bond hearings are being conducted via video. No staff member from the court is entering the Detention Center at this time but one staff member is responsible for the transmission of documents and to receive paperwork. Bond hearings are being held at 9 am daily by the assigned morning Judge during the week and by the on-call assigned Judge on the weekends and holidays. - All offices have signs posted to indicate our operating hours and procedures during this emergency.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Andrews Municipal Court - Filings and payments can be made by mail or at the drive-thru window at Town Hall located at 101 North Morgan Avenue. Staff processes those on the same day or the next business day and receipts are mailed out. The Andrews Summary Court is currently closed. The office will reopen at 8:30am on Monday, October 5th 2020. Emergencies may be directed to the Georgetown Summary Court at 843-545-3381, located at 333 Cleland Street- Georgetown, S.C. 29440



Greenville
Last Updated - 02/08/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: If the courthouse closes, any request should be sent via mail or by making an appointment with the clerk's office.



Probate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Greenville County Probate Court is open to the public, but adhering to all CDC protocols (wearing masks, temperature readings, and social distancing). The number of persons in the lobbies is restricted to 6 they must be 6 ft. apart. The temperature of all persons entering the Probate Office will be taken prior to entry. Anyone 100 degrees or above will not be allowed entry. All persons entering the office must wear a facial covering at all times. Filings may be made via drop box, email, mail, or in-person. The preferred method for payment of filing fees is online at www.greenvillecounty.org/probate or by credit card if paid in person. All hearings are held via videoconference( ZOOM or WebEx) unless an in-person hearing is permitted by the Presiding Judge. All administrative operations are continuing using the following preferred contact methods: telephone, videoconference (ZOOM or WebEx), email, and drop boxes. Free online research of probate filings is available to SC attorneys using the PAWS system after registration. See the website for instructions. Marriage license applications are being accepted online. See www.greenvillecounty.org/probate for further information.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Greenville County Bond Court is currently operating as normal. We do have the ability to do bonds by video if necessary.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The North Greenville Summary Court is now open.



Municipal Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Greenville Municipal Court is open on a regular schedule. We are conducting hearing as needed and continuing to reschedule cases for after April 30, 2020 at present. Only individuals with charges are admitted unless special circumstances require it. Mauldin Municipal Court: Monday - Friday Office hours 8:30 am- 12:30 pm Bond Posting Hours - 9 am- 12(noon) Bond hearings 1 pm Saturday/Sunday Bond Posting Hours - 9 am to 11 am Bond hearing 12 noon



Greenwood
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

The Greenwood County Courthouse is open to the public. Masks required.



Probate Court - Limited

Probate Court in Greenwood County is open, but the building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via drop box. Video conferencing and teleconferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted via online, mail, and email. All non-emergency hearings are continued. The public can use the phone at the security door and the staff will respond to the requests.



Bond Court - Normal

Bond court is open and operating as normal.



Magistrate Court - Normal

. Open and operating as normal.



Municipal Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: City of Greenwood Municipal Court - While City Hall’s doors are locked in accordance to the City’s emergency protocol, our staff is available by phone during our normal working hours of 8:30am-5:00pm. Contact numbers for the court office are: 864-942-8458, 864-942-8474 and 864-942-8477. The city has a drop box that is located on the right hand side of city hall for payments. Envelopes are available for payments. Online payments are encouraged. You may make a payment at www.cityofgreenwoodsc.com. Court dates continuance letters are being mailed to the last known address of those with pending court dates. We are conducting bond hearings at least twice a day and more if needed. Bond hearings are being held in the bond courtroom at the Greenwood County Detention Center. The courtroom is isolated from the rest of the jail and can be sanitized after any bond hearings.



Hampton
Last Updated - 11/10/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Hampton County Clerk of Court is open with limited services. Notes:



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Probate Judge's office is by appointment only. Filings/payment can be made via mail. Contact the Probate Court about emergency and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted via mail and phone (video conferencing is available). All non-emergency hearings are continued. Notes:



Bond Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Hampton County Magistrate Office will conduct in-person bond hearings and/or via teleconference at the parties request, with only the necessary persons appearing. We are currently continuing collections of monies as usual but if necessary would ask persons paying fines or bonds to pay with money orders thus eliminating face to face exchanging of monies. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Open to the Public Monday thru Friday 8:30 am to 4:30 pm for all court business. All court cases are operating on schedule with the exception of jury trials. The court in its discretion can use videoconferencing for hearings if requested by a party if all parties have the capability. Bond Court will continue as normal twice daily 9:00 am and 4:00 pm, Monday-Friday, and Saturday, Sunday & holidays, 8:00 am and 4:00 pm as necessary. Temperature checks, masks and social distancing are required when entering the Law Enforcement Center. The Court will limit the number of people in the Court at a time. Defendants & victims will be called one at a time, and will wait in their cars until the case is called. Court staff, all law enforcement officers and attorneys will wear masks upon entering the court. Sanitizing products will be available in the courtroom. Payments can be made in office if you need assistance with filing your paperwork. We are still offering filings with the appropriate fees can be dropped off at the Black Drop Box located at the main entrance to the Law Enforcement Center at 411 Cemetery Road, Varnville, SC during regular business hours or after hours. Also, all documents can still be submitted by mail to Hampton County Magistrate Court, P.O. Box 1299, Varnville, SC 29944. Per order of the South Carolina Supreme Court, all filings and documents received by the Magistrate Office will be quarantined for 48 hours before staff may process them. Make sure you enclose a stamped/self-addressed envelope for your receipt and clocked copies. Receipts and any paperwork will be mailed once completed. Staff is available by phone to answer any questions during office hours (8:00 am – 4:30 pm) at (803) 914-2230. We are accepting fines & court costs, cash payments for Criminal & Traffic fines in office, correct change. We are encouraging use of debit/credit cards are accepted at www.hamptoncountysc.org. If you cannot pay online, we will accept payments in the form of money orders by mail addressed to Hampton County Magistrate Court, P.O. Box 1299, Varnville, SC 29944. Payment can also be made in the form of Money Order or Cashier Check for fines, please place a copy of the ticket or put the ticket number on the money order or Cashier Check (No personal checks will be accepted) and place in the Drop Box located at the main entrance. NOTE: Mailed payments will be receipted after the 48 hour quarantine. Please remember all online payments require up to 3-5 business days to be processed.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Estill Municipal Court - Closed to the public. Filings and payments made be made via mail or in the drop box at town hall. Bond hearings as normal, within 24 hours of arrest. All court dates through May 1, 2020 are cancelled and will be rescheduled. Preliminary Hearings must be scheduled with the Clerk of Court. (803) 625-3243. Fairfax Municipal is closed due to possible employee virus exposure. The Court will be closed until further notice. Reopening will be announced as soon as testing has been completed. Fairfax Municipal is closed all day due to possible employee virus exposure. The Court will be closed until further notice. The reopening will be announced as soon as testing has been completed. Notes:



Horry
Last Updated - 03/08/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited
Probate Court - Limited

Horry County Probate Court is open to the public by appointment only. Pursuant to the Chief Justice’s Order, masks must be worn by everyone entering the building. The Court is also in contact with the public by phone, email, fax and drop box.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond court is operating normally, two courts a day.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Horry County Magistrates Offices will open in person civil and criminal bench trials on 3-15-21. Jury Court 04-12-21 Domestic Violence Court 03-17-21 Prelim Court 03-19-21 Traffic Court 04-05-21 All Magistrate Offices which include Traffic Court and Jury Court are housed in County buildings are open to the public. All Offices have been instructed to post their office phone number and the public will be met at the door. We are receiving filings and payments. We have advised the public when possible to make payments online, with instructions how.



