Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Department
Court News ...

South Carolina Supreme Court Pro Bono Honor Roll
(Date posted: 12/17/2018)

Beginning in February 2019, the South Carolina Supreme Court will publish an annual Pro Bono Honor Roll recognizing South Carolina attorneys who volunteer 50 hours or more of legal service in a manner set forth in Rule 6.1. Those who wish to be included on the Honor Roll will have the opportunity to report their pro bono hours for 2019 on their 2020 License Fee Statement. Reporting of pro bono hours is otherwise not required.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Marlboro County on January 15, 2019
(Date posted: 12/13/2018)

Effective January 15, 2019, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Marlboro County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, Lancaster, Dorchester, Orangeburg, Calhoun, Berkeley, Florence, Marion, and Chesterfield Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Inclement Weather
(Date posted: 12/09/2018)

Because weather conditions may vary throughout the state, all state judicial officers and employees should follow the decisions made by county government officials regarding office delays or closings.

Inclement Weather
(Date posted: 12/06/2018)

The National Weather Service is predicting ice and snow in parts of South Carolina starting this weekend and possibly lasting into early next week. This could result in the closure or delayed opening of state and local government offices.

Update on Limited Technical Failure of the E-Filing System
(Date posted: 12/04/2018)

Because SC.Gov is experiencing a payment processing outage, the South Carolina Judicial Department has announced a limited Technical Failure of the E-Filing System for December 4, 2018, in accordance with Section 9(b) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. 

E-Filing Announcement—SCJD Network Maintenance Schedule Change
(Date posted: 11/28/2018)

SCJD Network Maintenance will be performed on Tuesday December 4, 2018, beginning at 7 p.m., rather than the regularly scheduled 10 p.m. start. During the maintenance period, the E-Filing System will not be available for attorney filings. It is expected that the maintenance will be complete by 2 a.m.

Closing of the Probate Courts on November 29 and November 30, 2018
(Date posted: 11/26/2018)

On Thursday, November 29, 2018, and Friday, November 30, 2018, the Probate Courts are authorized to close for educational training on the administrative duties and responsibilities under Act No. 87 of 2017, per order of Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty.

Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(Date posted: 11/14/2018)

The Supreme Court has amended Rule 401 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules, which governs student practice in South Carolina.

South Carolina Chief Justice Declares November 19 Adoption Day
(Date posted: 11/13/2018)

Supreme Court of South Carolina Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty has authorized four judges to preside over Adoption Day proceedings on Monday, November 19, 2018.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Chesterfield County on December 4, 2018
(Date posted: 11/08/2018)

Effective December 4, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Chesterfield County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, Lancaster, Dorchester, Orangeburg, Calhoun, Berkeley, Florence, and Marion Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Limited Technical Failure of the E-Filing System—Marion County
(Date posted: 10/30/2018)

The South Carolina Judicial Department has announced a limited Technical Failure of the E-Filing System for October 30, 2018, for Marion County in accordance with Section 9(b) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. This limited Technical Failure only affects filings in Marion County, and only affects filings that require payment. All E-Filings in all other E-Filing Counties remain online and available.

Repository for Circuit, Family, Probate, Magistrate and Municipal Court Orders
(Date posted: 10/30/2018)

Repository for Circuit, Family, Probate, Magistrate and Municipal Court Orders

Posted Results of the July 2018 Bar Examination
(Date posted: 10/26/2018)

The results of the July 2018 Uniform Bar Examination were posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 26, 2018.

Results of the July 2018 Uniform Bar Examination
(Date posted: 10/24/2018)

The results of the July 2018 Uniform Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 26, 2018.

South Carolina Supreme Court Historical Society Honors the Legacy of Chief Justice Julius B. “Bubba” Ness
(Date posted: 10/24/2018)

The Supreme Court of South Carolina hosted a ceremony today honoring the memory and legacy of Chief Justice Julius B. “Bubba” Ness. Keynote remarks were delivered by Justice Kaye Gorenflo Hearn, who formerly served as a law clerk to Justice Ness. During the ceremony, a book of memories and stories about the late Chief Justice Ness was presented by his family to the Supreme Court.

