Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Department
Court News ...

Alternative Dispute Resolution Forms


The invitation-only Investiture Ceremony for Chief Justice Costa Pleicones will be held on Thursday, January 7, 2016 at 4:00 pm at the Supreme Court.


The Supreme Court has approved the Self-Represented Litigant Request for Visitation Packet for use in the Family Courts of South Carolina. 


These amended and new forms will be added to the list of civil forms included in Rule 24 of the South Carolina Magistrate Court Rules, and may also be accessed at http://www.sccourts.org/forms.


Request for Business Court Assignment


By order dated February 1, 2006, this Court adopted Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) Rules which govern court-annexed ADR processes in South Carolina Circuit Courts in civil suits, and in South Carolina Family Courts in domestic relations actions, in counties designated by this Court to participate in mandatory ADR pursuant to a pilot program or as required by statute.


Applicants interested in using laptops to complete their answers to the essay sections of the February 2016 South Carolina Bar Examination must complete and return the attached "Request to Participate" form by Monday, January 11, 2016.


Beginning December 9, 2015, the E-Filing Pilot Program will begin in the Court of Common Pleas in Clarendon County. For attorneys, E-Filing will be mandatory in Clarendon County and any future Pilot counties unless the type of case or the type of filing is excluded from the Pilot Program in accordance with the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. For more information go to http://www.sccourts.org/efiling/.


At the request of the Commission on Lawyer Conduct and the Commission on Judicial Conduct, the Court has adopted several amendments to Rules 407, 413, and 502, SCACR.


Based on a recommendation from the Chief Justice's Commission on the Profession, the Court has adopted a voluntary certification program for South Carolina paralegals.



The E-Filing Portal is now available


The results of the July 2015 Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 30, 2015.


The Supreme Court has adopted the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines, which will govern E-Filed cases during the E-Filing Pilot Program in the Court of Common Pleas.


The Supreme Court has amended Rule 7.4 of the South Carolina Rules of Professional Conduct, contained in Rule 407 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules, regarding communication of fields of practice and specialization.


Pursuant to the provisions of S.C. Const. Art. V, §4, I find that the Probate Court Judges Advisory Committee has requested the use of video hearings for commitment hearings held by Probate Judges on the basis it would enhance the efficiency and security in courtroom proceedings, while maintaining the constitutional rights of the alleged mentally ill or chemically dependent person, the child in need of mental health treatment as defined in S.C. Code Ann. § 44-24-10(4), or the person with active tuberculosis.


At the direction of Chief Justice Jean Toal, employees in the Supreme Court and the John C. Calhoun buildings are excused from work on Friday October 9, 2015, except directors, managers, and employees whose job function is essential to Court operations as determined by the director or manager.


At the direction of Chief Justice Jean Toal, SCJD employees working in the Supreme Court and John C. Calhoun buildings shall report as normal on Thursday, October 8, 2015.


Oral Arguments Before the Supreme Court on Wednesday, October 7, 2015, Will Proceed


Chief Justice Toal's order (2015-10-06-01) provides Clerks of Court with the authority to open courthouses as deemed safe to do so. The following courthouses are open.


2015-10-06-01 Cancellation of Circuit and Family Court Terms of Court Oct. 7 – 10, 2015


At the direction of Chief Justice Jean Toal, SCJD employees working in the Supreme Court and John C. Calhoun buildings shall report as normal on Wednesday, October 7, 2015, unless further notice is provided by the SC Emergency Management Division.


Oral Arguments for the South Carolina Court of Appeals scheduled for Wednesday, October 7, 2015 are cancelled.


Cancellation of State Courts Tuesday October 6, 2015.


By direction of Chief Jusice Toal, the Supreme Court and John C. Calhoun Buildings will be closed on Tuesday, October 6, 2015.


IT IS ORDERED that proceedings in the Supreme Court, Court of Appeals, Circuit Court, and Family Court are cancelled statewide on Monday, October 5, 2015. All S.C. Judicial Department employees are excused from reporting to work on Monday, October 5, 2015.


Oral Arguments for the South Carolina Court of Appeals scheduled for October 5, 2015 are cancelled.


Civil Motions Pilot Program


Court amends Verified Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice


Videoconferencing Approval in General Sessions Courts for the Sixth Judicial Circuit


At the recommendation of the Chief Justice's Commission on the Profession, the Court has adopted several amendments to the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules to address issues with lawyers who are suffering from cognitive impairments. The goal of the amendments is to clarify the duties and responsibilities of lawyers and judges who notice problems, provide compassionate assistance to lawyers in need, and protect the public.


Pilot Model Post-Conviction Relief Docket Management


On Thursday, August 20, 2015, Chief Justice Jean Hoefer Toal addressed members of South Carolina's Judiciary at the Annual Judicial Conference.


The Court has amended Rules 5, 10 and 19 of the rules governing the Resolution of Fee Disputes Board contained in Rule 416 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules. The amendments address appointment of the Executive Council of the Resolution of Fee Disputes Board, clarify that a fee dispute may be filed by an attorney against a client, and clarify that a certificate of non-compliance can be issued against either party to the dispute.