Municipal Court - Limited

Conway Municipal Court - Bond court will be held daily via videoconferencing. All April 2020 court dates through April 29, 2020, have been rescheduled until May 2020. Notes: All Municipal courts are open except for jury trials.



Jasper
Last Updated - 07/20/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Persons will be admitted on a limited basis after speaking with security. Notes:



Probate Court - Closed

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via mail. Contact the Probate Court about emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted via mail or by appointment. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Notes:



Bond Court - Limited

Bond hearings are still being held twice a day. Bond Court will continue to be held through Zoom until further notice.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Due to the recent increase in Covid-19 cases in South Carolina, the Jasper County Magistrate Court will be operating as follows: All Traffic Court cases will be continued until after September 15, 2020. Bond Court will continue to be held through Zoom until further notice. Preliminary hearings remain continued pursuant to the Chief Justice's previous Order. All jury trials will be continued in keeping with the Chief Justice's Order. We will begin holding them once the moratorium is lifted and we can do so safely in our courtroom. Civil and Criminal Court will continue to be held. All cases that can be scheduled remotely will be heard in that manner. If a remote hearing is not possible, we will continue to observe the social distancing guidelines currently recommended by the CDC. The office door will remain locked to keep unnecessary foot traffic down as we continue to provide the required necessary functions of the office. All defendants wanting to pay tickets shall be encouraged to do so online or to mail in money orders. If an individual requires admission to pay a ticket, file or appear for a civil action, file or appear for an eviction, appear at a petition for protection from domestic abuse hearing or for any other purpose contemplated herein, they shall be required to wear a mask and to comply with the safety policies posted on the door. Notes:



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Hardeeville Municipal Court is closed to the public. However, we are accepting payments online, over the phone and by mail. Filings can be emailed, faxed and/or mailed. Bond Hearings are normal. The Ridgeland Municipal Court is fully staffed. We are directing our customers to our drive thru window, where we are accepting all payments and fillings. Our Bond Courts are operating as normal. Notes:



Kershaw
Last Updated - 02/02/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: COURTHOUSE-FRONT DOOR *ONLY ALLOW PUBLIC TO ENTER IF: CIRCUIT COURT: FILINGS-DROP BOX AT FRONT EMERGENCY FILINGS ONLY/PAYMENTS BY MAIL/ONLINE Kershaw.sc.gov COMMON PLEAS COURT: lynn.lyons@kershaw.sc.gov Cheryl.truesdale@kershaw.sc.gov janet.hasty@kershaw.sc.gov GENERAL SESSIONS COURT: karen.kirkland@kershaw.sc.gov Ginger.farmer@kershaw.sc.gov janet.hasty@kershaw.sc.gov PUBLIC CALL 803-425-7223 FOR APPOINTMENTS OR ONLINE ASSISTANCE FAMILY COURT: FILINGS-DROP BOX AT FRONT, try our website Kershaw.sc.gov for more work emails. ALL CONTESTED MATTERS IN FAMILY COURT, INCLUDING AGENCY MATTERS, PRIVATE ACTIONS, BOTH TEMPORARY AND/OR FINAL WILL BE SCHEDULED BY WebEx UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE. CASH CHILD SUPPORT PURGE PAYMENTS ONLY MONEY ORDERS FOR FILINGS OF PRO-SE FILINGS, GO TO sccourts.org WEBSITE AND DOWNLOAD NECESSARY PAPERWORK. CALL 803-425-7225 FOR APPOINTMENTS OR ONLINE ASSISTANCE. MAGISTRATE COURT: LIMITED ACCEPTANCE OF FILINGS AND PAYMENTS CALL: 803-425-7226 PROBATE COURT: APPOINTMENTS ONLY:803-425-1503 ABSTRACTORS CALL 803-425-1503 SOLICITORS OFFICE: CALL 803-425-7672 PUBLIC DEFENDER OFFICE: CALL 803-425-7237 Entry to the courthouse by court or appointment only. Clerk of Court Office - (803) 425-7223 Family Court (803) 425-7225 Kershaw County is limited in services and open from 8:30 AM - 5:00 PM, Monday thru Friday. Only persons allowed in the courthouse are case parties (on filings) or people that have business in the courthouse, so that the social distancing guidelines are met. Masks and temperature checks are required to enter. Masks are required to be worn properly while doing business in the courthouse. Notes:



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Probate Court is open to the public by appointment only. Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via drop box and mail. Video conferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted made in person by appointment only. All non-emergency hearings are continued. You can schedule appointments or ask questions by calling (803) 425-1503. Abstractors may contact the Probate Court.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As normal.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Due to the recent surge in COVID-19 cases in Kershaw County, the Magistrate's Court is temporarily suspending all court activities. The office will remain open for the payment of fines and filing completed civil actions. Emergency actions will be processed as necessary. The safety of our community and staff is of the utmost importance as decisions are made regarding court operations. The public is encouraged to contact our office for any questions or concerns. Courts have resumed normal operations; however scheduled cases are now limited in number and scope to maintain social distances and comply with established orders. Civil filings are by appointment only. No walk-ins are being accepted.



Municipal Court - Limited

City of Camden Municipal Court is suspended until further Notice. Cases shall be continued and notices forwarded to appropriate parties when rescheduled. Payments continue to be accepted at 1000 Lyttleton Street, Camden, South Carolina 29020. Please use the drive thru window, as City Hall remains closed to the public. City of Camden Curt will be conducted at the Robert Mills Courthouse, 607 Broad Street, Camden, South Carolina 29020, beginning November 18, 200. The Clerk of Court an administrative functions of the Court remain at Camden City Hall, 1000 Lyttleton Street, Camden, South Carolina 29020 We intend to resume limited and modified City of Camden Municipal Court operations in September, 2020. The safety of our personnel, citizens and counsel is and will remain the paramount and guiding concern with regard to the process of holding court. Elgin Municipal Court As a precautionary measure to prevent the spread of COVID-19 in our community, the Town of Elgin will postpone all court proceedings of the Elgin Municipal Court until further notice. If you are scheduled for a Municipal Court date (date appears on your ticket, bond or court letter) in April, that Court appearance date will be rescheduled and notice given by letter as soon as it is viably safe to operate in open court again. YOUR CASE IS NOT DISMISSED NOR DISCHARGED, but will be rescheduled and your appearance will be required. Should you have any questions regarding a matter; please do not hesitate to contact our offices at: Elgin Town Hall 803-438-2362 Elgin Police Department 803-438-9917 After Hours Dispatch 803-424-4000 We are continuing to work closely with county and state officials and will notify the community, as information is made available. Thank you for your patience and understanding during this time. Notes:



Lancaster
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The courthouse access is limited until further notice. Filings are accepted by dropping off in our mailbox located at the Security Desk. Once processed, staff will contact for pick up. Filing for divorce without an attorney (Pro Se) can be accomplished by going to the sccourts.org website and downloading the necessary paperwork. We accept money orders only for these filings. Agencies needing copies can contact the office at 803-285-6961 (Family Court) 803-285-1581 (Criminal/Civil Court). Abstractors can contact the office and request information that can be scanned and emailed.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building has restricted access. Contact via phone, e mail, mail and fax. Filings/payments can be made by mail, subject to 48 hour paper quarantine. Video conferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications currently by appointment only and limited to county residents or to parties getting married in Lancaster County that can prove there is an upcoming wedding date or have extenuating circumstances. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Lancaster County Probate Court offers online marriage application that is accessible through the website. Once an application is submitted, court personnel will contact the applicant to schedule an appointment and verify the information. The Lancaster County Probate office has a drop box in the lobby of the courthouse for the convenience and safety of the public which is checked two times daily. Notes: Submit questions/inquiries via the e mail address of your case manager or via the "Contact Probate Court" link on the Court's website accessible thru Lancaster County website. (mylancastersc.org) Click "Departments" then "Probate"



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As normal. If the courthouse closes, bond hearings will be performed via videoconferencing. Victims will be allowed to call into the bond court courtroom to hear/participate telephonically.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As normal. If the courthouse closes, filings and payments should be sent via mail or paid online.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: City of Lancaster Municipal Court: We are not holding our regular Wednesday afternoon court until further notice. We are also no scheduling jury trials or preliminary hearings. Bond hearings are being held by face-time. The public is not coming into the court. Fines may be paid on-line, or arrangements made to pick up payments at the door, and receive a receipt. Some employees are working from home. Employees who come in are following safe practices.



Laurens
Last Updated - 01/26/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

The Laurens County Clerk of Court facility is open. Laurens County Clerk of Court is accepting filings and payment. The Clerk of Court is available by phone (864) 984-3538 with options. Business can be conducted through the drive thru for Register of Deeds and Clerk of Court. Citizens may need to call for drive through service. Staff will be available by phone and can email or fax information to public. Family Court: 8th Circuit Family Court Memo Regarding Hearings via WebEx



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via mail or drive-thru window. Contact the Probate Court for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage License application is posted on the county website with instructions. The building is open to the public with limited access. Appointments are required for any in-person contact with the probate Court and will be limited to certain services until further notice.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond court will continue to be held at the Laurens County Detention Center twice daily at 9:00 a.m. and 3 p.m.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Laurens County Magistrate Court has resumed normal operations. Anyone with a pending criminal/traffic case between the dates of October 15 through October 30 will be rescheduled. A summons will be mailed to you reflecting a new court date and time for you to appear. Clinton/Laurens Municipal courts will not be affected with this closure and will remain open during normal business hours. Laurens Magistrate Court will resume normal operations on October 30, 2020 unless further action is needed. Should you have any questions or concerns, you may call (864)681-0583 or email fhaupfear@co.laurens.sc.us.



Municipal Court - Limited

Notes: The City of Laurens is conducting Criminal and Traffic in our courtroom. This is limited to 15 persons at a time per docket. All persons entering the building are required to wear a mask. The proceedings are limited to victims, subjects, court officials and officers. No one can come in as a spectator during the proceedings. Bond hearings are held once a day.



Lee
Last Updated - 03/23/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

The Lee County courthouse is open to the public, however, only allowing 5 people in the courthouse at any one given time. Temperatures are being taken and mask are required. Notes: Persons attempting to enter the courthouse will be screened for symptoms.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Lee County Probate County requires that if you need to see someone in our office, you will need to make an appointment. For any questions or to schedule an appointment, please call 803-484-5341 ext. 339 or 361. Notes:



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bonds and emergency hearings are ongoing as usual. Bond hearings are done by teleconference with defendants at the Sumter Lee Detention Center. Bondsmen must contact the office during the week or the presiding judge on the weekend regarding the filing of paperwork for releases. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The lobby is open for filing of papers/payment of fines. Only one person is allowed in the lobby at a time due to space. Temperature checks are done at the door. Masks are required. The public is encouraged to mail fine payments to Lee County Central Court, 115 Gregg St., PO Box 2, Bishopville, SC or utilize drop box at the front entrance. Payments must be in the form of a cashier’s check or money order. No personal checks accepted. Court hearings are being held as scheduled.



Municipal Court

No Details Provided



Lexington
Last Updated - 09/24/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Filings and payments: Drive-up window at courthouse Lexington County Administration Building – Hours of Operation  Monday- Friday, 9 a.m. to 4 p.m. Temperatures will be taken upon arrival by a standup temperature module. If you have a fever of 100 degrees, the Information Booth Staff will direct you to exit the building. Lexington County Clerk of Court Memorandum Regarding Optional Filing Methods Eleventh Circuit Family Court Administrative Memorandum Notes: Register of Deeds - Methods for Recording Documents 1. Electronic recording through an eRecording vendor 2. Mail via Fedex, UPS or USPS- Provide a Self-Addressed Stamped Envelope 3. Drop Box in front of the County Administrator Building marked Treasurer 4. In Person - Monday- Friday 9:00 am – 4:00 pm All who need to utilize the ROD office for recording of documents must go through the temperature screening prior to being allowed into the building. Entrance only through front door of the Administration Building,



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments:

Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via mail and drive-thru. Video conferencing available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted by mail and by drive-thru. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Our bond court remains open from 8:00 a.m. – 2:00 p.m. daily. Any bench warrant or bond is handled at that office.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: We have posted on the entrance to our building a phone number and email address for the public to contact us. We encourage them to use email or regular mail when possible but if there is a need to come into the building we are looking at each situation individually to determine what their need is. We are accepting payments, civil filings that are not time sensitive. Magistrate Court - West Columbia and South Congaree Only defendants, officers, and court staff are allowed in the courtroom, and all defendants are seated a minimum of six feet apart. Masks and temperature screening is required. All cases in which the defendant does not appear are continued. West Columbia holds court each Thursday beginning at 10 a.m. South Congaree holds court on alternating Wednesdays beginning at 8:30 a.m.