Order Regarding Tropical Storm Michael and the Computation of Time
(Date posted: 10/12/2018)

Accordingly, this Court finds it appropriate to declare Thursday, October 11, 2018, to be a statewide "holiday" for the purpose of computing time under Rule 263 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules; Rule 6 of the South Carolina Rules of Civil Procedure; Rule 35 of the South Carolina Rules of Criminal Procedure; and Rule 3 of the South Carolina Rules of Magistrates Court.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Marion County on October 30, 2018
(Date posted: 10/12/2018)

Effective October 30, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Marion County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, Lancaster, Dorchester, Orangeburg, Calhoun, Berkeley, and Florence Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

SCJD Closure Update
(Date posted: 10/11/2018)

The Supreme Court Building and the Calhoun Building will open on Friday, October 12, 2018, at 8:30 a.m.

Inclement Weather
(Date posted: 10/10/2018)

South Carolina Governor Henry McMaster has declared a “state of emergency” and the National Hurricane Center is forecasting South Carolina may experience severe weather tomorrow as a result of Hurricane Michael.

SCJD Closure Update
(Date posted: 10/10/2018)

Based on the decision of Richland County to close government offices on Thursday, Oct. 11, 2018, the Supreme Court Building and the Calhoun Building, including the Court of Appeals, will be closed as well.

Orders Increasing Appellate Filing Fees and Motion Fees
(Date posted: 10/09/2018)

The Supreme Court has issued orders increasing filing fees and motion fees for matters filed in the Supreme Court and the Court of Appeals. The increased fees apply to a notice of appeal, petition for a writ of certiorari, or motion filed on or after October 15, 2018.

Comments to Proposed Rules Concerning Limited Scope Representation
(Date posted: 10/02/2018)

On August 29, 2018, the Supreme Court requested written comments concerning possible amendments to various rules of court concerning the implementation of limited scope representation in civil and family court matters. The comments have been published and are available for review. 

Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(Date posted: 09/26/2018)

The Court has amended Rule 408, SCACR, to alter how attorney members of the Commission on Continuing Legal Education and Specialization are nominated.

Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(Date posted: 09/26/2018)

The Supreme Court has amended Rule 607, SCACR, to increase the fees Judicial Department Court Reporters shall receive for transcription and other services. The increased fees apply to requests for transcription or other services made on or after October 15, 2018.

Myrtle Beach Homeless Court
(Date posted: 09/25/2018)

Myrtle Beach. A Homeless Court Program

Electronic Filing Notice
(Date posted: 09/24/2018)

The South Carolina Judicial Department has announced a Technical Failure of the E-Filing System for September 24, 2018.

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
(Date posted: 09/21/2018)

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program

Order Regarding Hurricane Florence and the Computation of Time
(Date posted: 09/17/2018)

Order Regarding Hurricane Florence and the Computation of Time

Hurricane Florence Updates
(Date posted: 09/16/2018)

Hurricane Florence Updates

Oral Arguments Before the Supreme Court on September 18, 2018, Have Been Cancelled
(Date posted: 09/13/2018)

Oral Arguments Before the Supreme Court on September 18, 2018, Have Been Cancelled

Swearing-In Ceremony Cancelled Due to Hurricane Florence
(Date posted: 09/13/2018)

Due to Hurricane Florence, the swearing-in ceremony scheduled for Monday, September 17, 2018, has been cancelled.

Hurricane Florence Updates
(Date posted: 09/11/2018)

Hurricane Florence Updates (9-11-18)

Effect of Hurricane Florence on the Computation of Time for Appellate Court Filings
(Date posted: 09/11/2018)

See Order of the Chief Justice dated September 10, 2018. Consistent with prior practice, the days that these appellate courts are closed will be treated as a "holiday" when computing time under Rule 263(a) of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules.

Hurricane Florence Court Cancellations
(Date posted: 09/10/2018)

IT IS ORDERED that proceedings in the Supreme Court, Court of Appeals, Circuit Court, and Family Court are cancelled beginning Tuesday, September 11, 2018, in the counties where the Governor has closed state government offices pursuant to the state of emergency.