Pursuant to Article V, § 4, of the South Carolina Constitution, Footnote 1 to Rule 31(h) of the Rules for Lawyer Disciplinary Enforcement (RLDE) contained in Rule 413 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules (SCACR) is hereby amended.


Court amends Rule 402, SCACR, to reflect National Conference of Bar Examiners' increase in fee to hand-grade Multistate Bar Examination.


Order Approving Order for Destruction of Arrest Records Forms


Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, and family courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds


Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the magistrate courts and municipal courts


Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, family courts, magistrates courts and municipal courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds


Act No. 58 of 2015 authorizes the issuance of permanent restraining orders by the Circuit Courts and Family Courts, and the issuance of emergency restraining orders by the Magistrate Courts, under specified circumstances. These court forms are provided to facilitate the process.


Order Designating Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts


Interim Appointment of Chief Magistrate and Associate Chief Magistrate in Charleston County


Designation of Interim Chief Magistrate in Newberry County



The Transcript of Judgment form, SCCA Form 250, bearing a revision date of 06/2015, is approved for use in the Circuit Courts of the State of South Carolina.


Rules 19 and 21 of the ADR Rules have been amended with respect to the certification of family court mediators.


Applicants interested in using laptops to complete their answers to the essay sections of the July 2015 South Carolina Bar Examination must complete and return the attached "Request to Participate" form by Monday, June 15, 2015.


Judicial Elections
(05/27/2015)

Judicial elections were held May 27, 2015.


The invitation only portrait unveiling ceremony for Chief Justice Jean Hoefer Toal will be held in the Supreme Court courtroom Wednesday, May 27th.


Rule 412 has been amended at the request of the South Carolina Bar Foundation to permit attorneys to utilize credit unions for IOLTA purposes.


The Subpoena forms, SCCA/254 and SCCA254F, bearing revision dates of 05/2015, are approved for use in the Circuit Courts and Family Courts of the State of South Carolina.


Request to Appoint Mediator and Family Court Notice of ADR Forms


The results of the February 2015 Bar Examination were posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, May 1, 2015.


The Supreme Court of South Carolina is considering adding a rule to the South Carolina Rules of Criminal Procedure to govern closing arguments in non-capital criminal cases.


Since ninety days have passed since submission without rejection by the General Assembly, the amendments contained in the referenced orders are effective immediately.


The results of the February 2015 Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, May 1, 2015.


The South Carolina Commission on Continuing Legal Education and Specialization has furnished the attached list of lawyers who have failed to file reports showing compliance with continuing legal education requirements, or who have failed to pay the filing fee or any penalty required for the report of compliance, for the reporting year ending in February 2015.


The Supreme Court of South Carolina has adopted Rule 427 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules. This rule will allow a military judge advocate to represent authorized clients before a court or administrative tribunal in South Carolina as part of legal assistance services authorized by 10 U.S.C. §1044 and applicable military regulations.


Rule 1.0 of the Rules of Professional Conduct, Rule 407, SCACR, has been amended to include a definition of "person." Other provisions of the Rules of Professional Conduct which cite to sections of Rule 1.0 have been amended to reflect the changes made to the alphabetic order of those sections in light of the addition of the new definition.


The South Carolina Judicial Department is delighted to announce that the renovations at the Calhoun Building have reached a stage which permits the clerk's office of the South Carolina Court of Appeals to return to the Calhoun Building. Therefore, effective April 1, 2015, all filings with the Court of Appeals will be made on the ground level of the Calhoun Building.


Designation of Interim Chief Magistrate in Chester County


Supreme Court Adopts Rule Regarding Bulk Distribution of and Compiled Information From Judicial Records.


The South Carolina Bar has furnished the attached list of lawyers (including those holding a limited certificate to practice law) who have failed to pay their license fees for 2015.


IT IS ORDERED that the eligibility examination for the initial appointment of magistrates shall consist of the Wonderlic Personnel Test and the Watson-Glasser Critical Thinking Appraisal Test.


Due to the potential winter weather hazard conditions in various parts of the State, the holding of courtroom proceedings will follow the directives of county or municipal government officials. Regarding bond hearings and court closures due to inclement weather, a minimum of one bond hearing daily should be conducted, if at all possible. If you are in an area in which the weather allows you to adhere to your regular bond hearing schedule, please do so.


On Thursday, February 26, 2015, the South Carolina Bar Examination will proceed as scheduled.


Chief Justice Jean H. Toal delivered her State of the Judiciary address to the General Assembly on Wednesday, February 25, 2015 at noon.


While there is a Winter Weather Advisory in effect for Tuesday morning, February 24, 2015, the Bar Examination will proceed as scheduled. All bar applicants and bar admissions staff (including monitors) should report at the times previously scheduled.


Court amends Rule 2(r) of the Rules for Judicial Disciplinary Enforcement


Rule 34 of the Rules for Lawyer Disciplinary Enforcement is amended to allow a limited class of suspended lawyers to be employed by lawyers or law firms, with certain restrictions and supervisory requirements.


Judicial Elections
(02/04/2015)

Results of judicial elections held February 4, 2015.


Pursuant to Article V, § 4A of the South Carolina Constitution, the following rule changes were submitted to the South Carolina General Assembly on January 29, 2015.


The Supreme Court issues order regarding the legal rate of interest on money decrees and judgments.