Municipal Court - Limited

Batesburg-Leesville Municipal Court: Regular court is held on Tuesday, but is not beginning at 5 p.m. to allow for greater spacing of people. Temperature checks and mask are required. The is done by the BLPD upon entrance. Only a limited number of people allowed in the courtroom at the same time that includes 7 defendants/witnesses and 3 court personnel for a maximum number of 10 people. Additional defendants are called in as spaces become available. Greater distance separation from the defendants and the court staff. Plexiglas-type barriers have been installed in the area where court clerk processes payments during court. Cayce Municipal Court will start in person court hearings on Monday, October 1, 2020. The court will schedule 10 defendants at a time on a staggered 45 minute schedule. There will be 5 defendants socially distanced in the courtroom and 5 waiting in the lobby. Safety precautions will be in effect (taking temperatures, social distancing, and requiring face masks). If a defendant does not have a mask, one will be provided. If you have moved or need to update your address, please call 803-550-9550 and leave a message with your name, address, and phone number or email us at rstuckey@caycesc.gov. Fine payments can be made online at www.CayceCourtPmts.com, or by phone at (803) 234-6867. If mailing a money order or cashier’s check, Please send to: Cayce Municipal Court P.O. Box 3408, Cayce, SC 29171, or by dropping off exact change to the Cayce Municipal Complex drive-thru window located at 1800 12th St. Cayce, SC 29033, which is the building behind the Police Department. All forms and monies must be in an envelope that is addressed to CAYCE MUNICIPAL COURT. Please note, staff at the drive-thru window will not be able to answer any questions, they will just be able to take your paperwork. A receipt will be mailed to you after the payment is processed. The Town of Lexington Municipal Court - The Lexington Municipal Court is open to the public and holding court. The court is held on Tuesday and Wednesday from 9:00 a.m. - 4:00 p.m. Masks are required and temperatures are checked at the entrance of the courtroom. Only 1 - 3 persons are allowed in the court room at one time. Pine Ridge Municipal Court - In accordance with the South Carolina Chief Justice’s directive issued on Monday, March 16, 2020, all Pine Ridge Municipal Court sessions are cancelled until further notice. Payments can be made online at www.pineridgemunicipalcourtpayments.com or by calling (803) 234-6131. Payments in the form of cashier’s check or money order may be mailed to 2757 Fish Hatchery Road, West Columbia S.C. 29172. Notices will be mailed to your address listed on your traffic ticket or bond paperwork (if applicable). If your address has changed, please contact the Clerk of Court. For assistance with Municipal Court questions, please contact the Clerk of Court, Brittany Burns, at prclerkofcourt@sc.rr.com or by telephone at (803)755-2500. Springdale Municipal Court – The Town of Springdale Municipal Court will be reopening on a limited basis in the Month of June. Cases scheduled for June 2, 2020, June 9, 2020, and June 16, 2020 will be addressed as scheduled. A modified procedure will be utilized so as to minimize contact between persons and to ensure the safety of all parties. On your scheduled court date, there will be personnel and signage to instructing those having cases in the proper procedure. Parties may request a continuance, and the Court will take up those requests as they are made. Payments may be made online at www.springdalesc.com, mailed in, or dropped off in the drop-box at the front of Town Hall. Court dates for the Month of July 2020 and subsequent will be held as scheduled with procedures modified as necessary. For assistance with The Town of Springdale Municipal Court, please contact the Clerk of Court, Amanda Jones, at 803-794-0408 or ajones@springdalesc.com.



Marion
Last Updated - 08/18/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As normal; however, only one person at a time will be allowed into the clerk's office. Notes:



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Marion County Probate Court is open but limited in services. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payments can be made Monday-Friday 8:30am-5:00pm. Contact the Probate Court for emergency hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted Monday-Friday 8:30am-5:00pm. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Notes:



Bond Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Our bond hearings are being done only at 3:00 PM each day by videoconferencing. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: We are allowing only one person filing paperwork into our office at a time. Payments can still be made from the front window of our office but we encourage citizens to pay online at marionsc.org/trafficticket. Notes: Emergency hearings are still being heard but we are only allowing the defendant, the plaintiff, and one witness at a time into the courtroom.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Marion Municipal Court - Building is closed to the public. Public may contact the court by phone, intercom placed in the front vestibule, or by email. We are allowing only one person filing paperwork into our office at a time. Payments can still be made from the front window of our office but we encourage citizens to pay online at www.marionsc.gov Criminal court as normal, limited access to courtroom and building. No traffic Court until further notice All jury trials cancelled until further notice. Our bond hearings are being done only at 9:00 a.m. each day by videoconferencing. Mullins Municipal Court - Building is closed to the public. Public may contact the court by phone 843-464-5661. Payments can still be made at the front window of our office but we encourage citizens to pay online at www.mullinssc.us. No Court until further notice. All jury trials cancelled until further notice. Our bond hearings are being done only at 3:00 PM each day. Town of Nichols town hall and court has been closed to the public. Traffic Payments can be made online through Ncourt.com or by telephone at (877) 793-7965. Notes:



Marlboro
Last Updated - 01/25/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As normal. If the courthouse closes, there will be a drop box for filings and payments.

Fourth Circuit Family Court Order Suspending Arrests for Unexecuted Bench Warrants for Nonpayment of Child Support and Alimony



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via email, mail and drop off. Contact the Probate Court for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Unable to take marriage applications. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Notes:



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As normal. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As of now we currently remain open for regular work hours. We are still accepting payments and filings. Notes:



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bennettsville Municipal Court - Building is closed to the public. Court staff may be reached by phone with any questions at 843-479-1582. All non-emergency hearings are cancelled. Notifications for court rescheduling will be sent by mail. Court fines and fees may be paid over the phone at 843-479-1582 or by mail to PO Box 1253, Bennettsville, SC 29512. Bond Hearings will occur as usual. Notes:



McCormick
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The McCormick County Courthouse has reopened to the general public with some temporary changes in the interest of preventing the spread of COVID-19. The public is still strongly encouraged to do business with us online, through email or by phone when possible. All visitors must wear a face covering and have their temperature taken. Visit us online at www.mccormickcountysc.org and review department updates at the Government dropdown menu for additional information. We will be in the office to assist the public by phone and/or email requests. We will receive the mail, courier and any filing of legal documents that are required for filing at the door. . Abstractors will be allowed in the Records Room by appointment only and limited to two people at a time Monday through Friday from10am to 4pm. Child Support payments can be made online at www.expertpay.com. Cashier’s check or money order can be mailed to SDU P O Box 100304 Columbia SC 29202. You can also pay through MoneyGram at CVS or Walmart. The public is encouraged not to visit the Clerk of Courts and Register of Deeds Offices unless absolutely necessary. General questions may be answered by email and/or phone or fax. To make an appointment please see contact information. Website: www.mccormickcountysc.org Phone: 864-852-2195 Fax: 864-852-0071 Email: gchiles@mccormickcountysc.org As normal. If the courthouse closes, there will be staff present M-W-F from 10am-1pm for filings and payments. Eleventh Circuit Family Court Administrative Memorandum



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Notes: McCormick County Probate Court staff is available by appointment only. The McCormick Courthouse is closed to the public, effective January 14, 2021. A facial mask is required for entering the McCormick County Courthouse per McCormick County Administrator’s directive. Temperatures will be taken of all persons entering the building. *Cell phones are not allowed in the courthouse by general public-contact McCormick County Clerk of Court, Gwendolyn D. Chiles, 864-852-2195 for exceptions (abstractors, etc.) **If the death certificate reflects COVID as cause, appointments are scheduled for 30 days after the funeral.



Bond Court - Limited

Bond hearings will be conducted once per day.



Magistrate Court - Normal

McCormick County Magistrate Court is open to the public Monday-Friday 8:00AM to 12:00PM. Office will be available by phone and email until 4:00PM.