Inclement Weather
(Date posted: 09/10/2018)

South Carolina Governor Henry McMaster has declared a "state of emergency" and the National Weather Service is forecasting South Carolina may experience severe weather this week as a result of Hurricane Florence. This could result in the closure or delayed opening of state and local government offices.

No Published Opinions or Advance Sheets posted this week
(Date posted: 09/10/2018)

There will not be any Published Opinions or Advance Sheet this week.

SC Supreme Court Historical Society's ceremony postponed
(Date posted: 09/10/2018)

Due to Hurricane Florence and Governor McMaster's closure of state government buildings starting September 11, 2018, the South Carolina Supreme Court Historical Society's ceremony and luncheon honoring Chief Justice Julius B. "Bubba" Ness has been postponed. As soon as the date is rescheduled, all attendees will be notified. Please direct additional questions to historicalsociety@sccourts.org.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Florence County on October 2, 2018
(Date posted: 09/06/2018)

Effective October 2, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Florence County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, Lancaster, Dorchester, Orangeburg, Calhoun, and Berkeley Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Request for Written Comments
(Date posted: 08/29/2018)

At the request of the South Carolina Access to Justice Commission, the Supreme Court is seeking written comments on possible amendments to various rules of court concerning the implementation of limited scope representation in civil and family court matters.

SCCA Form 800 Transcript Request
(Date posted: 08/13/2018)

IT IS ORDERED that SCCA Form 800 Transcript Request Form bearing a date of (8/2018), shall be used in accordance with Rules 207 and 607, SCACR and is approved for use as an additional method to order a transcript, effective immediately.

Expansion of Electronic Filing Pilot Program - Court of Common Pleas
(Date posted: 08/09/2018)

Effective September 4, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Berkeley County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, Lancaster, Dorchester, Orangeburg, and Calhoun Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Amendments to the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(Date posted: 08/08/2018)

Rule 5 and Rule 7 of the Rules for Lawyer Disciplinary Enforcement, which are located in Rule 413 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules, have been amended to correct a scrivener's error and to confirm the Office of Commission Counsel, rather than the Office of Disciplinary Counsel, is charged with supervising the receiver.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Calhoun County on August 7, 2018
(Date posted: 07/18/2018)

Effective August 7, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Calhoun County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, Lancaster, Dorchester, and Orangeburg Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Fee Memorandum - County Treasurers
(Date posted: 07/03/2018)

Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, family courts, magistrates courts and municipal courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds

Fee Memorandum - Magistrates and Municipal Judges
(Date posted: 07/03/2018)

Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the magistrate courts and municipal courts

Fee Memorandum - Clerks of Court and Registers of Deeds
(Date posted: 07/03/2018)

Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, and family courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds

Opinions and Advance Sheet Will Be Posted on Thursday, July 5, 2018
(Date posted: 06/29/2018)

Due to the state holiday on Wednesday, July 4, 2018, the opinions of the Supreme Court of South Carolina and the South Carolina Court of Appeals, and the Advance Sheet will be posted to this website at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, July 5, 2018.

Order Designating Chief Judges and Associate Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
(Date posted: 06/27/2018)

Attached is a copy of an Order of Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty, dated June 25, 2018, the original of which is filed in our Office. The Order designates Chief Judges and Associate Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts. The Order is effective July 1, 2018.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Orangeburg County on July 17, 2018
(Date posted: 06/20/2018)

Effective July 17, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Orangeburg County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, Lancaster, and Dorchester Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Best Legal Practices in Child Abuse and Neglect Cases
(Date posted: 05/31/2018)

Administrative Order - Best Legal Practices in Child Abuse and Neglect Cases

Closing of the Probate Courts
(Date posted: 05/22/2018)

Closing of the Probate Courts

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Dorchester County on June 19, 2018
(Date posted: 05/17/2018)

Effective June 19, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Dorchester County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, Fairfield, and Lancaster Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Revised General Sessions Sentence Sheet (SCCA Form 217)
(Date posted: 05/04/2018)

Revised General Sessions Sentence Sheet (SCCA Form 217)

Rule Amendments Effective
(Date posted: 05/01/2018)

On January 31, 2018, the Supreme Court submitted three orders amending various rules to the General Assembly pursuant to Article V, Section 4A of the South Carolina Constitution. Since ninety days have passed since submission without rejection by the General Assembly, the amendments contained in the orders listed below are effective immediately.

Order Regarding Electronic Means Pursuant to Rules 207 and 607, South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(Date posted: 05/01/2018)

Effective, May 1, 2018, Rules 207 and 607, SCACR, require that attorneys and court reporters provide copies of correspondence related to the ordering of a transcript or any extension request via electronic means. The Supreme Court has issued an Order detailing the proper method to submit the materials via electronic means. Communications and extension requests must submitted via electronic means beginning May 15, 2018.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Lancaster County on May 15, 2018
(Date posted: 04/23/2018)

Effective May 15, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Lancaster County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, Union, Chester, and Fairfield Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Posted Results of the February 2018 Bar Examination
(Date posted: 04/20/2018)

The results of the February 2018 Uniform Bar Examination were posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, April 20, 2018.

Results of the February 2018 Bar Examination
(Date posted: 04/18/2018)

The results of the February 2018 Uniform Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, April 20, 2018.

Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
(Date posted: 04/18/2018)

Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements

Kershaw County Drug Court
(Date posted: 04/17/2018)

Kershaw County Drug Court

Amendment to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(Date posted: 04/04/2018)

At the request of the South Carolina Bar, the Supreme Court has amended Rule 410(j), SCACR, to increase the annual license fees paid by members of the South Carolina Bar.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Chester and Fairfield Counties on April 24, 2018
(Date posted: 04/04/2018)

Effective April 24, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Chester and Fairfield Counties in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, York, Richland, and Union Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Probate Court Form Changes
(Date posted: 03/23/2018)

Probate Form Changes

Sumter County Acting Master-in-Equity Appointment
(Date posted: 03/21/2018)

Sumter County Acting Master-in-Equity Appointment

Sumter County Master-in-Equity Authority
(Date posted: 03/01/2018)

The Honorable Stephen Bryan Doby, Lee County Master-in-Equity, is hereby granted authority to hear cases, issue orders, and authorize and execute documents relating to the Sumter County Master-in-Equity Court beginning March 1, 2018 until the Honorable Richard L. Booth resumes the duties of that office or until further Order of this Court.

Order to Close Florence County Family Court
(Date posted: 03/01/2018)

IT IS ORDERED that the Florence County Family Court close at 3 p.m. on Friday, March 2, 2018, for the purpose of relocating to the new Florence County Judicial Center. Normal family court operations shall resume on Monday, March 5, 2018, at 181 North Irby St. Florence, S.C. The Clerk of Court shall make every effort to minimize the effect of closing on the citizens of Florence County and give as much notice as possible to the public of the scheduled early closing.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Union County on March 20, 2018
(Date posted: 02/28/2018)

Effective March 20, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Union County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, Greenwood, and York Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules (SCACR)
(Date posted: 02/26/2018)

The South Carolina Bar has furnished the attached list of lawyers (including those holding a limited certificate to practice law) who have failed to pay their license fees for 2018.

Supreme Court Adopts Mandatory Summary Court Judge Mentoring Program
(Date posted: 02/21/2018)

Rule 512 has been added to the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules to establish a Mandatory Summary Court Judge Mentoring Program.

Electronic Filing - Important Announcement for Attorney E-Filers - 02/22/2018
(Date posted: 02/21/2018)

Effective February 22, 2018, two enhancements have been made to the E-Filing System.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Resume in Richland County effective March 8, 2018.
(Date posted: 02/20/2018)

Effective March 8, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will be reinstated in Richland County. The Program had been suspended due to unforeseen technical issues, which have been resolved. The other Pilot counties are Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, and Greenwood, with York to be added on February 27, 2018. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to York County on February 27, 2018
(Date posted: 02/08/2018)

Effective February 27, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include York County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, Laurens, and Greenwood Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Dorchester County on February 9, 2018
(Date posted: 02/08/2018)

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program

Judicial Elections
(Date posted: 02/07/2018)

Judicial elections were held February 7, 2018.