Municipal Court

No Details Provided



Newberry
Last Updated - 10/23/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity)

No Details Provided



Probate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Newberry County Courthouse Annex is open to the public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via mail and drop off. Contact the Probate Court for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted by mail, email and drop off. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Normal

In light of the current coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic situation, Newberry County will hold bond hearings once a day. The bond hearing will be held at 11 a.m. on weekdays and 11 a.m. on weekend days. The bonding judge will arrive at the Detention Center at 10 am on Saturday and 10 am on Sunday to sign any warrants and to address any court filings. This will go into effect on April 7th, 2020.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Newberry Central Court is open for receiving filings and payments. Court hours are Monday thru Friday 8:30 a.m. to 5 p.m. Notes: Newberry County Magistrate Court requires everyone entering the courthouse to wear a mask or other facial covering and to have their temperature taken. Persons coming into the courthouse must stand at least six feet apart from one another.



Municipal Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Newberry Municipal Court is open for receiving filings and payments. Court hours are Monday thru Friday 8:30 a.m. to 5 p.m. Notes: Persons coming into the Municipal Court Building must stand at least six feet apart from one another.



Oconee
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Oconee County Courthouse is open. Filings and payments are accepted Monday through Friday, 8:30am – 5:00pm. Pursuant to the most recent Order of the Chief Justice in person hearings are now being scheduled. Although in person hearings have resumed, both Circuit Court and Family Court will continue to utilize the SCJD Virtual Courtroom when possible. In accordance with the Order of the Chief Justice masks are required and temperatures are taken of all persons entering the courthouse.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Oconee County Probate office is open to the public from 8:30 a.m. – 5 p.m. Contact via phone, email, mail, fax or in person. Filings/payment can be made via email, mail, drop box or in person. Contact the Probate Court for in person emergency and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted by mail, drop box or in person. Marriage ceremonies by request. Non-emergency in person hearings by request.



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As normal.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Oconee County Magistrate Courts will resume full normal schedule with precautions as of March 15, 2021.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Due to increase COVID-19 cases within some city departments, effective immediately, no person(s) other than court staff will be allowed to enter the clerk of court or judge's offices until further notice. The only exceptions will be for the city administration and any emergency deemed appropriate by the court. Furthermore, all court cases will be cancelled until the week of September 14, 2020. Any warrant applications will be by appointment only and the issuance of any warrants and or warrant applications will be conducted inside the courtroom and social distancing and mask will be required. The court will continue temperature checks and the requirement of masks until further notice. Walhalla Municipal Courts - Our offices are open but closed to the public. Individuals may call the court and after proper screening, may be allowed to enter for payments, filings, etc. No court hearings currently with the exception of any emergency hearing. Bond hearings are being conducted as normal for Seneca and Walhalla.



Orangeburg
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Closed

The Orangeburg County Courthouse will be closed from December 9, 2020 until December 14, 2020 due to COVID-19 exposure. Hearings will be held via WebEx on Thursday, December 10, 2020.



Probate Court - Limited

Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via email and mail. Teleconferencing is available for emergency hearings and commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted by mail or online. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Limited

Bond Court will be conducted at 9:30 AM and 2:30 PM Monday thru Friday, and 9:00 AM and 1:00 PM on weekends and Holidays.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Operation is normal at ALL Magistrate Courts and opened during regular hours (8:30 – 5:00). Hearings are being held as follows: 1) Via video conferencing, or In-court; but with all safety protocols in place per SC Supreme Court Order, including face masks, temperature checks, safe distancing, & limiting the number of people in the courtroom at a time. Traffic Court, Criminal Trials and Jury Trials will resume as normal, with Jury Trials beginning on May 5, 2021. Civil Filings are being accepted. Scheduled Time Payments (STP) will also be accepted. Magistrate Court will be conducting Screenings for Public Defenders at this time. Please dial 803-533-5879 for further assistance Individuals that want to file cases may still do so at the Eastern Region Magistrate Court located at 8324 Old State Road, Holly Hill, SC 29059, or call the office at 803-496-9533. All parties that have cases scheduled on these days will be notified by mail (and telephone) of the new court dates. Traffic Hearings, Criminal Hearings, and jury trials are suspended until further notice. Bond Hearings, Probable Cause Hearings, and Emergency Hearings (Harassment, Stalking and Protection) will still be conducted. Civil Filings -- except for Landlord Tenant and Summary Ejectments -- will still be accepted. Scheduled Time Payments (STP) will also be accepted. Magistrate Court will be conducting Screenings for Public Defenders at this time. Please dial 803-533-5879 for further assistance.



Municipal Court - Limited

Elloree Municipal Courts: Eutawville Municipal Court Post Office Box 372 Eutawville, SC 29048 Eutawville Municipal Court: Payments can be made online or over the phone by going to www.eutawvillescpay.com or calling 833-881-3234: Traffic North Municipal Court: Has resumed normal operation.



Pickens
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments Pickens County Circuit Court (Civil and Criminal) and Family Court are operating at normal status. Special Referee Foreclosure Sales are normal. The sales take place on the outside steps of the Courthouse.



Probate Court - Normal

Normal operations.



Bond Court - Normal

Bond hearings are held twice daily.



Magistrate Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond Court - Normal/ Bond hearings are held twice daily. Magistrate Court - Normal/ Acceptance of Filings and Payments in office, by mail and payments online. The Magistrate Court is observing all CDC recommendations and complying with the Chief Justices’ memos. Notes: Should our office limit entry, we will post signage outside the building, post information to our county’s website and face book account, as well as run any information on our local television station and advise over the telephone personally or by voicemail.



Municipal Court - Limited

The Clemson University Municipal Court is open for all court business from 10:00 a.m. to 4:30 p.m. Monday through Friday. Please mail your payments directly to us. The City of Clemson is fully staffed everyday and will start holding hearings and bench trials beginning March 19, 2021. Bond hearings are conducted twice a day. Jury trials will be scheduled in the near future. All safety protocol is in place. Starting March 17, 2021, all criminal and traffic in-court appearances the City of Easley Municipal Court will resume using social distancing to include temperature checks and mandatory masks. The Court will follow all DCD guidelines. We will resume a regular schedule of preliminary hearings on April 16, 2021. We will resume jury trials beginning April 12 nd will be holding trials during that week. Our court safety plan has been approved by SC Court Administration and we will follow all required CDC guidelines. Bond hearings are held twice daily, 9 a.m. and 4 p.m. The Court is open to citizens for payments and transact other business a required from 8 a.m. until 5 p.m. weekdays. Payments of fines can also be paid on line at https://www.municipalonlinepayments.com/easleysc/court/search. Central Municipal Court – Normal Office Hours: Monday – Friday, 8:30 am – 5:00 pm. Questions regarding ticket, arrest warrant or court date, call Tina Galbreath (864) 639-6381 ext. 121 or email tgalbreath@cityofcentral.org. Fines can be paid by one of the following options: In-Person at Central Municipal Court, 1067 West Main St, Central, SC; By mail to Central Municipal Court, PO Box 549, Central, SC 29630, Money Order or Cashier's Check payable to Central Municipal Court, By Drop Box located at Central Town Hall, 1067 West Main St, Central, SC 29630, Money Order or Cashier's Check payable to Central Municipal Court or website: http://www.sc.gov. Please write your ticket number/case number on the Money Order or Cashier's Check. Do not mail cash or place cash in the drop-box. Should our office limit entry, information will be posted outside the building and on the town website.



Richland
Last Updated - 03/18/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

The Richland County Courthouse is still closed to the Public due to Covid. Staff members will be available to process filings and payments, answer phone calls and respond to general requests. Acceptance of Filings and Payments (money orders and cashier’s checks only – payable to Clerk of Court) will be accepted via mail or drop box in the lobby of the courthouse. Numbers to call for assistance – Civil Records 803.576.1952, Criminal Records 803.576.1939 and Family Court 803.576.3326 or 803.576.3338.If you need assistance with Civil Court or Common Pleas, please contact Marci Spires at 803.576.1940 spires.marci@richlandcountysc.gov. For Criminal Records, please contact Teresa Cribb at 803.576.1936 or cribb.teresa@richlandcountysc.gov. For non-jury and motion scheduling, please contact Athena Borer at borer.athena@richlandcountysc.gov and for jury trial scheduling information please contact Paul Gunter at gunter.paul@richlandcountysc.gov. For judgment information, please contact Alix Smith at smith.alix@richlandcountysc.gov.. If you need assistance with Family Court, please contact Janet Irvine at 803.576.3326 or Irvine.janet@richlandcountysc.gov. The Richland County Register of Deeds is doing appointments for research by surveyors, abstractors and legal professional. Physical recordings are accepted thru a drop box located in the lobby of the courthouse. If you need assistance with Family Court, please contact Janet Irvine at 803.576.3326 or Irvine.janet@richlandcountysc.gov. If you need assistance with Civil Court or Common Pleas, please contact Marci Spires at 803.576.1940 spires.marci@richlandcountysc.gov. For Criminal Records, please contact Teresa Cribb at 803.576.1936 or cribb.teresa@richlandcountysc.gov. For non-jury and motion scheduling, please contact Athena Borer at borer.athena@richlandcountysc.gov and for jury trial scheduling information please contact Paul Gunter at gunter.paul@richlandcountysc.gov. For judgment information, please contact Alix Smith at smith.alix@richlandcountysc.gov. Acceptance of Filings and Payments (money orders and cashier’s checks only – payable to Clerk of Court) will be accepted via mail or drop box in the lobby of the courthouse. There will be limited administrative staff in Civil, Criminal, and Family Courts M-F 10:00 a.m. - 1:00 p.m. Numbers to call for assistance – Civil Records 803.576.1947, Criminal Records 803.576.1939 and Family Court 803.576.3326 or 803.576.3341. Limited staff members will be available to process filings and payments, answer phone calls and respond to general requests. The Richland County Register of Deeds is doing appointments for research by surveyors, abstractors and legal professional. Physical recordings are accepted thru a drop box located in the lobby of the courthouse.



Probate Court - Limited

The Courthouse remains closed to the public with the exception of scheduled court appearances and appointments. Please email to schedule an appointment with staff as needed. Acceptance of filings and payments: Filings/payment can be dropped off at the front door of the courthouse or by mail (send to Richland County Probate Court, PO Box 192, Columbia SC 29202). Hearings are held in person or via video conferencing. Marriage license applications are processed online at www.richlandcountysc.gov/probate. Please use our website for our emails and phone numbers. Please use our website for our emails and phone numbers: http://www.richlandcountysc.gov/Government/Courts-and-Judicial-System/Probate-Court



Bond Court - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Richland County twenty-four hour Bond Court located at 201 John Mark Dial Road, Columbia, SC 29209 will proceed with bond hearings as normally scheduled and a judge is available 24 hours a day to satisfy the on-call requirement.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Due to inclement weather conditions, the Richland County Magistrate Court offices will close at 3:00 pm on Thursday, March 18, 2021. The Bond Court will operate on a normal schedule until further notice. The Central Magistrate Court, located at 2500 Decker Boulevard, Columbia SC 29206 is available for restraining order filings and scheduled restraining order hearings. Citations also can be paid online at www.rcgov.us/payticket to any Richland County Magistrate Office. The citizens must have ticket number in order to pay online. They are to call (803) 576-2300 regarding the Decker Center cases. The District Offices have a law clerk to answer calls for any question the citizens may have from 8:30 – 5:00 PM. In the District Courts, if citizens wish to file any civil matters, a clerk is available to accept the filings or the filings can be mailed with a check or money order made payable to the Magistrate District Court. Citizens can visit sccourts.org or the Richland County Magistrate website for filing forms. Telephone calls will be returned with a 24-hour period in all Courts. Notes: Additionally, If you would like to file an eviction or request the status of a pending eviction, the Court will accept applications for ejectment, schedule hearings, issue writs or warrants of ejectment, and proceed in any other manner necessary regarding evictions. Domestic Violence cases have commence via video conferencing at the Decker Center.



Municipal Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Columbia Municipal Court is closed until further notice due to the outbreak of the COVID-19 Pandemic. All Criminal, Traffic, Quality of Life, Domestic Violence, Homeless Court, Jury Trials, Roster Meetings and Preliminary Hearing Court Session are postponed. All parties will be notified of new court dates via US mail. Bond Court and emergency hearings will be conducted once a day starting at 9:00 am at Alvin S. Glen Detention Center. Fine payments can be made online at http://www6.rcgov.us/SCJDWeb/OnlinePayments/disclaimer.aspx The City of Forest Acres Municipal Court is open on a limited basis until further notice due to the COVID-19 Pandemic. All court sessions have been rescheduled for the month of June and summons have been mailed to all parties via US Mail. Parties will be notified by US Mail if those court dates are further rescheduled. Bond hearings are being handled at the Alvin S. Glen Detention Center according to the Richland County Magistrate’s Court Bond hearing schedule. The office is open at 5205 North Trenholm Road for filings, fine payments, or questions. Online payments are also accepted at https://ssl.sc.gov/checkout/ForestAcres/courtPayments.html. You may also call 803-790-5947 with any questions.



Saluda
Last Updated - 04/06/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Courthouse is Open 8:30 a.m. – 5 p.m. Masks required. Clerk of Court's Office Abstractors need appointments, must wear masks. All others matters can be handled at the window Eleventh Circuit Family Court Administrative Memorandum Notes: Receiving USPS, UPS and FedEx services Mon-Fri 864-445-4500 main number Real Estate – Ext #2216 or email: p.horne@saludacounty.sc.gov Circuit Court – Ext #2217 r.crouch@saludacounty.sc.gov Family Court – Ext #2218 j.yonce@saludacounty.sc.gov Clerk of Court – Ext. #2215 s.coleman@saludacounty.sc.gov



Probate Court - Limited

The Saluda Probate Court is open to the public. Scheduled appointment will help us better serve the public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via phone, email and mail. Marriage license applications may be submitted by mail. All non-emergency hearings are continued.



Bond Court - Limited

The Saluda Bond Court hearings are limited once a day by webcast at 8:30 a.m.



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: SALUDA MAGISTRATE COURT IS OPEN TO THE PUBLIC 8:30 A.M. -- 4:30 P.M. IN PERSON HEARINGS LIMITED NUMBERS, SOCIAL DISTANCING AND MASK REQUIRED. Notes:



Municipal Court - Limited

The Saluda Municipal Court will hold Bond hearings remotely 1t 1:00 p.m. each day until further notice. The municipal court is open to the public. Attendance limited at court hearings. Bond court held at 10:30 a.m. via webcast.