Study Committee on Electronic Recording of Custodial Interrogations to Meet on February 14, 2018
(Date posted: 02/07/2018)

The Study Committee on Electronic Recording of Custodial Interrogations will meet on Wednesday, February 14, 2018

Civil Action Coversheet, SCCA Form 234
(Date posted: 02/05/2018)

Civil Action Coversheet, SCCA Form 234

Rule Changes Submitted to the General Assembly
(Date posted: 02/01/2018)

Pursuant to Article V, § 4A of the South Carolina Constitution, the following rule changes were submitted to the South Carolina General Assembly on January 31, 2018.

Form SCCA 610, Request for Bulk Distribution of and Compiled Information from Judicial Records, Rule 610, SCACR
(Date posted: 01/25/2018)

Form SCCA 610, Request for Bulk Distribution of and Compiled Information from Judicial Records, Rule 610, SCACR

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Greenwood County on February 6, 2018
(Date posted: 01/24/2018)

Effective February 6, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Greenwood County in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, Kershaw, Newberry, and Laurens Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Greenville County on January 22, 2018
(Date posted: 01/22/2018)

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program

Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(Date posted: 01/17/2018)

At the request of the Commission on Lawyer Conduct and the Commission on Judicial Conduct, the Supreme Court has amended a number of court rules to adopt debarment as a formal sanction and prohibit debarred lawyers from advertising or engaging in the practice of law in South Carolina.

Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Sumter County on January 18, 2018
(Date posted: 01/17/2018)

Digital Courtroom Recorder Pilot Program to Expand to Sumter County on January 18, 2018

Inclement Weather
(Date posted: 01/16/2018)

All county and municipal employees working within the Unified Judicial System should follow the decisions made by the respective county or municipal government officials in regards to office delays or closings as a result of hazardous weather conditions.

Meeting Postponed – Study Committee on Electronic Recording of Custodial Interrogations
(Date posted: 01/16/2018)

The meeting of the Study Committee on Electronic Recording of Custodial Interrogations scheduled for Wednesday, January 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in the 2nd Floor Conference Room of the South Carolina Supreme Court has been postponed.

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
(Date posted: 01/16/2018)

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program

Written Comments
(Date posted: 01/12/2018)

The written comments submitted to the Court are available for review on the Judicial Department Website.

Study Committee on Electronic Recording of Custodial Interrogations to Meet on January 17, 2018
(Date posted: 01/10/2018)

The Study Committee on Electronic Recording of Custodial Interrogations will meet on Wednesday, January 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in the 2nd Floor Conference Room of the South Carolina Supreme Court, located at 1231 Gervais Street in Columbia, South Carolina. For more information, please contact Michelle Pinkney at (803) 734-1800.

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
(Date posted: 01/08/2018)

Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program

Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
(Date posted: 01/05/2018)

The Supreme Court issues order regarding the legal rate of interest on money decrees and judgments.

E-Filing Pilot Program to Expand to Laurens and Newberry Counties on January 16, 2018
(Date posted: 01/04/2018)

Effective January 16, 2018, the E-Filing Pilot Program will expand to include Laurens and Newberry Counties in addition to Clarendon, Sumter, Lee, Williamsburg, Greenville, Pickens, Spartanburg, Cherokee, Anderson, Oconee, Beaufort, Jasper, Hampton, Allendale, Colleton, Horry, Georgetown, Aiken, Barnwell, Bamberg, Lexington, Saluda, Edgefield, McCormick, and Kershaw Counties. E-Filing in the Court of Common Pleas is mandatory for attorneys in Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information about the Pilot Program and for training resources for attorneys and their staff, go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.

Closure of Supreme Court and Calhoun Buildings Due to Inclement Weather
(Date posted: 01/03/2018)

Based on Richland County's decision to close its offices, the Supreme Court Building and the Calhoun Building, including the Court of Appeals, will close at 11:30 a.m. today, January 3, 2018.

Inclement Weather Memo
(Date posted: 01/02/2018)

The National Weather Service is predicting some areas of South Carolina may experience hazardous weather conditions on Wednesday, January 3, 2018, which could result in the closure or delayed opening of state and local government offices.