Spartanburg
Last Updated - 04/14/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The building is open to the public but proper use of face masks and temperature checks are required to enter the building. A drop-box is provided for the purpose of filings for all departments located in the building; payments to the Clerk of Court’s Office will need to be made inside at our payments office. Please refer to other departments for details on payments for that area. Child support payments need to be paid to the South Carolina State Disbursement Unit, more details can be found under the Child Support tab on our website: https://www.spartanburgcounty.org/174/Clerk-of-Court Family Court: running normally except for rules to show cause hearings in child support enforcement. If you are affected by the changes to our child support rules to show cause, you will receive notice in the mail on the changes with this process. Any Family Court hearing that can be held by WebEx, will be held by WebEx. Circuit Court: running normally except for jury trials, and first and second appearances for general session charges. Any Circuit Court hearing that can be held by WebEx, will be held by WebEx.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Probate Court continues to handle appointments by mail, phone, and email and are having original Wills dropped off in our front office. I am conducting emergency hearings in-person if they can not be done virtually. Judge Anderson continues to handle commitment hearings and adult Guardianship/Conservatorship hearings through teleconferencing and virtually. We are continuing to handle marriage applications through the mail.



Bond Court - Normal

As normal. Spartanburg County has a separate office and courtroom at the Spartanburg County Detention Center.



Magistrate Court - Limited

The Reidville office of the Spartanburg Magistrate Court has been temporarily closed due to illness. If you need assistance, please contact the Spartanburg County Magistrate Court at 864-596-2564. This office is at the Spartanburg County Courthouse, 180 Magnolia Street, Spartanburg, SC 29306. You may also want to contact the Magistrate Court office located in Woodruff at 110 N. Main Street, Woodruff, SC. 864-476-2281. For purposes of magistrate court, access to the Spartanburg County Courthouse is currently limited to individuals that are present to file documents, present to make a payment, litigants in a scheduled case, or witnesses in a scheduled case. All parties with a pending case are responsible for making sure that the court has their accurate mailing address. All parties with a pending case should review their address on any ticket, warrant, or civil filing, to verify that the address is correct. Parties should contact the appropriate court immediately to update mailing addresses. Anyone wishing to make a payment may mail the payment to the respective court or make a payment online at https://publicindex.sccourts.org/spartanburg/onlinepayments/. The mailing address for the Spartanburg Central Magistrate Court is Magistrate Court, 180 Magnolia Street, Spartanburg, SC 29306. The mailing address for each district court may be found at https://www.spartanburgcounty.org/594/Offices. Before visiting the Spartanburg County Central Magistrate Court at the main courthouse, we recommend that you call 864-596-2564 so that we may advise you on any COVID related changes in the schedule. Before visiting any of the district magistrate courts, we recommend that you call the respective district court so that they may advise you of any COVID related changes in the schedule. The telephone numbers for the district offices are available at https://www.spartanburgcounty.org/594/Offices. Notes: The district Magistrate Court in Woodruff will be closed until further notice, due to a positive COVID-19 test. A notice will be placed on the door and the website.



Municipal Court - Limited

The Town of Cowpens cannot conduct jury trails because of the inadequate spacing needed for social distancing. City of Spartanburg Municipal Court - remains open to perform daily operations. Criminal court is being held on a case-by-case to address bond issues and other emergency matters. Members of the public are being asked to call or refer to the website prior to coming to the court office to determine if their issues can be resolved without their appearance. Our website has been updated to reflect changes due to the Covid 19 pandemic.



Sumter
Last Updated - 03/22/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Normal

Normal operations.



Probate Court - Normal

Sumter County Probate Court is open to the public and operating normally. No more than two individuals may attend an appointment. They must wear a mask, go through security and have their temperature checked. Hearings are operating normally with 10 or less people present in the courtroom. If there is more than ten people that need to attend the hearing, the hearing is being held virtually. Marriage Licenses are being issued during normal business hours.



Bond Court - Normal

Due to inclement weather, Sumter County non essential court offices will close at 1:00 pm Thursday, March 18, 2021. However, Bond Court will be held at 1:00 pm on Thursday, March 18, 2021. Regarding the posting of bail bonds, all bondsmen should contact the court in advance regarding releases for processing. If a bondsman has any filings regarding a bond, such filing will be accepted by the Presiding Judge at Bond Court.



Magistrate Court - Normal

The Sumter Summary Court is open to the general public. Sumter County Magistrate Court and Sumter Municipal Court have returned to normal operations as allowed by the Order of the Chief Justice dated March 4, 2021. Criminal bench trials and other hearings will be held subject to required social distancing guidelines.



Municipal Court - Limited

Mayesville Municipal Court: The court will adjust operations as warranted to address public needs due to the evolving public health conditions. This may include but not limited to: 1. Stagger individuals appearances and make other reasonable efforts to minimize the number of people gathered in court at one time; and 2. Remotely conducting proceedings, and adjusting the venue or frequency of hearings.



Union
Last Updated - 01/14/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: As of January 11th 2021, the Union County Courthouse is now limited to the public going by appointment only until further notice for the safety of the public and staff due to increasing cases of COVID-19. Please make an appointment, mail in payments or drop in the night deposit box. Offices can assist you by phone, fax, email or front door drop off. Office Numbers Auditor- 429-1618 Clerk of Court- 429-1630 Delinquent Tax- 429-1617 Family Court- 429-1632 Magistrate- 429-1648 Probate- 429-1625 Sheriff’s Office- 429-1612 Solicitor’s Office- 429-1639 Supervisor’s Office- 429-1600 Treasurer’s Office- 429-1606 Victim’s Advocate- 429-1673 The Union County Clerk of Court office will be operating by appointment only. The general public will be assisted by phone, fax or email. Please call (864)429-630 for assistance with General Session, Common Pleas and Deeds/Mortgages. Please call (864)429-1632 for assistance with Family Court/Child Support. Union County Clerk of Court office is open to the public; however due to the size of the record room no more than three (3) people are allowed so that social distancing is maintained.



Probate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Union County Probate office has limited staff due to possible COVID-19 exposure. The office will remain open. Building closed to public. Contact via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings/payment can be made via drop box. Video conferencing available for emergency hearings. Contact Probate Court for commitment hearings. Marriage license applications may be submitted by appointment only. All non-emergency hearings are continued. Notes:



Bond Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Bond court will be held once per day at 5 p.m. Notes:



Magistrate Court - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: The Union County Magistrates Court office will have limited access (appointment only) to the courthouse due to COVID-19 exposure. The office will be limited from January 11, 2021 to January 25, 2021. Part time judges will be available to conduct bond hearings and other emergency services. Filings and payments should be done via mail or online if at all possible. If unable to complete transaction via phone or internet, there is limited access at the court. Notes:



Municipal Court - Closed

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: City of Union Municipal Court is closed. Bond Hearings once daily 7:00 p.m. Notes:



Williamsburg
Last Updated - 02/02/2021

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

Acceptance of Filings and Payments: At drop box outside only. Notes: Williamsburg County is open from 8:30 am.-5:00 p.m. daily, limited in-person access to the Clerk of Court’s office; service provided via appointments, e-mails, outside drop-box, FAX and telephone. Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions and Common Pleas - Acceptance of filings and payments: drop box at the Court House - WebEx hearings for all courts are in effect; limited in-person hearings at the discretion of the judges. Common Pleas and General Sessions Non-Jury hearings are held via WebEx unless the judge determines that an in-person needs to be arranged with a limited appearance by the parties involved. Family Court hearings are held via WebEx with the exception of emergency hearings or any other in-person hearings as deemed necessary by the judge. Masks and temperature checks are a requirement to enter the building.



Probate Court - Limited

The Williamsburg Probate Court is partially open for business 8:30 am – 5:00 pm (Monday, Tuesday, Thursday, & Friday) with limited in-person access by appointments only. The office is closed on Wednesdays for Professional Staff Development. Services are provided via Email, Drop-box, mail, fax, telephone conferencing and Zoom. The office has limited/rotation of staff. Marriage License applications may be submitted via email, mail and appointment by Zoom (call for details). All non-emergency hearings are continued until further notice. Hearings may be set via Zoom if all parties agree. Contact Probate Court (843)355-9321 Ext. 6200.



Bond Court - Limited

Effective October 21, 2020 Williamsburg County Bond Court will be held twice per day at 9:00 am and 3:00 pm.



Magistrate Court - Normal

The Kingstree Magistrate Office is open for in-person proceedings follow COVID-19 Guidelines. Transactions may also be handled via drop box, mail-in requests, phone and internet.



Municipal Court - Limited

Hemingway Municipal Court, Kingstree Municipal Court, Lane Municipal Court, and Greeleyville Municipal Court: The Municipal Courts of Williamsburg County are open Monday – Friday 9:00am – 5:00pm for the acceptance of traffic fines, and other payments using a drop box. No Municipal Court cases are scheduled at this time, and will not be scheduled until further notice from South Carolina Court Administration. Bond Court is conducted twice per day (7 days per week) at 9:00am at the Williamsburg County Detention Center, and is coordinated through the Williamsburg County Magistrate Office.



York
Last Updated - 12/04/2020

Family Court and Circuit Court (General Sessions, Common Pleas and Masters in Equity) - Limited

By appointment only by contacting clerk's office.



Probate Court - Limited

Probate Court is open to the public by appointment only for in-person estate and guardianship/conservatorship appointments, marriage license applications, and access to digitized and microfilmed records. Pursuant to the Chief Justice’s Order, masks must be worn by everyone entering the Historic Courthouse, which has remained open. The Court is also in contact with the public by phone, email, mail, fax and drop box. As before, the public must contact the local mental health center directly for emergency and judicial commitments, and the substance abuse treatment center directly for judicial commitments. The Probate Judge and Associate Judges are conducting trials and hearings in-person with proper distancing and masks, and also via Zoom.



Bond Court - Normal

Bond Court is accessible by phone and email during each 12 hour shift. Daytime office hours are 8 a.m. to 1 p.m. Bond hearings are held at 9 a.m., and bond can be paid/posted from 10 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. Evening shift office hours are from 7 p.m. to midnight. Bond hearings are held at 9 p.m. and bond can be paid/posted 9 p.m. to 12:30 a.m.



Magistrate Court - Limited

The Bethel-Kings Mountain Township Magistrate Court in Clover will be open from 9:00 a.m. to 2:00 p.m. September 21st through September 25th. We will resume normal business hours on September 28th. During times the Clover office is closed, civil filings will be accepted at the York Magistrate’s Office located at 1675 York Highway in York and at the Hickory Grove Magistrate’s Office located at 5800 Wylie Avenue in Hickory Grove. Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Beginning Tuesday, May 26th, all townships will resume regular business operating hours with staff on hand to assist. However, persons should continue to utilize the payment and filing methods listed below when possible. As of March 17, 2020, in light of the Coronavirus (COVID-19) pandemic & the resulting concern for the health & safety of the public & court employees, public access to the Fort Mill Magistrate’s Office is restricted. Court staff will be in the building and able to assist you via email or phone from 9:00 AM - 5:00 PM, Monday - Friday. We are watching the entrance and parking lot through video cameras, but if you are standing here reading this sign we may not know you are at the office UNLESS YOU CALL (803)547-5572 and press 7. Forms are available here: https://www.sccourts.org/forms/ You can message the court staff or file with the court using this email address: fortmillfilings@yorkcountygov.com or fax filings to (803) 547-6344. You can mail filings or deliver filings through a commercial courier service to: 120 East Elliott Street, Fort Mill, SC 29715 or You can come to the office to file using the drop box at our entrance from 9:00 AM – 5:00 PM, Monday - Friday. Call us when you arrive so that we can receipt any payments. Do NOT leave cash in the bin unless you have spoken with us. You can leave us a message at (803) 547-5572 and we will return your call, but the best way to reach us is at: fortmillfilings@yorkcountygov.com Please include your name, case number, & contact info (phone number, email address, etc.) in any correspondence. It is your responsibility to update your contact info if it has changed. If you need to pay a fine, you can mail a money order or cashier’s check to us. You can also pay with a credit/debit card online at: https://sc.gov/court-payments No adverse action will be taken on your criminal or traffic case by the Court during the pandemic. Time periods to file continue to apply to Answers to lawsuits and Hearing Requests for evictions. Civil cases are being conducted via Zoom. You do not have pay a fee or have a Zoom account to participate in a Zoom hearing. A phone or internet connection is required to participate in a Zoom hearing. Broad River Bullock Creek and Catawba Magistrate receive paperwork at the windows and we have court in the courtroom with limited capacity in our new building. We have much more space to socially distance everyone now. We still only allow 10 people in the courtroom at a time. Some litigants will be asked to provide their phone number to court staff, wait in their cars, and come in when their cases are called if the docket is heavy. Notes: Emergency hearings (e.g., applications for a restraining order) will be held as normal.



Municipal Court - Limited

Fort Mill Municipal Court facility has no power and the phones are down. Customers can leave a message by dialing 803-547-5572 and press 7 for a voice greeting. Customers can also reach the office by emailing Fortmillfilings@yorkcountygov.com Beginning Tuesday, May 26th, all townships will resume regular business operating hours with staff on hand to assist. However, persons should continue to utilize the payment and filing methods listed below when possible. Acceptance of Filings and Payments: Rock Hill Municipal Court- Rock Hill Law Center building closed to public. Contact court via phone, email, mail and fax. Filings can be made via fax, mail, and by appointment. Payments can be made by mail, online at www.municipalonlinepayments.com/rockhillsc or by phone. Video conferencing is used for bond hearings, plea hearings and commitment hearings. All bench court, jury trials and other court hearings have been canceled through April 30. All parties will be notified by mail of their rescheduled court date. York Municipal Court - open as normal for filings, payments, and bond hearings until further notice. Bench and Jury trials scheduled for March 16-31 have been cancelled. Parties will be notified via mail of their rescheduled trial date. For additional information please go to yorksc.gov.